Mathis v. Warden N.N.C.C.
Petitioner: Jason Mathis
Respondent: Warden N.N.C.C.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00091
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that in order to create a caseload for U.S. District Judge Anne R. Traum, this case is reassigned to Judge Anne R. Traum for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00091-ART-CLB. (no image attached) (HKL)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Warden N.N.C.C., et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:22-cv-00091-MMD-CLB. (DRM)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Motion Extension of Time Habeas Corpus) (HKL) Modified on 2/15/2022 to clarify attachment title (DRM).
February 14, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Warden N.N.C.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Mathis
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden N.N.C.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?