KPG Investments, Inc. et al v. Sonn
Plaintiff: KPG Investments, Inc. and Kendalle Getty
Defendant: Marlena Sonn, Alexandra Sarah Getty, ASG Investments Inc., Minerva Office Management, Inc. and Robert L Leberman
Case Number: 3:2022cv00236
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #124 Stipulation to Extend Case Deadlines : The discovery deadlines in this case shall be vacated and discovery shall be stayed in this action until Friday, January 5, 2024. If the parties do not finalize the settlement agreement and file a stipulation to dismiss this action by on or before Friday, January 5, 2024, the stay of discovery will be automatically lifted and the parties are ordered file an updated Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by no later than Friday, January 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh) (extend) (discovery)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Second CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/03/2023. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Report (ECF No. #123 ), the Court finds that the Virtual Case Management Conference currently set for October 10, 2023 at 9:00 AM is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (AMC)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 9/26/2023. In light of the parties' representation that an agreement on material terms of a settlement was reached (ECF No. #118 ), the Court DENIES all pending motions (ECF Nos. #40 , #41 , #47 , #48 , #107 , and #108 ) without prejudice and with leave to refile if a formal settlement agreement is not finalized. The parties are directed to either file a stipulation to dismiss the case or to provide an update on the status of the settlement within 45 days of this Order.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRR)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING MOTION/NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL. Tara Teegarden removed from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc... (Goddard, Leigh)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting ECF No. #118 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order re #93 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh) (extend) (discovery)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY to Response to #108 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comparison copy of proposed amendment)(Wenthe, Roger)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #115 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (CJS)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RESPONSE to #108 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. Replies due by 8/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Mercado, Alice)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE to #108 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. Replies due by 8/21/2023. (Sweet, Austin)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE to #108 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. Replies due by 8/21/2023. (Goddard, Leigh)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY to Response to #107 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE to #107 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. Replies due by 8/14/2023. (Goddard, Leigh)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/4/2023. In light of the parties' joint case management report, (ECF No. #109 ), and the representation that the parties will be participating in a private mediation, the case management conference currently set for 8/10/2023 at 9:00 AM is hereby VACATED. Additionally, the Court's order granting the stipulation regarding mediation, (ECF No. #103 ), is hereby VACATED and WITHDRAWN in relation to the Court contacting the parties to set a settlement conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Aquino, Daniel)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Amend #100 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,,,,, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Responses due by 8/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Leung, Christopher) (pleading)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss #105 Amended Complaint by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Responses due by 8/7/2023. (Wenthe, Roger)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to #100 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,,,,, by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mercado, Alice)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marlena Sonn by KPG Investments, Inc., Kendalle Getty. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Goddard, Leigh)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc. re #100 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,,,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Goddard, Leigh)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #101 Stipulation Regarding Mediation and Discovery. The Court will be in contact with the parties to set the settlement conference on a date and time convenient for both the parties and the Court. The Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines is GRANTED. See order for discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: ECF No. #101 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. No action is needed by counsel as the Clerk has modified the entry to reflect as a Stipulation. (no image attached) (CJS)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Joint STIPULATION MOTION for Settlement Conference and Stipulation Regarding Mediation and Discovery by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Responses due by 7/13/2023. (Wenthe, Roger) Modified document type on 6/29/2023 - Re-NEF (CJS).
