Burke et al v. Lewis Investment Company of Nevada, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donanld J. Burke and Donald W. Burke
Defendant: Lewis Investment Company of Nevada, LLC, Kiley Ranch Six Apartments, LLC and Luke Dragovich
Case Number: 3:2023cv00184
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Luke Dragovich, Kiley Ranch Six Apartments, LLC, Lewis Investment Company of Nevada, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Hone, Eric)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Luke Dragovich, Kiley Ranch Six Apartments, LLC, Lewis Investment Company of Nevada, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/8/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/12/2023.(Hone, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donald W. Burke, Donanld J. Burke. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clarke, Jeremy)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Plaintiffs. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/22/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (DRM)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to al Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Kiley Ranch Six Apartments, LLC, #2 Luke Dragovich) (DRM)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7286659) by Donanld J. Burke, Donald W. Burke. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/13/2023. Proof of service due by 8/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Demand for Jury, #6 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Clarke, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Lewis Investment Company of Nevada, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donanld J. Burke
Represented By: Jeremy B. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W. Burke
Represented By: Jeremy B. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Investment Company of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Represented By: Leslie A.S. Godfrey
Represented By: Michael T. Gebhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiley Ranch Six Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Represented By: Leslie A.S. Godfrey
Represented By: Michael T. Gebhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Dragovich
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Represented By: Leslie A.S. Godfrey
Represented By: Michael T. Gebhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?