Earley v. Officer Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Marc Anthony Earley
Defendant: Officer Martinez and Acting Warden
Case Number: 3:2022cv00040
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marc Anthony Earley. (HKL)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that ECF No. #1 IFP application is denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents specified herein. Clerk shall send P approved IFP form and instructions. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) $402 filing fee or fully complete IFP application due by 3/28/2022. Clerk will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 25, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SMR)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Marc Anthony Earley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint) (SMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earley v. Officer Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Anthony Earley
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?