Swaim et al v. State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Renae Joy Swaim and Clinton Thomas Swaim, Jr.
Defendant: Attorney General State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services, David Atherton, Matt Bowman, Daiki Branch, James Cameron, Vivian Davis, Isaac Flores, Joel Gomez, Chris Henry, Samantha Lyons, Erick McBride, Rick Meier, Brad Mitchell, Luis Orozco, Lacey Patiga, Nicholas Patiga, Brandon Taylor, Tanner Trout and John West
Case Number: 3:2021cv00502
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Craig S Denney
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE due to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00502-MMD-WGC. (no image attached) (LG)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services. (Shevorski, Steven)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Clinton Thomas Swaim, Jr, Renae Joy Swaim, Renae Joy Swaim, Renae Joy Swaim. Replies due by 1/19/2022. (Lawrence, Nathan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services. Responses due by 1/21/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2022. (Shevorski, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renae Joy Swaim, Clinton Thomas Swaim, Jr re #3 Summons Issued,,. State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/15/2021. (Lawrence, Nathan)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re ECF No. #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons as to David Atherton, #2 Summons as to Matt Bowman, #3 Summons as to Daiki "Sam" Branch, #4 Summons as to James Cameron, #5 Summons as to Vivian Davis, #6 Summons as to Isaac Flores, #7 Summons as to Joel Gomez, #8 Summons as to Chris Henry, #9 Summons as to Samantha Lyons, #10 Summons as to Erick McBride, #11 Summons as to Rick Meier, #12 Summons as to Brad Mitchell, #13 Summons as to Luis Orozco, #14 Summons as to Lacey Patiga, #15 Summons as to Nicholas Patiga, #16 Summons as to Brandon Taylor, #17 Summons as to Tanner Trout, #18 Summons as to John West) (HKL)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clinton Thomas Swaim, Jr, Renae Joy Swaim. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lawrence, Nathan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6723535) by Renae Joy Swaim, Clinton Thomas Swaim, Jr. Proof of service due by 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - David Atherton, #3 Summons - Matt Bowman, #4 Summons - Daiki "Sam" Branch, #5 Summons - James Cameron, #6 Summons - Vivian Davis, #7 Summons - Isaac Flores, #8 Summons - Joel Gomez, #9 Summons - Chris Henry, #10 Summons - Samantha Lyons, #11 Summons - Erick McBride, #12 Summons - Rick Meier, #13 Summons - Brad Mitchell, #14 Summons - Luis Orozco, #15 Summons - Lacey Patiga, #16 Summons - Nicholas Patiga, #17 Summons - Brandon Taylor, #18 Summons - Tanner Trout, #19 Summons - John West, #20 Summons - State of Nevada ex rel. DHHS, DPBH) (Lawrence, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 7, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swaim et al v. State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renae Joy Swaim
Represented By: Nathan Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Michael I. Welker
Represented By: Travis Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Thomas Swaim, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Michael I. Welker
Represented By: Travis Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Atherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiki Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Patiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Patiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?