Wagner v. Levann, et al.
Plaintiff: Judith A. Wagner
Defendant: Merrion Family Limited Partnership, Irene Tarro, We Investments, LLC, Thomas McNaughton, Herbert Beatty, Demosthenes Durano, Maryam Jafari, Ronald Heggem, Durano Enterprises, Ltd., Dolores Sala, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Doris Lacy, Gary Forster, Audrey Napoleon, Cynthia Etkind, Larry Etkind, Andy Feld, Vicki Frank, Barbara White, Christina Forster, Shirley Herndon, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Robert L. Turner, Ronald Frank, Peymaneh Pour, Steven Johnson, Lyman S. Atchley, William Hilliard, Virginia Causey, Julius Wollen, Edith Tarbescu-Deutschmann, Durano Construction, Diane Wollen, Cheryl Johnson, Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Mark Dahrling, Mostafa Jafari, Lois Ario, Vicki Heckl, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Julie C. Louie, Melika Jafari, Victor Rosenthal, William Galbreth, Ronald P. Heggem CPA, P.C., Sharareh Shahin, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Rachel Hanyeh, Sherry Etkind, Jill Plaman, John Takacs, William E. Galbreth D.M.D., P.C. 401(k) Plan, Vahid Deriss, Marsha J. Mowery, Douglas Jones, Talia Etkind, Francis Hovorka, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marianne Montero, Janice Dorn, William Galbreth Defined Benefit Plan, Megan Etkind, Nancy Fenton, Michael Plaman, Jerry Davis, James Richards, Connie Davis, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Maria Etkind, Michael Menke, Orese Fahey, David Defuria, Jonathan Levann, Daniel Fenton, Melissa Pickett, Ruth Jones, David L. Louie, William E. Galbreth D.M.D., P.C., Alameda Greenhouses & Nursery, Inc., Dennis Fahey, Daniel R. Mowery, Glenda Durano, Said Bandi, Amber Etkind, Deborah Davis, Jules Appelman, ADF Financial, Inc., Maura Dahrling, Esther Goldberg, Steven Pazand, Brian Fahey, New Mexico Accounting Specialists, Inc., Marteza Jafari, Marie Yeh, Dahrling Enterprises, Inc., Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., John Wilger, Zahra Jafari, Ilene Spector, Meredith Lowry, Abdul Dabiri, Mojtaba Jafari, Laurie Montero, F.R. (Frank) Heckl, Joan Dike, Joshua Etkind, Shahla Bandi, Michael Rosenberg, William Galbreth as Trustee of the William E. Galbreth D.M.D. P.C. Defined Benefit Plan, Evelyn King, Emily Rosenberg, Farzaneh Jafari, The William Galbrethl Defined Benefit Plan, Adelina Graef, Steven S. Etkind, Scott O'Hara, Donald Lacy, Richard Johnson, William Galbreth as Trustee of the William E. Galbreth D.M.D. P.C. 401(k) Plan, Gregory Carey, Betty Berry, Julie Feld, Deanna Lacy, The William E. Galbreth D.M.D., P.C. 401(k) Plan, Joe Wickert and Janice Heggem
Undetermined: Merrie Chappell Law PC, Dr. David Wollen and Becker & Poliakoff LLP
Case Number: 1:2012cv00817
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 UNOPPOSED AND DEFAULT ORDER ON JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S UNOPPOSED TRAVERSE OF AMENDED ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT by District Judge William P. Johnson. (Wagner v. Mark Dahrling CV 12-529 WJ/SMV) (kg)
November 13, 2017 Filing 1168 Unopposed TRAVERSE of Amended Answer to Writ of Garnishment by Yvette J. Gonzales, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Douglas F. Vaughan Bankruptcy Estate re #1163 Application for Writ of Garnishment,., filed by Judith A. Wagner. Related document: #1163 Application for Writ of Garnishment, filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Wagner v. Dahrling CV 12-529 WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 11/14/2017 (kg).
October 24, 2017 Filing 1167 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Filing of Amended Answer by Garnishee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Wager v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (White, Daniel) Modified on 10/25/2017 (rh).
October 10, 2017 Filing 1166 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Filing Answer by Garnishee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Wager v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (White, Daniel) Modified on 10/10/2017 (rh).
