The S&D Family Trust, u/a/d January 30, 2008 et al v. Spracklin et al
Plaintiff: The S&D Family Trust, u/a/d January 30, 2008 and Denise Wilson
Defendant: James (Scott) Spracklin, Internal Revenue Service, Mr. Cooper, Real Time Resolutions, Inc., City of Sparks, Roger Kahn and Vicki Kahn
Case Number: 3:2023cv00392
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean Bair Kirby on behalf of Defendant Mr. Cooper. (Kirby, Sean)
September 18, 2023 Filing 16 United States' ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint for Quiet Title filed by Internal Revenue Service. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/28/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/2/2023.(Hanson, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER ADOPTING ECF No. #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/18/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
September 12, 2023 Filing 13 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs The S&D Family Trust, u/a/d January 30, 2008, Denise Wilson.. (Slaughter, Austin)
September 7, 2023 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Internal Revenue Service.. (Hanson, Stephen)
August 24, 2023 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Internal Revenue Service.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanson, Stephen)
August 16, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The S&D Family Trust, u/a/d January 30, 2008, Denise Wilson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Slaughter, Austin)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Internal Revenue Service answer due 9/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney recuses himself in this action. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall draw another Magistrate Judge to be assigned to this case. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00392-ART-CLB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 8/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
August 14, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Extend Answer Deadline re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Hanson, Stephen) (extend) (answer)
August 11, 2023 Filing 6 Case transferred in from Southern Division on 08/11/2023; Case Number 2:23-cv-1244. Case assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. Case number shall now be reflected as 3:23-cv-00392-ART-CSD. (no image attached) (CJS)
August 11, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/11/2023. Before the Court is the #1 Petition for Removal from the Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, filed by Defendants Denise Wilson, James Spracklin, Internal Revenue Service, Mr. Cooper, Real Time Resolutions, Inc., City of Sparks, Roger Khan, and Vicki Khan. Washoe County is part of the unofficial Northern Division of the District of Nevada. LR 1A 1-6. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the Northern Division.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JD)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Brody R. Wight to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/24/2023. (no image attached) (ALZ)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/10/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A. Zamora. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/25/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV23-00602, by Internal Revenue Service. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) (Hanson, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 10, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ALZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The S&D Family Trust, u/a/d January 30, 2008 et al v. Spracklin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The S&D Family Trust, u/a/d January 30, 2008
Represented By: Austin Slaughter
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wilson
Represented By: Austin Slaughter
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (Scott) Spracklin
Represented By: Clifton Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Stephen Hanson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Represented By: Nathaniel E Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?