Durand v. Muaro
Plaintiff: Roberto Durand
Defendant: Muaro
Case Number: 3:2022cv00338
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roberto Durand. (HKL)
August 5, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roberto Durand. (HKL)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents specified herein. Clerk shall send Plaintiff the approved form IFP application w instructions. (Form w instr attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) Fully complete IFP application, or $402 filing fee, due by 9/27/2022. Clerk shall retain the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1), but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions for Plaintiff)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HKL)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roberto Durand. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons)(HKL)
July 28, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durand v. Muaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Durand
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?