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDERED that the Getty Parties' Motions to Seal (ECF Nos. #42 , 49 ) are DENIED. The KPG Parties and the ASG Defendants shall file versions of the documents at issue in their respective Motions to Seal redacting only physical and email addresses on the open docket within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order (7/12/2023). It is further ordered that the KPG Parties' Motion for Leave to Amend (ECF No. #46 ) and Motion for Leave to File Supplement (ECF No. #58 ) are GRANTED. The KPG Parties shall file their first amended complaint on the docket within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order (7/12/2023). It is further ordered that, in light of the Court's granting of the KPG Parties' Motion for Leave to Amend, Sonn's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #39 ) is DENIED without prejudice as moot with leave to refile. Finally, the Court notes that Sonn has suggested she will move to file an amended complaint. (ECF No. #68 at 3 n.1). In the interests of judicial efficiency, the Court suggests Sonn so move such that the Court may consider updated briefing from all parties ahead of a hearing at a time to-be-determined on the various Motions to Dismiss and the KPG Parties' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Virtual Case Management Conference held on 5/10/2023 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Leigh Goddard; Def Counsel: Adam Pollock, Ryan Derry, Mark Gunderson and Austin Sweet; Recording start and end times: 9:01:17 - 9:24:24; Courtroom: 1; The Court advises that the purpose of this hearing is to set out the Court's expectations for discovery. The Court and the parties discuss this Court presiding over a settlement conference. The Court explains the benefits of consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for the entirety of the case. The Court and counsel schedule continued Virtual Case Management Conferences for 8/10/2023 and 10/10/2023 both at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send lead counsel an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. Counsel shall file a case management report one (1) week prior to each conference. If there are no issues for the Courts consideration, the case management conference will be vacated. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/20/2023. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Virtual Case Managment Conference is set for 5/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send lead counsel an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. Counsel appearing telephonically shall dial 877-336-1829 to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 22236. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Gunderson, Mark)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. #95 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Protective Order is effective as of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Amended STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #92 Order on Stipulation, #88 Stipulation by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc... (Gunderson, Mark)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SCHEDULING ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #89 Stipulation : Discovery due by 11/6/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING ECF No. #88 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/10/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #87 Stipulation Regarding Protocol Governing Production of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/7/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #86 Stipulation Regarding Remote Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/7/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Sweet, Austin) (other) (discovery)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION Protective Order by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Sweet, Austin) (other) (protective)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and Order Regarding the Protocol Governing Production of Electronically Stored Information by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Sweet, Austin) (other) (discovery)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION Regarding Remote Depositions by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Sweet, Austin) (other) (discovery)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #83 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Leung for Marlena Sonn and approving Designation of Local Counsel Roger W. Wenthe. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/3/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF ATTORNEY AGATHA COLE FOR MARLENA SONN. Re ECF No. #82 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/3/2023., Attorney Agatha M. Cole terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Leung and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Roger Wenthe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7254217) by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Discharge of Attorney Agatha Cole by Marlena Sonn.. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to #41 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to #45 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to #42 Motion to Seal by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JOINDER to #74 Reply by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JOINDER to #74 Reply by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Sweet, Austin) Modified on 3/16/2023 48 (WJ).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response to #40 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Sweet, Austin)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to #67 Response by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh) Modified on 3/16/2023 49 (WJ).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to #48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY to Response to #46 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY to Response to #47 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #70 Stipulation re ECF Nos. #41 , #42 , #44 , #45 . The Court continues the current deadline for the filing of ASG Defendants' Replies from March 15, 2023 to March 22, 2023 (3/22/2023). Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for ASG Defendants to File Replies to Plaintiff's Oppositions re #44 Notice (Other), #42 Motion to Seal, #45 Request for Judicial Notice, #41 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice) (extend) (dispositive)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to #40 Motion to Dismiss, #47 Motion to Dismiss, #41 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Replies due by 3/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ("Sonn Complaint"))(Pollock, Adam)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE to #40 Motion to Dismiss, #47 Motion to Dismiss, #41 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Replies due by 3/15/2023. (Pollock, Adam)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to 62 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Minute Order, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE to #48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Replies due by 3/15/2023. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Replies due by 3/15/2023. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE to #45 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE to #42 Motion to Seal by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Replies due by 3/15/2023. (Wenthe, Roger)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Good cause appearing, Defendant Marlena Sonn's Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. #60 ) is GRANTED. Sonn shall have until March 8, 2023 to file a Response to ECF No. 49 .