Calculated Industries, Inc. v. Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Calculated Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00188
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Motion to Extend Time : Answer to complaint due by 7/7/2023. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 9, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) up to and including July 7, 2023 re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.. Responses due by 6/23/2023. (Hoekel, Jennifer) (answer)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Motion to Extend Time. Deadline for defendant to respond/answer to ECF No. #1 Complaint due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
May 18, 2023 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) up to and including June 16, 2023 re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2023. (Hoekel, Jennifer) (answer)
May 18, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hultafors Group US Holdco LLC for Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc. added. (Hoekel, Jennifer)
May 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer E Hoekel on behalf of Defendant Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.. (Hoekel, Jennifer)
May 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calculated Industries, Inc.. Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc. served on 5/5/2023. (Zorio, Arthur)
May 5, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (DRM)
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (DRM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2023: #1 Copy of Complaint) (DRM).
May 5, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc. (DRM)
May 5, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc. by Plaintiff Calculated Industries, Inc.. (Zorio, Arthur)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Calculated Industries, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Zorio, Arthur)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7289381) by Calculated Industries, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/14/2023. Proof of service due by 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N) (Zorio, Arthur) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calculated Industries, Inc. v. Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calculated Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Represented By: Matthew D Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E Hoekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?