Massa v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Massa
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00243
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bw
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting ECF No. #23 Stipulation to Extend Time : The parties shall file their joint case management report on or before 9/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 1, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Joint Case Management Report by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Ogata, Christian) (extend) (discovery)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. #21 Stipulation for substitution of counsel. Dawn L. Davis and Christian P. Ogata of Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. are substituted as counsel for defendant Ford Motor Company in this matter in place of Carmen G. Espinosa, Robert A. Shields, and Jason M. Avelar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
July 7, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Ford Motor Company. by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Davis, Dawn) (other) (attorney)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting ECF No. #19 Stipulation for extension of time. The parties shall file their joint case management report on or before 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Joint Case Management Report by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Davis, Dawn)
June 30, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christian Ogata on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Ogata, Christian)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than 7/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
June 2, 2022 Filing 16 CIVIL STANDING ORDER - Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00149. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received with documents numbered 1-14 received electronically. (HKL)
May 31, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred to District of District of Nevada. Files transferred electronically to: *District of District of Nevada*.. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Granting Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 05/19/2022. (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to District of Nevada by Ford Motor Company. (Espinosa, Carmen)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Espinosa, Carmen)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to vacate (ECF #9 ) is granted. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are vacated. Within three days of any denial of the forthcoming motion to transfer venue, the parties must contact Judge Schopler's chambers to reset those hearings. Alternatively, if that motion is not filed by May 19, 2022, the parties must contact Judge Schopler's chambers to reset those hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 04/19/2022. (no document attached) (mxa) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Vacate #3 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, on April 20, 2022 by Ford Motor Company. (Espinosa, Carmen)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Stephen Massa. (Cline, Brian)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Avelar on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Avelar, Jason)Attorney Jason Michael Avelar added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Stephen Massa (Cline, Brian)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (AGS): Due to an unexpected change in the Court's schedule, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to April 20, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. No further briefing is required. The parties may use the Zoom link already sent by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 03/12/2022.(no document attached) (mxa) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Ford Motor Company (Espinosa, Carmen) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice and Order: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/14/2022.(jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (ggv)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Wth Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16560104.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Carmen G. Espinosa, #3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. B - 10K Filing, #5 Exhibit Decl. Ex. C Vehicle Invoice, #6 Exhibit Decl. Ex. D - All Other Pleadings, #7 Notice Jury Demand, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:22-cv-149-AJB-AGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(ggv)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massa v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Massa
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Julian Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Mark Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Carmen G. Espinosa
Represented By: Robert A Shields
Represented By: Jason Michael Avelar
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Christian Ogata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?