(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PJM)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NON-OPPOSITION to #60 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to ECF No. 49 re #51 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Responses due by 3/21/2023. (Wenthe, Roger) (dispositive)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE Notice of FRCP 26(f) Case Conference by Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc... (Goddard, Leigh)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint re #46 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. Responses due by 3/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Goddard, Leigh) (misc) (pleading)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than Monday, April 17, 2023 (4/17/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to #39 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Pollock, Adam)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STANDING ORDER for the Honorable Carla Baldwin (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CLB)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE to #39 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff KPG Investments, Inc.. Replies due by 3/1/2023. (Goddard, Leigh)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JOINDER to #48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JOINDER to #48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Gunderson, Mark)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #50 Motion to Extend Time : Responses to ECF Nos. #40 , #41 , #42 , #45 , #46 , #47 , and #48 Motions due by 3/8/2023. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 2/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #47 Motion to Dismiss, #40 Motion to Dismiss, #42 Motion to Seal, #46 Motion to Amend/Correct, #45 Request for Judicial Notice, #41 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Responses due by 2/27/2023. (Wenthe, Roger) (dispositive)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. Responses due by 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of K. Getty, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - January 16, 2023 New Yorker Article, #4 Exhibit Message)(Goddard, Leigh)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. Responses due by 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Goddard, Leigh)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. Responses due by 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Goddard, Leigh) (pleading)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #41 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index)(Mercado, Alice)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Under Seal Submission of Exhibits to Request for Judicial Review in Support of Motion to Dismiss by ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty re #41 Motion to Dismiss.. (Mercado, Alice)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Seal Document, #41 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. Responses due by 2/22/2023. (Mercado, Alice)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. Responses due by 2/22/2023. (Mercado, Alice)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. Responses due by 2/22/2023. (Gunderson, Mark)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Responses due by 2/22/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/25/2023. (Pollock, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: AB & DN; Counsel for KPG Investments, Inc. & Kendalle Getty: Leigh Goddard & Daniel Aquino; Counsel for Minerva Office Management, Inc. & Robert Leberman: Austin Sweet & Mark Gunderson; Counsel for Alexandra Sarah Getty & ASG Investments Inc.: Ryan Derry & Isabella Hubert; Counsel for Marlena Sonn: Adam Pollock, Agatha Cole, Max Rodriguez & Roger Wenthe; Court Reporter: Liberty; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 6; Also Appearing by Video: Kendalle Getty, Robert Leberman, Alexandra Sarah Getty & Marlena Sonn.After private discussions and negotiations, the parties advise the Court that a settlement has not been reached. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 1/12/2023. By Deputy Clerk: AB.The Video Settlement Conference set for Wednesday, January 18, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid will be conducted by Zoom Video Conference. The following Zoom Video Conference Instructions shall be adhered to as follows:1. Log on to the call ten (10) minutes prior to the hearing time. 2. Mute your sound prior to entering the hearing. 3. Do not talk over one another. 4. State your name prior to speaking for the record. 5. Do not have others in the video screen or moving in the background. 6. No recording of the hearing. 7. No forwarding of any video conference invitations. 8. Unauthorized users on the video conference will be removed. Reminder: Please take notice that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsel's agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, and members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may NOT record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court will be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam Pollock on behalf of Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Pollock, Adam)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER approving ECF No. #31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Pollock for Marlena Sonn and approving Designation of Local Counsel Roger Wayne Wenthe. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 11/9/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/3/2022. By Deputy Clerk: AB.The Settlement Conference currently set before this Court on January 18, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (ECF No. #33 ) will be conducted utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology. Counsel shall provide Courtroom Deputy Lisa Mann at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov with the email addresses of all those required to participate in the settlement conference. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Settlement Conference set for Wednesday, 1/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom to be determined before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr.THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS SHALL BE RECEIVED IN THE CLERKS OFFICE, ROOM 301, NOT LATER THAN 4:00 P.M. ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 11, 2023. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2022 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: AB; Pla Counsel: Leigh Goddard & Daniel Aquino; Def Counsel: Agatha Cole & Roger Wenthe with Adam Pollock (Pro Hac pending) & Analyst Jordan Marcus; Alice Mercado, Austin Sweet, Ryan Derry & Mark Gunderson; Court Reporter: Liberty Court Recorder; Time of Hearing: 9:04:42 a.m. - 9:10:37 a.m. & 9:18:30 a.m. - 9:27:03 a.m.; Courtroom: 4. The Court explains the purpose of today's hearing regarding the Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference (ECF No. #26 ).The Court GRANTS the Motion to Vacate (ECF No. #26 ). The Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. The Court advises counsel that they will be setting a new date for a Settlement Conference at this hearing. The Court advises that the conference can be held either in person or by video. The Court and counsel discuss prospective dates.At 9:10 a.m., the Court stands at recess to allow counsel time to confer on dates to schedule the Settlement Conference. At 9:18 a.m., the Court and parties reconvene. Mr. Gunderson advises the Court that the parties are available January 18, 2023. The Court inquires if the conference will be held in person or by video. After hearing from counsel, the Court will schedule the Settlement Conference by video. A Video Settlement Conference is set for January 18, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The Court will issue an Order Setting Settlement Conference. Upon inquiry from Ms. Mercado, the Court informs counsel that local counsel will not need to be present at the Video Settlement Conference. Ms. Cole raises an issue regarding the consolidation of the cases and provides background information to the Court. The Court advises Ms. Cole that the issue will need to be raised with Magistrate Judge Baldwin or District Judge Traum. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Pollock and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Roger Wenthe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7101800) by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 10/25/2022. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Virtual Motion Hearing regarding Defendants' Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference #26 is set for 11/3/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert A McQuaid Jr. Counsel are directed to have their calendars with them at this hearing. