Welch v. City of Albuquerque et al
Plaintiff: Terysa M. Welch
Defendant: City of Albuquerque, Raymond Schultz, Elizabeth Paiz, William Roseman, Joseph Hudson, David Hubbard, Robert Smith, Cecil Knox, J. R. Potter, Kevin Gagne, Sue Neal and John Does
Case Number: 1:2011cv00700
Filed: August 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Sandoval
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Presiding Judge: Robert Hayes Scott
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 462 Joint Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Claims With Prejudice. (tah)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 7/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying as moot 352 Defendants' Motion in Limine and Memorandum of Law to Exclude All References to Any Defendant's General Reputation or Reputation for Any Particular Trait of Character. (tah)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales regarding Defendants' oral Rule 50 motion and denying 436 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (tah)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 PRETRIAL ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 5/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. REMINDER: Judge Gonzales' Meet-Me Line can only accommodate up to five (5) telephone lines, including the Courts; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (tah)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 94 AND 95 by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 373 Joint Motion to Dismiss Count IV Against David Hubbard with Prejudice. Defendant David Hubbard terminated. (tah)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 317 Plaintiff's Opposed Request to Hold Trial in Albuquerque. (tah)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 3/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 338 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Esteban A. Aguilar, Sr. and Esteban Angel Aguilar, Jr. terminated. (tah)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 1/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 317 Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial. The request to hold the trial in Albuquerque is taken under advisement. (tah)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying without prejudice 230 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Portions of Counts I, III, and IV and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Amended motion for partial summary judgment due 5/2/2017. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. City of Albuquerque et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terysa M. Welch
Represented By: Esteban A. Aguilar, Sr.
Represented By: Esteban Angel Aguilar, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Schultz
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Paiz
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Roseman
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hudson
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hubbard
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smith
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Knox
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. R. Potter
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Gagne
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Neal
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Michael I. Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Trafican
Represented By: Rebecca E. Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?