August 16, 2017 Filing 1165 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Yvette J. Gonzales (CV 12-529 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #1163 Application for Writ of Garnishment, filed by Judith A. Wagner. (CV 12-529 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 3, 2017 Filing 1163 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Yvette J. Gonzales, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Douglas Vaughan Bankruptcy Estate, Garnishee), (Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel) Modified on 8/11/2017 (rh).
August 3, 2017 Filing 1162 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel A White (White, Daniel)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by District Judge William P. Johnson. (Original Case No. Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 12, 2017 Filing 1160 MOTION to Dismiss Case No. 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson. (Original Case No. Wagner v. Berry CV 12-541 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson finding as moot #1057 Motion to Alter Judgment filed as to (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241)(Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-300)(Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-301)(Wagner v. Yeh; 12-cv-303)(Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391)(Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-754). THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (mag)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Wagner v. Bandi CV 12-391 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Fenton CV 12-241 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Levann CV 12-187 WJ/SMV) (kg)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #919 and #1001 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney in Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV. Merrie L. Chappell and Helen Chaitman are permitted to withdraw as attorneys for Defendants Abdul Dabiri; ADF Financial, Inc.; Hossein Alaghe Bandi; and Shahla Bandi a/k/a Shahla Zolfaghari. (am) Modified text on 5/29/2015 (sju)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #1146 Motion to Dismiss Case No. 12-CV-00391 as to Certain Defendants. (mag)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1152 STATUS REPORT in Accordance with Stipulated Order Staying Case Deadlines Pending Approval of Settlements by United States Bankruptcy Court (Levann, 12-CV-00187; Fenton, 12-CV-00241; Bandi,12-CV-00391) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 1151 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge William P. Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2015 re #1146 MOTION to Dismiss Case No. 12-CV-00391 as to Certain Defendants filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Court Reporter M. Loughran) (kg)
April 21, 2015 Filing 1150 NOTICE of Settlement Pending (Wagner v. Fenton; Case No. 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Lacy CV 12-547-WJ-SMV) (kg)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner re #1146 MOTION to Dismiss Case No. 12-CV-00391 as to Certain Defendants, #1147 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1147 NOTICE of Hearing on #1146 MOTION to Dismiss Case No. 12-CV-00391 as to Certain Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 540 Bonito Courtroom before District Judge William P. Johnson. (mag)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1146 MOTION to Dismiss Case No. 12-CV-00391 as to Certain Defendants by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ortiz, Jacqueline)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Jafari CV 12-300 WJ/SMV) (kg)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Dahrling CV 12-529 WJ/SMV) (kg)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Yeh CV 12-303 WJ/SMV) (kg)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar STAYING Case Deadlines Pending Approval of Settlements by United States Bankruptcy Court. The deadlines contained in #1137 Fifth Stipulated Order modifying scheduling order and extending deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are stayed for 70 days. The stay will automatically lift on May 11, 2015. (Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV; Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV; Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV; Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (ect)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING AS MOOT #1001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The case Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV, has settled. Therefore, the motion is denied as moot. (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING AS MOOT #919 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. The case Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV, has settled. Therefore, the motion is denied as moot. (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
February 5, 2015 Filing 1139 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Ansari CV 12-301 WJ/SMV) (kg)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 FIFTH STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING certain discovery deadlines and EXTENDING the deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV; Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV. (ect)
January 27, 2015 Filing 1136 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. LeVann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
January 27, 2015 Filing 1135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. LeVann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1134 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
