Ware v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Erin Ware
Defendant: M. Sullivan, D. Richard, M Minev, Leahloni Flores, John Keast, Doctor Naughton and M. Minev
Case Number: 3:2022cv00037
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 FINANCIAL Certificate and IA by Plaintiff Erin Ware (HKL) NOTE: Plaintiff's 3-page IFP application at ECF No. #4 . Modified on 2/7/2022 (PR).
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Erin Ware. (DRM)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Clerk will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, including the information and instructions for the same (Attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by NNCC). On or before March 28, 2022, Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file with the Court a completed IFP application, a financial certificate, and a copy of the inmate's prison/jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this Order, this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice for Plaintiff to refile the case with the Court. Clerk will retain the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP application and instructions) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HKL)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (HKL)
January 24, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Ware
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leahloni Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Keast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?