Tyner v. Dzurenda
Plaintiff: Gary W. Tyner
Defendant: J. Dzurenda, William Quenga, Kenneth L. Williams, R. Benson and Martin Naughton
Case Number: 3:2024cv00520
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Gary W. Tyner. (DLS)
November 25, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Gary W. Tyner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (DLS)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until December 19, 2024, to submit a signed complaint to this Court. This action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order. Notice of Compliance is due by 12/19/2024. The Clerk's Office is directed to send Plaintiff Gary Tyner the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint and instructions for the same. (Sent on 11/19/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/19/2024. (For Distribution by law library.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form with Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Gary W. Tyner. (DLS)
November 18, 2024 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (For Distribution by law library.) (DRM)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/18/2024. Plaintiff Gary W. Tyner with Inmate Number 33401 is an inmate in the custody of the Nevada Department of Corrections (NDOC) and is housed at Northern Nevada Correctional Center. Plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis to the court. Plaintiff authorizes the NDOC to provide a copy of their trust fund account statement for activity covering the last six months to this court. The NDOC is ORDERED to file directly with the court the following documents pertaining to Plaintiff Gary W. Tyner: (a) current account balance, (b) average monthly account balance, and (c) average monthly deposits for the last six months by email to #docketreno@nvd.uscourts.gov. A copy of this order has been electronically sent to NDOC. (no image attached) (For Distribution by law library.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (NNCC), by Plaintiff Gary W. Tyner. (No complaint submitted with IFP.) (DRM)
November 18, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyner v. Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Quenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Tyner
Represented By: Law Library - Northern NV CC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?