January 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar denying #1007 Motion to Quash. Having reviewed the parties' submissions and the relevant law, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, the Court finds that the Motion is not well-taken and shall be DENIED. The Court makes the following findings with respect to the documents Plaintiff wishes to subpoena: (1) The documents are not privileged; (2) the documents are relevant to the subject matter of this action; (3) there is a compelling need for the documents because the information contained therein is not otherwise readily available; (4) Defendants have not shown that production of the documents will subject them to annoyance, embarrassment, oppression, or undue burden or expense. The Motion, therefore is hereby DENIED. Plaintiff may re-subpoena the documents in question pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees in connection with this Motion. (Wagner v. Jafari 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (SMV) Modified text on 1/20/2015 (sju)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar granting #1069 Motion to Quash. Having reviewed the parties' submissions and the relevant law, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, the Court finds that the Motion is well-taken and shall be GRANTED. The subpoena in question is hereby quashed, and Defendants are prohibited from conducting discovery on Plaintiff's personal employment records. (Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Levann 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Jafari 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (SMV) Modified text on 1/20/2015 (sju)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar granting #1023 Motion for Protective Order. Having reviewed the parties' submissions and the relevant law, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, the Court finds that the Motion is well-taken and shall be GRANTED. Defendants are prohibited from conducting discovery on Plaintiff's personal employment records. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Levann 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Jafari 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (SMV) Modified text on 1/20/2015 (sju)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar granting #1000 Motion for Protective Order. Having reviewed the parties' submissions and the relevant law, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, the Court finds that the Motion is well-taken and shall be GRANTED. The deposition of Shahla Bandi is continued until after the Court rules on counsel's Motion to Withdraw [Doc. 1001]. Plaintiff shall not attempt to reschedule Ms. Bandi's deposition without first obtaining permission from the Court. The parties are to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (SMV) Modified text on 1/20/2015 (sju)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar granting in part and denying in part #997 Motion to Compel. Having reviewed the parties' submissions and the relevant law, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, the Court makes the following rulings: (1) The Motion is DENIED as moot with respect to Shahla Bandi; (2) The Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part with respect to Maryam Bandi and Hamid Bandi. They will not be ordered to provide notarized verifications or declarations pursuant to 28 U.S. C. 1746. However, they will be bound by their Discovery Responses. That is, they and their attorneys will be precluded at trial from introducing any evidence, making any argument, or taking any position contrary to the Discovery Responses; (3) The Motion is DENIED as moot with respect to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission to Hamid Bandi and Maryam Bandi; (4) the Motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks an order holding that Hamid Bandi and Maryam Bandi have waived their rights to object to the Discovery Requests; and (5) Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees is DENIED. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (SMV) Modified text on 1/20/2015 (sju)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING AS MOOT #1006 Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order. The case settled; therefore, the motion is denied as moot. (Wagner v. Yeh, 12-cv-0303 WJ/SMV). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar granting #1126 Motion. Defendant's Motion For Entry of an Order...Cancelling the Settlement Conference [Doc. 1126] is hereby GRANTED. The settlement conference scheduled for January 13, 2015, is hereby vacated and will not be rescheduled at this time. (Wagner v. LeVann CV 12-0187 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (SMV) Modified text on 12/31/2014 (sju)
December 29, 2014 Filing 1126 MOTION for Entry of an Order Permitting Defendant to Attend Settlement Conference by Telephone or, Alternatively, Cancelling the Settlement Conference by Jonathan Levann. (Wagner v. LeVann CV 12-187 WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 12/30/2014 (kg).
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #1108 Order Setting a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV. The Settlement Conference set for January 13, 2015, will begin at 9:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1123 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1124 Clerk's Minutes for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 16, 2014, for Wagner v. Yeh, 12-cv-0303 WJ/SMV. The case settled. (ect)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1121 NOTICE of Settlement Pending, Wagner v. Abbas Ansari and Peymaneh Pour 12-CV-301-WJ/SMV by Judith A. Wagner (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. Wagner v. Plaman CV 12-496 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1122 Clerk's Minutes for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 11, 2014, in Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV. The case did not settle. (ect)
December 9, 2014 Filing 1119 Clerk's Minutes for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 9, 2014, for Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV. The case did not settle. (ect)
December 9, 2014 Filing 1118 Clerk's Minutes for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 9, 2014, in Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-0301 WJ/SMV. The case did not settle. (ect)
December 4, 2014 Filing 1117 Clerk's Minutes for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 4, 2014, for the case Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV. The case did not settle. (ect)
December 4, 2014 Filing 1116 Clerk's Minutes for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 4, 2014, for the case Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV. The case settled. (ect)
December 4, 2014 Filing 1115 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Change of Address by Merrie L Chappell (Chappell, Merrie) Modified text on 12/4/2014 (mjr).
December 4, 2014 Filing 1114 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Change of Address by Merrie L Chappell (Chappell, Merrie) Modified text on 12/4/2014 (mjr).
