McDaniel v. Garrett et al
Petitioner: Nicholas McDaniel
Respondent: Timothy Garrett and The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2024cv00074
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 3-0511 pursuant to ECF No. #4 Order. (GA)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE/Duplicate Copies of ECF No. #1 received via LCC Law Library, by Nicholas McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel)(DLS)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Screening of petition is deferred. Clerk is instructed to send Petitioner a blank form IFP application for inmates, instructions, and a courtesy copy of this order. (IFP form attached hereto for distribution to P via LCC law library.) Clerk shall retain, but not file at this time, the petition. Within 45 days of the date of this order (4/19/2024), Petitioner must file an IFP application as detailed herein, or pay $5 filing fee (P must arrange to have a copy of this order attached to any check for the filing fee.) Failure to comply with this order within 45 days (4/19/2024) will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further advance notice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Courtesy (2nd) Copy of Order for Plaintiff, #2 IFP application w instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Timothy Garrett, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:24-cv-00074-LRH-CLB. (DLS)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Nicholas McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel)(DLS)
February 13, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Garrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicholas McDaniel
Represented By: Law Library - Lovelock CC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?