Wilson v. Montano et al
Plaintiff: Michael Wilson, Sr.
Defendant: Lawrence Montano, FNU Torres, John Doe, Joe Chavez and Rene Rivera
Case Number: 1:2011cv00658
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Valencia
Presiding Judge: Bruce D. Black
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough on 251 Motion to Dismiss filed by Joe Chavez, Rene Rivera, Lawrence Montano, and 237 Joint Motion for Sanctions filed by Dan Robb, Joe Chavez, Rene Rivera , Louis Burkhard, Mike Chavez, Derek Williams, Joseph Chavez. Objections to PFRD due by 2/2/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (hm)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 157 Defendant Roy Cordova's Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of an Answer. (tah)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Asserted Against Defendant Dan Robb. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Montano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wilson, Sr.
Represented By: Matthew Coyte
Represented By: Jack Bennett Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Montano
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Torres
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Chavez
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Rivera
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?