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case Wagner v. Etkind, No. CV 12-754 WJ/SMV) (kg) Modified text on 12/2/2014 (sju)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1112 NOTICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Notice of Bankruptcy Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV (Burns, James) Modified text on 11/21/2014 (sju)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV, for December 4, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque, New Mexico. (am)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1110 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Filing of Bankruptcy by Defendants Richard & Cheryl Johnson (Wagner v. Johnson 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 FILED IN ERROR - AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV, for December 4, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque, New Mexico. (am) Modified to add error text on 11/20/2014 (sju)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #1085 Order Setting a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV. The Settlement Conference set for December 4, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for January 13, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (ect)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1107 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on November 12, 2014. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (Tape #Liberty - Dona Ana) (ect)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1106 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Gorchkova on behalf of Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Vahid Deriss, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh (Gorchkova, Julie)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-203 WJ/SMV) (kg)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a telephonic status conference for November 12, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. MST. To connect to the proceedings, counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Teleconference Line at (215) 446-3656, using code 4382538. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV) (ect)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-207 WJ/SMV) (kg)
November 4, 2014 Filing 1102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1069 MOTION to Quash SUBPOENAS TO MEYNERS & COMPANY, LLC AND CLIFTON LARSON ALLEN LLP DATED SEPTEMBER 22, 2014 AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING REQUEST NO. 2 THEREOF (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1100 Letter RESPONSE re #1086 Order, Set Hearings, #1085 Order, Set Hearings filed by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Jonathan Levann. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV; Wagner v. Fenton 12cv0241 WJ/SMV) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 11/4/2014 (kg). Modified text on 11/4/2014 (sju)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #1015 Motion to Strike Unauthorized Pleadings Filed on Behalf of Defendants Abdul Dabiri, ADF Financial, Inc. and Hossein Alaghe Bandi (CV 12-391 WJ/SMV) (kg)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #1089 Order Setting a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV. The location of the settlement conference set for December 11, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. is changed from the Gila Courtroom to Albuquerque - Visiting Judges' Chambers, Suite 720, 7th Floor. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #1088 Order Setting a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV. The location of the settlement conference set for December 9, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. is changed from the Gila Courtroom to Albuquerque - Visiting Judges' Chambers, Suite 720, 7th Floor. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #1087 Order Setting a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-0301 WJ/SMV. The location of the settlement conference set for December 9, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. is changed from the Gila Courtroom to Albuquerque - Visiting Judges' Chambers, Suite 720, 7th Floor. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 FOURTH STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING certain discovery deadlines and EXTENDING the deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Levann, No. 12-cv-0187; Fenton, No. 12-cv-0241; Jafari, No. 12-cv-0300; Ansari, No. 12-cv-0301; Yeh, No. 12-cv-0303; Bandi, No. 12-cv-0391; Plaman, No. 12-cv-0496; and Etkind, No. 12-cv-0754. (ect)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1094 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Bank of America Subpoena Response (Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #1090 Order Setting a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV. The case has settled, so the settlement conference set for December 16, 2014, at 8:30 a.m is VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ect)
October 23, 2014 Filing 1092 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Yeh, 12-cv-0303 WJ/SMV, for December 16, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV, for December 16, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV, for December 11, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV, for December 9, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-0301 WJ/SMV, for December 9, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV, for December 4, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV, for December 4, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (ect)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1084 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Abbas Ansari, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh re #1057 MOTION to Alter Judgment and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241)(Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-300)(Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-301)(Wagner v. Yeh; 12-cv-303)(Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391)(Wagner v. E filed by Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Nancy Fenton, Daniel Fenton, Mostafa Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Steven S. Etkind, Melika Jafari, Sherry Etkind, Abbas Ansari, Talia Etkind, Said Bandi, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Farzaneh Jafari, Marie Yeh, Marteza Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1083 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on October 21, 2014. