Dover v. Geico Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Belma Jean Dover
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00450
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #18 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No. #22 Case Management Report : Discovery due by 9/9/2022. Motions due by 10/9/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 9, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/9/2021. The court has reviewed the case management report, (ECF No. #22 ), and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the courts standing order. (ECF No. #7 .) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
December 9, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Belma Jean Dover. (Gallagher, Barbara)
December 9, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #16 Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Belma Jean Dover. (Gallagher, Barbara)
December 8, 2021 Filing 22 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company (Carlson, Jonathan)
December 6, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #18 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Belma Jean Dover. Replies due by 12/13/2021. (Gallagher, Barbara)
December 2, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carlson, Jonathan)
December 2, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Responses due by 12/6/2021. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Belma Jean Dover. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gallagher, Barbara)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Belma Jean Dover. Responses due by 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gallagher, Barbara)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court : QC changed entry from motion to reassign case to motion to remand to state court. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. Attorney Barbara Gallagher advised to review and comply with LR IC 2-2(b) and file your motion for attorney fees as a separate motion. Counsel may use the same PDF file as used in document #13 . (no image attached) (WJ)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Reassign Case remand to state court by Plaintiff Belma Jean Dover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gallagher, Barbara) Modified on 11/18/2021 correct title of entry. (WJ).
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 WITHDRAWAL of #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Belma Jean Dover. Replies due by 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B) (Gallagher, Barbara)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO Casualty Company by Belma Jean Dover. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A & B) (Gallagher, Barbara)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall meet and confer on items required to be included in the Joint Case Management Report. After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than December 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Responses due by 11/8/2021. (Carlson, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/21/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/5/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Casualty Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District Court, Case Number DC-CV-21-97, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6670990) by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dover v. Geico Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belma Jean Dover
Represented By: Barbara W Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Frank A. Toddre, II
Represented By: Tayler D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?