Brown v. Breitenbach et al
Petitioner: Marlon Lorenzo Brown
Respondent: N. Breitenbach and The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2023cv00148
Filed: April 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
2 Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Reconsider re ECF No. #13 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel, by Petitioner Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 6/13/2023. (DRM) (DJorder)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Disqualify Office of Attorney General (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/25/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
May 18, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to ECF No. Response re ECF No. #10 Motion to Disqualify Counsel, by Petitioner Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (DRM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Respondents N. Breitenbach, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada. Replies due by 5/19/2023. (Johnson, Matthew)
May 1, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Disqualify office of Attorney General by Petitioner Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 5/15/2023. (CJS)
April 26, 2023 Attorney update in case: Attorney Aaron D. Ford-AG withdrawn from the case. (Johnson, Matthew)
April 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew S Johnson on behalf of Respondents N. Breitenbach, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada. (Johnson, Matthew)
April 19, 2023 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Filed pursuant to Order, ECF No. #7 . Filing fee paid, ECF No. #4 .) (CJS)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to separately file the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. #1 -1). (Clerk to file in subsequent entry.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to add Aaron Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for Respondents, and to provide Respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the attorney general only. (AG added to docket and Clerk to regenerate NEFs for ECF No. 1-6.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents will have 30 days from the date of this order to appear in this action, and Respondents will have 90 days from the date of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the habeas petition (5/19/2023, 7/18/2023). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Respondents file an answer, Petitioner will have 60 days to file a reply to the answer. If Respondents file a motion to dismiss, Petitioner will have 60 days to file a response to the motion to dismiss, and then Respondents will have 30 days to file a reply to Petitioner's response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Address Extraordinary Circumstance (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
April 17, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to address extraordinary circumstance - hearing requested by Petitioner Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 5/1/2023. (CJS) (misc) (nondispositive)
April 12, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00148-RCJ-CLB. (no image attached) (EDS)
April 11, 2023 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 2-3509 (Habeas Corpus Filing Fee) (CJS)
April 11, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/11/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Sutherland. With good cause appearing, the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS)
April 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against N. Breitenbach, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:23-cv-00148-ART-CLB. (CJS)
April 10, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(CJS)
April 10, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (CJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Breitenbach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlon Lorenzo Brown
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Breitenbach
Represented By: Matthew S Johnson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Matthew S Johnson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?