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-0301 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Yeh, 12-cv-0303 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV) (Tape #Liberty - Dona Ana) (ect)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1082 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1069 MOTION to Quash SUBPOENAS TO MEYNERS & COMPANY, LLC AND CLIFTON LARSON ALLEN LLP DATED SEPTEMBER 22, 2014 AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING REQUEST NO. 2 THEREOF (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v., #1070 MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO MEYNERS & COMPANY, LLC AND CLIFTON LARSON ALLEN LLP DATED SEPTEMBER 22, 2014 AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING REQUEST NO. 2 THEREOF (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wa (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-187) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-241) (Wagner v. Jafari et al; 12-cv-300) (Wagner v. Ansari et al; 12-cv-301) (Wagner v Yeh, et al; 12-cv-303) (Wagner v. Bandi, et al; 12-cv-391) (Wagner v. Etkind, et al; 12-cv-754) filed by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Vahid Deriss, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chaitman, Helen)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1081 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1057 MOTION to Alter Judgment and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241)(Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-300)(Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-301)(Wagner v. Yeh; 12-cv-303)(Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391)(Wagner v. E (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241)(Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-300)(Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-301)(Wagner v. Yeh; 12-cv-303)(Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391)(Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-754) filed by Abbas Ansari, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Chaitman, Helen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1080 RESPONSE in Opposition re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un /Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Discovery Motion and Request For Amendment Of Admissions Pursuant to Rule 36(b) filed by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 10/21/2014 (sju)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1079 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 THIRD STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING certain discovery deadlines and EXTENDING the deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Levann, No. 12-cv-0187; Fenton, No. 12-cv-0241; Jafari, No. 12-cv-0300; Ansari, No. 12-cv-0301; Yeh, No. 12-cv-0303; Bandi, No. 12-cv-0391; Plaman, No. 12-cv-0496; and Etkind, No. 12-cv-0754 (am)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1077 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1076 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiffs Second Voluntary Disclosure (Wagner v. Lacy 12-CV-547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1075 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Fourth Supplement to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-187-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1074 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson establishing transfer amounts (Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV) (mag) Modified text on 10/10/2014 (sju)
October 8, 2014 Filing 1072 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Melvyn D. Baron by Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari. (Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV) (Chappell, Merrie) Modified text on 10/9/2014 (sju)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1071 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1057 MOTION to Alter Judgment and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241)(Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-300)(Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-301)(Wagner v. Yeh; 12-cv-303)(Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391)(Wagner v. E tkind 12-cv-754) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1070 "FILED IN ERROR" Duplicate of document #1069 MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO MEYNERS & COMPANY, LLC AND CLIFTON LARSON ALLEN LLP DATED SEPTEMBER 22, 2014 AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING REQUEST NO. 2 THEREOF (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel) Modified text to include error message on 10/14/2014 (bap).
October 7, 2014 Filing 1069 MOTION to Quash SUBPOENAS TO MEYNERS & COMPANY, LLC AND CLIFTON LARSON ALLEN LLP DATED SEPTEMBER 22, 2014 AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING REQUEST NO. 2 THEREOF (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1068 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #1023 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Request No. 2 of Subpoena to Meyners & Company, LLC Dated August 26, 2014 (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV filed by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
October 6, 2014 Filing 1067 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1023 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Request No. 2 of Subpoena to Meyners & Company, LLC Dated August 26, 2014 (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(White, Daniel)
October 6, 2014 Filing 1066 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #1015 MOTION to Strike Unauthorized Pleadings Filed on Behalf of Defendants Abdul Dabiri, ADF Financial, Inc. and Hossein Alaghe Bandi filed by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 10/6/2014 (sju)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1065 REPLY in Support re #1018 Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson's MOTION TO STRIKE #988 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Cheryl Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings and MOTION to Strike #989 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Richard Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings (Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 10/1/2014 (kg). Modified text on 10/2/2014 (sju)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING deadlines for submission of the proposed pretrial order in Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV. (am)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1063 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vahid Deriss, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Jafari, et al; 12-cv-300) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1062 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-754) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1061 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Vahid Deriss, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh re #1060 Notice (Other),,, Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoenas (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-187) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-241) (Wagner v. Jafari et al; 12-cv-300) (Wagner v. Ansari et al; 12-cv-301) (Wagner v Yeh, et al; 12-cv-303) (Wagner v. Bandi, et al; 12-cv-391) (Wagner v. Etkind, et al; 12-cv-754) (Wagner v. Plaman-Kosinski; 12-cv-496) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1060 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Vahid Deriss, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Notice of Subpoenas to (1) Meyners & Company, LLC & (2) Clifton Larson Allen LLP (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-187) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-241) (Wagner v. Jafari et al; 12-cv-300) (Wagner v. Ansari et al; 12-cv-301) (Wagner v Yeh, et al; 12-cv-303) (Wagner v. Bandi, et al; 12-cv-391) (Wagner v. Etkind, et al; 12-cv-754) (Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0496 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (sju)
