Teeter et al v. NewRez LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Teeter, Donald Carter, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms, aka Jodi L. Harms, aka Jodi Harms, Jodi Harms and Jodi L. Harms
Defendant: NewRez LLC, New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp. and RithmCap
Counter Defendant: Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms
Counter Claimant: Citizens Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2022cv00449
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HKL)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/18/2023. Motions due by 5/18/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 12/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
December 2, 2022 Filing 17 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms.. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Removal by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Morgan, Melanie)
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Statement in Removal Case by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Morgan, Melanie)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Counterclaim,,, Answer to Counterclaims filed by Joseph M. Teeter.(Newmark-Stephens, Sandra)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Morgan, Melanie)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #9 Stipulation. The instant action has been appropriately assigned to the unofficial Northern District of the United States District Court, District of Nevada. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/25/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I on behalf of Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra)
October 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE Disclaimer of Interest Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure by Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 Fourth STIPULATION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE by Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (other)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I on behalf of Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I on behalf of Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra)
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 Defendants' Answer to Complaint ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, and Defendant NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing's Counterclaims (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/4/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, New Residential Investment Corp., Shell Point Partners, LLC, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Citizens Bank, National Association, NewRez LLC. filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, New Residential Investment Corp., Shell Point Partners, LLC, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Citizens Bank, National Association, NewRez LLC.(Morgan, Melanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 14, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Melanie)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/13/2022. By Deputy Clerk: C. Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/28/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
October 13, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (CJS)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., Other Affiliate Caliber Homes Loans, Other Affiliate NRZ Acquisition LLC for New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap; Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC for NewRez LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing; Other Affiliate Citizens Financial Group for Citizens Bank, National Association; Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC for New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC added. (Morgan, Melanie)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV22-01306, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7079228) by New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap, Shell Point Partners, LLC, National Association, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Citizens Bank, NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Melanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teeter et al v. NewRez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Teeter
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens
Represented By: Wallace D. Stephens
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Carter
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens
Represented By: Wallace D. Stephens
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms, aka Jodi L. Harms, aka Jodi Harms
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens
Represented By: Wallace D. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Harms
Represented By: Wallace D. Stephens
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi L. Harms
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I
Represented By: Wallace D. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Point Partners, LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Investment Corp.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RithmCap
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms
Represented By: Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I
Represented By: Wallace D. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Citizens Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?