Kerr et al v. Northern Nevada Family Dental et al
Plaintiff: Terry Kerr and Dennis Kerr
Defendant: Northern Nevada Family Dental, Pinnacle Medical Group, Prominence Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Bonneville County Recorder, PHH Mortgage Services and Aldride Pite, LLP
Case Number: 3:2023cv00418
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE/"Additional Allegations of Bias and Misconduct, by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr. (DLS)
October 23, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #33 Response by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mercado, Alice)
October 23, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #33 Response by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mercado, Alice)
October 23, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group. Responses due by 11/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mercado, Alice) (answer)
October 23, 2023 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mercado, Alice)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #30 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Sam Angell and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/20/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
October 20, 2023 Filing 45 EXHIBIT - Certificate of Good Standing - to #30 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Bonneville County Recorder.. (Lawrence, Nathan)
October 20, 2023 Filing 44 JOINDER to #36 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Aldride Pite, LLP.. (Ehlers, Richard)
October 20, 2023 Filing 43 JOINDER to #35 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Aldride Pite, LLP.. (Ehlers, Richard)
October 20, 2023 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aldride Pite, LLP. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ehlers, Richard)
October 20, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard Samuel Ehlers on behalf of Defendant Aldride Pite, LLP. (Ehlers, Richard)
October 20, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #39 Certificate of Interested Parties. Attorney Zane R. Geller advised to review and comply with LR IA 11-1 and LR IC 2-1. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 19, 2023 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Prominence Insurance. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Webster, Ken)
October 19, 2023 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/19/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #35 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 18, 2023 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by PHH Mortgage Services that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Services added. (Allison, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2023 Filing 36 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #35 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant PHH Mortgage Services.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-16)(Allison, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant PHH Mortgage Services. Responses due by 11/1/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/28/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/2/2023. (Allison, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 18, 2023 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/18/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #31 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 17, 2023 Filing 33 RESPONSE Answer to ECF Nos. #21 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr. Replies due by 10/24/2023. (DRM)
October 17, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Prominence Insurance. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Webster, Ken)
October 17, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant Prominence Insurance. Responses due by 10/31/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/27/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/1/2023. (Webster, Ken) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 16, 2023 Filing 30 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sam L. Angell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan Edward Lawrence (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7460862) by Defendant Bonneville County Recorder. (Lawrence, Nathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bonneville County Recorder. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Lawrence, Nathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nathan Edward Lawrence on behalf of Defendant Bonneville County Recorder. (Lawrence, Nathan)
October 10, 2023 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Bonneville County Recorder served on 9/11/2023. (DLS)
October 6, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr re ECF No. #1 Complaint. PHH Mortgage Services served on 9/27/2023. (DLS)
October 6, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #23 Minute Order regarding Requirements of Klingele, by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group.. (Mercado, Alice)
October 5, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #21 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group.. (Mercado, Alice)
October 5, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/5/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #21 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
October 5, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pinnacle Medical Group. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Mercado, Alice)
October 5, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Pinnacle Medical Group. Responses due by 10/19/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/15/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/19/2023. (Mercado, Alice) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 5, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/5/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #17 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Northern Nevada Family Dental.. (Cardinale, Paul)
October 4, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Northern Nevada Family Dental. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Cardinale, Paul)
October 4, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant Northern Nevada Family Dental. Responses due by 10/18/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/14/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/18/2023. (Cardinale, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/3/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #12 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Monday, November 13, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMC)
October 2, 2023 Filing 14 CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMC)
October 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Sam L. Angell to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/16/2023. (no image attached) (CJS)
October 2, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bonneville County Recorder. Responses due by 10/16/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/12/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Cover letter)(DLS) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 29, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr. Allstate served on 9/18/2023. (Duplicate of ECF No. #10 with Clerk Stamp). (DLS)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Allstate Insurance served on 9/18/2023. (DLS)
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr re #1 Complaint. Northern Nevada Family Dental served on 9/13/2023. (CT)
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr re #1 Complaint. Prominence Insurance served on 9/12/2023. (CT)
September 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr re #1 Complaint. Pinnacle Medical Group served on 9/14/2023. (CT)
September 1, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET to ECF No. #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Terry Kerr. (DLS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Complaint. Attorney Terry Kerr advised to review and comply with LR 3-1 and file a properly completed civil cover sheet. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigants. (DRM)
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Intake customer - copies of summons not taken due to Clerk's error). (DLS)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00 Civil Filing Fee Paid, receipt number 3-0303. (DLS)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 Paid; Receipt #3-0303) by Dennis Kerr, Terry Kerr. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/4/2023. Proof of service due by 11/23/2023. (DLS)
August 25, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (GA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerr et al v. Northern Nevada Family Dental et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Nevada Family Dental
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Medical Group
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Represented By: Edward J. Lemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prominence Insurance
Represented By: Tyson J Dobbs
Represented By: Ken M Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonneville County Recorder
Represented By: Nathan Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldride Pite, LLP
Represented By: Richard Samuel Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?