Nunn v. Ely State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Noel Nunn
Defendant: Ely State Prison, City of Ely, County of White Pine, Nevada Department of Corrections and State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2023cv00572
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (GA)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (LG)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff will submit a complaint to this Court on or before January 16, 2024. The Clerk of the Court will send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint and instructions for the same. The Clerk of the Court will also send Plaintiff a copy of his ex parte motion for appointment of counsel and affidavit of harassment lawsuit (ECF No. #1 -1). The Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA ESP LAW LIBRARY). On or before January 16, 2024, Plaintiff will either pay the full filing fee or file a fully complete IFP Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 1-1, #2 Complaint Forms, #3 IFP Forms)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LG)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE no motion IFP or filing fee was received with case initiating documents filed by Tyrone Noel Nunn. (Attachments: #1 mtn and afdvt)(LG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/17/2023) (DRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunn v. Ely State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Noel Nunn
Represented By: Law Library - Ely State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ely State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of White Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?