Cranford v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Keishawn Cranford
Defendant: State of Nevada, NDOC, Charles Daniels, William Gittere, William Reubart, L. Rigney, T. Rigali and Dawn Jones
Case Number: 3:2021cv00386
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Plaintiff Keishawn Cranford. (DRM)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Keishawn Cranford. (KR)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 and #3 ) are denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete IFP application with all three documents as explained in this Order. The Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff the approved IFP application form by an inmate, and instructions for the same (attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by ESP). On or before November 2, 2021, Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file an IFP application, financial certificate and a trust fund account statement or this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Keishawn Cranford. (DRM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KR)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keishawn Cranford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint). (Modified on 9/2/2021 to re-organize pages of docket entry into standard format (DRM))
August 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranford v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keishawn Cranford
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Reubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rigali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?