Jaggard et al v. Abbott Laboratories
Plaintiff: Richard Jaggard and Judy Jaggard
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00360
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall meet and confer on items required to be included in the Joint Case Management Report. After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than November 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wrenn, Dione)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint Defendant Abbott Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Plantiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/7/2021.(Wrenn, Dione) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Judy Jaggard, Richard Jaggard. (Forsberg, Mark)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc re ECF No. #10 First Amended Complaint. (KR)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Richard Jaggard, Judy Jaggard. Adds and removes parties. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Forsberg, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF #8 Stipulation for Leave to Amend Complaint : Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint in the form of the First Amended Complaint attached hereto as Exhibit 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION and Request for Leave to Amend Complaint by Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint) (Wrenn, Dione)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (Wrenn, Dione)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Defendant's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended until September 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (Wrenn, Dione)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case to Unofficial Northern Division. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/10/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/25/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Abbott Laboratories. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wrenn, Dione)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV21-00447, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6590201) by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons & Complaint, #2 Declaration B Declaration of Brian J. Mooney, Esq., #3 Exhibit C SEC Filing Abbott Laboratories, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wrenn, Dione) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaggard et al v. Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jaggard
Represented By: Mark Forsberg
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Jaggard
Represented By: Mark Forsberg
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Brian Mooney
Represented By: Dione C Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc
Represented By: Dione C Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?