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NON-OPPOSITION to #26 Motion to Vacate Hearing or Trial, by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #26 Motion to Vacate Hearing or Trial, by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Gunderson, Mark)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Vacate Hearing or Trial, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. Replies due by 10/14/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION TO VACATE 23 Minute Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,, Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference by Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Sweet, Austin) (settlement)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan D. Derry for Alexandra Sarah Getty & KPG Investments, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Alice Campos Mercado. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 9/23/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan D. Derry and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alice Campos Mercado (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BNVDC-7059135) by Defendants ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Mercado, Alice)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/30/2022. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of Plaintiff's conflict with the date, the Virtual Settlement Conference currently set for 9/6/2022 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The settlement conference statements shall now be received in the Clerk's Office by no later than 4:00 PM on Wednesday, November 9, 2022. All other aspects of this Court's Order Setting Settlement Conference #21 remain in full effect. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/16/2022. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The Settlement Conference currently set before this Court on September 6, 2022 at 9:00 AM will be conducted utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology. Counsel shall provide Courtroom Deputy Lisa Mann at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov with the email addresses of all those required to participate in the settlement conference. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference is set for 9/6/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The Settlement Conference Statements shall be received in the Clerk's Office, Room 301, not later than 4:00 PM on Tuesday, August 30, 2022. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 8/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING VIRTUAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re: ECF No. #19 . The Settlement Conference set for 9/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin is VACATED. Counsel will be contacted by the Court to reschedule the settlement conference before Magistrate Judge McQuaid. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/9/2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING VIRTUAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set for 9/6/2022 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. The settlement conference statements may be emailed to chambers by emailing Clb.chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov or may be mailed to chambers at 400 S. Virginia St., Room No. 404, Reno, Nevada 89501. The settlement conference statements are due by no later than 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 30, 2022. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gunderson, Mark)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark H. Gunderson on behalf of Defendants Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Gunderson, Mark)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSOLIDATION ORDER : IT IS ORDERED that KPG Investments, Inc. and Kendalle Getty v. Marlena Sonn, Case No. 3:22-cv-00236-ART-CLB, and Marlena Sonn v. Kendalle P. Getty, et al, Case No. 3:22-cv-00323-ART-CLB. are hereby consolidated into the first-filed Case No. 3:22-cv-00236-ART-CLB, and are referred to herein as the Consolidated Action. (All future filings shall bear base case no. 3:22-cv-00236, and be filed in that base case.) (ECF No. #13 Stipulation to consolidate terminated.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties to the Consolidated Action will participate in a settlement conference pursuant to Local Rule 16-5. Counsel will be contacted by the Court to schedule the settlement conference for the Consolidated Action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Consolidated Action is stayed in its entirety pending the conclusion of the settlement conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the settlement conference does not resolve the Consolidated Action, each parties responsive pleading shall be due 21 days after the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ERRATA to #13 Stipulation by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc... (Goddard, Leigh)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance and Certificate of Interested Parties by ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty re #11 Certificate of Interested Parties, #10 Notice of Appearance.. (Mercado, Alice)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order re Consolidation, Settlement Conference, and Stay by Plaintiffs Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh) (other) (answer)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kendalle Getty, KPG Investments, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Goddard, Leigh)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mercado, Alice)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alice C Mercado on behalf of Defendants Alexandra Sarah Getty, ASG Investments Inc.. (Mercado, Alice)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Motion to Extend Time : Answer/response to Complaint due by 7/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving ECF No. #4 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Agatha M Cole for Marlena Sonn and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Roger W. Wenthe. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/9/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. #5 Motion to Extend Time : Answer to complaint due by 6/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Wenthe, Roger)
May 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Agatha M. Cole and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Roger W. Wenthe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6920313) by Defendant Marlena Sonn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wenthe, Roger)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/27/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/11/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marlena Sonn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wenthe, Roger)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Washoe, Case Number CV22-00444, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6917326) by Marlena Sonn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Wenthe, Roger) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KPG Investments, Inc. et al v. Sonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPG Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh T Goddard
Represented By: Daniel I. Aquino
Represented By: Tara U Teegarden
Represented By: Leigh Goddard
Represented By: Lisa E. Cleary
Represented By: Ryan D. Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendalle Getty
Represented By: Leigh T Goddard
Represented By: Daniel I. Aquino
Represented By: Tara U Teegarden
Represented By: Leigh Goddard
Represented By: Lisa E. Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlena Sonn
Represented By: Roger Wayne Wenthe
Represented By: Agatha M. Cole
Represented By: Christopher Leung
Represented By: Max Ephraim Rodriguez
Represented By: Adam Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Sarah Getty
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Represented By: Matthew Savage Aibel
Represented By: Ryan D. Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASG Investments Inc.
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Represented By: Matthew Savage Aibel
Represented By: Ryan D. Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerva Office Management, Inc.
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Represented By: David Slarskey
Represented By: Mark H Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Leberman
Represented By: David Slarskey
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Represented By: Mark H Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?