Osborne v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Wanda M. Osborne
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2022cv00396
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendant's motion to be relieved of providing a CD copy of the administrative record. (ECF No. 14.) On September 6, 2022, this Court entered an order concerning the procedure in social security cases pending before the Court. (ECF No. 9.) In that order, the Court explicitly stated that "no paper copies or CD of the administrative record shall be filed" in this case. (See ECF No. 9 at 2, n. 1.) Therefore, Defendant's motion, ECF No. 14, is DENIED as moot. In addition, the Court reminds counsel to read and review all court orders prior to filing such motions in the future. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/26/2022.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CLB)
October 26, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to be relieved of providing CD copy of the certified administrative record by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 11/9/2022. (Vafai, Sohayl)
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sohayl Vafai on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Vafai, Sohayl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda M. Osborne re ECF Nos. #8 Summons Issued as to USA, #7 Complaint. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/8/2022 (on U.S. Attorney's Office). (CJS)
September 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF Nos. #9 Order Concerning Review of Social Security Cases, 10 Notice of Docket Correction : Motions deadline incorrectly set twice. Motions due 60 days after filing of the administrative record. See PDF Order at ECF No. #9 for specifications. (no image attached) (HKL)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #9 Order Concerning Review of Social Security Cases : Motions due by 11/5/2022. (no image attached) (HKL) Modified on 9/7/2022 to terminate motions deadline (HKL).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONCERNING REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) Modified on 9/7/2022 to terminate motions deadline (HKL).
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Issued and served pursuant to ECF No. #6 Order.) (DRM)
September 6, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT by Wanda M. Osborne. (Filed by clerk pursuant to ECF No. #6 Order.) (DRM)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. The complaint shall PROCEED. The Clerk is instructed to FILE the complaint (ECF No. #2 ). The Clerk shall ISSUE summonses and SERVE the Commissioner by mailing summons and complaint via certified mail to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, and, Attorney General of United States as specified herein. (Cert Mail Nos. 7013 1710 0001 6894 0835, and 7013 1710 0001 6894 0842 respectively on 9/6/2022.) Clerk shall also ISSUE summons to the U.S. Attorney for District of Nevada deliver the summons and the complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service on U.S. Attorneys Office, Reno. (Email to USM on 9/6 /2022.) Henceforth, P shall serve D or D's attorney a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jared Walker to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/20/2022. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 6, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #2 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Wanda M. Osborne. (Walker, Jared)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wanda M. Osborne. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Walker, Jared)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AGAINST SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION by Wanda M. Osborne.. (Walker, Jared)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Wanda M. Osborne. (Walker, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda M. Osborne
Represented By: Jared T. Walker
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Sohayl Vafai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?