Fitzgerald v. Nevada Department et al
Plaintiff: Marty Scott Fitzgerald
Defendant: Mary Baker, Eric Christiansen, Scott Wisenthal, Nevada Department of Corrections and Susan Jackson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00011
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb (Recall)
Referring Judge: Craig S Denney
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marty Scott Fitzgerald. (DRM)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE due to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00011-MMD-CSD. (no image attached) (LG)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application. Clerk will send Plaintiff the approved form IFP application and instructions (Attached for distribution by NNCC). Payment of filing fees or completed documents due on or before March 14, 2022. Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application and Instructions) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HKL)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Financial Certificate) (HKL)
January 10, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (Recall). (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Nevada Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Scott Fitzgerald
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wisenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?