Black Road Properties, LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Kyle Krch and Black Road Properties, LLC
Defendant: Sandra Krch, Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper and Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Champion Mortgage and Right Path Loans doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 3:2023cv00557
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE Removal of Lis Pendens by Black Road Properties, LLC, Kyle Krch, Sandra Krch.. (Wray, Mark)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Black Road Properties, LLC, Kyle Krch, Sandra Krch. Replies due by 12/22/2023. (Wray, Mark)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 12/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Kirby, Sean)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean Bair Kirby on behalf of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kirby, Sean)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kyle Krch, Sandra Krch. No changes to parties. (Wray, Mark)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/13/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/28/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 13, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub 1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub 2 LLC, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper added.. (Wight, Brody)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, Case Number CV23-01789, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7489969) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wight, Brody) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Road Properties, LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Krch
Represented By: Mark D Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Road Properties, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Krch
Represented By: Mark D Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Champion Mortgage and Right Path Loans doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?