Evpak v. State of Nevada Department of Taxation
Plaintiff: John P. Evpak
Defendant: State of Nevada Department of Taxation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00073
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation for extension of time. Defendant has up to and including, April 15, 2022, to file an answer or otherwise respond by motion to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION, REQUEST, AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Defendant State of Nevada Department of Taxation. (Husbands, Scott)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John P. Evpak re #4 Summons Issued. State of Nevada Department of Taxation served on 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proof of Service on NV Department of Taxation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service to NV AG) (Foley, Jenny)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State of Nevada Department of Taxation. (DRM)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 8, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
February 8, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for ENE. (WJ)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Evpak. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEVADA DEPT. OF TAXATION (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6788126) by John Evpak. Proof of service due by 5/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Nevada Department of Taxation) (Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evpak v. State of Nevada Department of Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Evpak
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada Department of Taxation
Represented By: Scott Harrington Husbands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?