Doe v. City of Albuquerque Featured Case

Can sex offenders be banned from a public library?

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Case Number: 1:2008cv01041
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Lorenzo F. Garcia
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brendan K. Egan (Egan, Brendan)
June 10, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Schauer Ives on behalf of John Doe (Ives, Laura)
May 12, 2010 Filing 73 LETTER to USCA re briefing schedule for 68 Notice of Appeal. (pg)
May 12, 2010 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by appellant indicating that a transcript is not necessary for the notice of appeal. (pg)
April 29, 2010 Filing 71 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number Alb 11586 re 68 Notice of Appeal filed by City of Albuquerque (pg)
April 28, 2010 Filing 70 USCA Case Number 10-2102 for 68 Notice of Appeal filed by City of Albuquerque. (pg)
April 28, 2010 Filing 69 Transmission of Preliminary Record for Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 68 (pg)
April 28, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 62 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 63 Judgment, 57 Memorandum Opinion and Order by City of Albuquerque. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment) (Wheeler, Gregory)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo Granting 66 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Relating to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Plaintiff's Bill of Costs (jab)
April 19, 2010 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES AND PLAINTIFFS BILL OF COSTS by John Doe. (Davis, Philip)
April 15, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip B. Davis on behalf of John Doe (Davis, Philip)
April 14, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Bienvenu on behalf of John Doe (Bienvenu, John)
March 31, 2010 Filing 63 JUDGMENT by District Judge M. Christina Armijo in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant (cbe)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment (cbe) Modified document type on 4/16/2010 (rw).
March 31, 2010 Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER at the direction of District Judge M. Christina Armijo: Pretrial Conference is HEREBY RESET for 4/7/2010 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](cbe)
March 17, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brendan Egan (Egan, Brendan)
January 27, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Schauer Ives on behalf of John Doe (Ives, Laura)
November 20, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Address by George L Bach, Jr (Bach, George)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo Denying Defendant City of Albuquerque's Motion and Consolidated Memorandum to Dismiss. (jab)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER SCHEDULING BENCH TRIAL by District Judge M. Christina Armijo: Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 4/13/2010. Bench Trial is hereby set for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Call of the Calendar is hereby set for 5/6/2010 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Pretrial Conference is hereby set for 4/6/2010 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. (Attachments: # 1 Trial Prep Instructions)(jc)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo granting 54 Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Setting (jab)
July 28, 2009 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting as Set Forth in the Court's Minute Order Scheduling Bench Trial (Doc. 53, entered July 22, 2009) by John Doe. (Egan, Brendan)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER SCHEDULING BENCH TRIAL by District Judge M. Christina Armijo: Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 2/9/2010. Bench Trial is hereby set for 3/8/2010 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Call of the Calendar is hereby set for 3/4/2010 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Pretrial Conference is hereby set for 2/2/2010 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. (Attachments: # 1 Trial Prep Instructions)(jc)
July 16, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by John Doe re 43 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Doe (Egan, Brendan)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo granting 49 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitations[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](jab)
July 10, 2009 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiff's forthcoming Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by John Doe. (Egan, Brendan)
July 2, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE by John Doe of Agreed Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Egan, Brendan)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo Granting 45 City's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline and Page Limit Regarding City's Forthcoming Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/29/2009 [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](jab)
May 15, 2009 Filing 43 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Doe. (Egan, Brendan)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo granting 41 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. (jab)
May 7, 2009 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's forthcoming Memorandum in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment by John Doe. (Egan, Brendan)
May 5, 2009 Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER 39 by Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. (clm)
May 4, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE by John Doe of Unavailability of Counsel May 28 and May 29, 2009 (Egan, Brendan) Modified/inserted unavailable dates on 5/5/2009 (ln).
April 12, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE by John Doe of Unavailability of Counsel from May 21, 2009-June 2, 2009 (Bach, George) Modified/inserted on 4/13/2009 (ln).
April 10, 2009 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts III and VII in the Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by John Doe (Egan, Brendan)
April 6, 2009 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe Answers and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Egan, Brendan)
March 20, 2009 Filing 32 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia on 3/19/2009. (mw)
March 19, 2009 Filing 31 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR 3rd NOTICE Re-Setting Hearing:(clm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 3/19/2009 (kd).
March 13, 2009 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe of Plaintiff John Doe's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant City of Albuquerque (Egan, Brendan)
March 11, 2009 Filing 28 2nd NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Tel. Status Conference re-set for 3/19/09 at 2:00 before Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. (clm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 11, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing: Tel. Status Conference REset for 3:00 on 3/18/09 before Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. (clm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 3, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Tel. Status Conference set for 3/18/09 at 10:00 before Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. The Court will initiate the call. (clm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 26, 2009 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe of Second Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Admission (Egan, Brendan)
February 13, 2009 Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 22 by Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. (clm)
January 15, 2009 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant City of Albuquerque (Egan, Brendan)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT and Provisional Discovery Plan 16 by Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. (clm)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. Discovery 4/15/09; Discovery Motions 5/5/09; Pretrial Motions 5/15/09. (clm)
January 15, 2009 Filing 18 CLERK'S MINUTES. Scheduling Conference conducted by Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia on 1/15/09 at 9:00. (clm)
January 5, 2009 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) (Egan, Brendan)
December 12, 2008 Filing 14 NOTICE by John Doe of UNAVAILABILITY of counsel from December 26, 2008 through January 2, 2009 (Bach, George) Modified dates on 12/16/2008 (ln).
December 9, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by City of Albuquerque re 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Consolidated Memorandum filed by City of Albuquerque (Wheeler, Gregory)
December 3, 2008 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Consolidated Memorandum filed by City of Albuquerque. (Wheeler, Gregory)
December 1, 2008 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia. Joint Status Report due by 1/12/09. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/09 at 9:00. (clm)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia granting 8 Motion for Protective Order Permitting Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonym (lmg)
November 20, 2008 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Consolidated Memorandum filed by John Doe. (Bach, George)
November 17, 2008 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by John Doe. (Bach, George)
November 10, 2008 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Matthew J. Dykman, District Judge M. Christina Armijo added Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez no longer assigned to case. (ctd)
November 7, 2008 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 5384 (nm)
November 7, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Refusal to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by John Doe (Bach, George)
November 6, 2008 Filing 4 Letter re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge (nm)
November 6, 2008 Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia assigned. (nm)
November 6, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Consolidated Memorandum by Albuquerque,City of. (Wheeler, Gregory)
November 6, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE by Albuquerque,City of Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court Record, # 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Wheeler, Gregory)
November 6, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Albuquerque,City of from Second Judicial District Court, case number CV 2008-10657. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Albuquerque,City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint)(Wheeler, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. City of Albuquerque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Gregory S. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Maureen A Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?