September 26, 2014 Filing 1059 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a telephonic status conference for October 21, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. MDT. To connect to the proceedings, counsel shall call Judge Vidmars Teleconference Line at (215) 446 3656, using code 4382538. (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-0241 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-0300 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-0301 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Yeh, 12-cv-0303 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0496 WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV) (ect)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1057 MOTION to Alter Judgment and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241)(Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-300)(Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-301)(Wagner v. Yeh; 12-cv-303)(Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391)(Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-754) by Abbas Ansari, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Chaitman, Helen)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1056 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Levann Certificate of Service of Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. LeVann; 12-cv-187) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1055 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Marie Yeh re #1006 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) filed by Marie Yeh (Chaitman, Helen)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1054 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1006 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) filed by Marie Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1053 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Vahid Deriss, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mostafa Jafari re #1007 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Jafari, et al; 12-cv-300) filed by Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Vahid Deriss, Mostafa Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Marteza Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1052 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1007 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Jafari, et al; 12-cv-300) filed by Vahid Deriss, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1051 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1023 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Request No. 2 of Subpoena to Meyners & Company, LLC Dated August 26, 2014 (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12 -CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) filed by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jill Plaman, Peymaneh Pour, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C)(Chaitman, Helen)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #996 Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum. Wagner v. Ansari, 12-0301 WJ/SMV. (am)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1049 ERRATA re #1014 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and for Protective Order (Wagner v. Ansari; 12-CV-301-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1048 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1047 RESPONSE Correspondence from Julie Gorchkova, Esq. to Hon. Stephan M. Vidmar dated September 18, 2014 (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391) re #1045 Reply, filed by Becker & Poliakoff LLP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gorchkova, Julie)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1046 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #1009 Notice (Other), Plaintiff's Notice of Completion of Briefing for Notice of Fee Affidavit in Connection with Order (Doc. No. 994) (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1045 Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of Fee Affidavit in Connection with Order (Doc. No. 994) (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) re #1021 Response, #1009 Notice (Other), filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(White, Daniel)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1044 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Becker & Poliakoff LLP, Merrie Chappell Law PC re #1000 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) filed by Shahla Bandi, #1001 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) filed by Shahla Bandi (Chaitman, Helen)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1043 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1000 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391), #1001 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) Reply in further support of (i) Motion to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of Shahla Bandi a/k/a Shahla Zolfaghari and for an Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery and (ii) Notice of Non-Appearance and Motion for a Protective Order (Wagner v. Bandi, et al.; 12-cv-391) filed by Becker & Poliakoff LLP, Merrie Chappell Law PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1042 Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition to #1018 Richard Johnson and Cheryl's Johnson's MOTION to Strike #988 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Cheryl Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings and MOTION to Strike #989 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Richard Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings (Wagner v. Johnson; 13-CV-00662 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified docket text on 9/16/2014 pursuant to call from Daniel White's office (kdh). Modified text on 9/16/2014 to correct linkage (kg). Modified on 9/16/2014 (sju)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1041 NOTICE by Marie Yeh re #1006 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-CV-303-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1040 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour re #996 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order (Wagner v Ansari, et al; 12-cv-301) filed by Peymaneh Pour, Abbas Ansari (Chaitman, Helen)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1039 REPLY to Response to Motion re #996 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order (Wagner v Ansari, et al; 12-cv-301) Defendants' Reply in further Support of Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and For a Protective Order (Wagner v Ansari, et al; 12-cv-301) filed by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chaitman, Helen)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1038 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1037 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #736 Scheduling Order. The deadline for pretrial motions is extended to November 7, 2014. The deadline for submission of the proposed pretrial order is extended to January 16, 2015. (Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV) (am)
September 10, 2014 Filing 1035 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi Certificate of Service of Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 10, 2014 Filing 1034 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Hanyeh, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1033 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1032 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc. Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-391) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1031 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Fenton Certificate of Service of Defendant Daniel Fenton's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1030 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Fenton Certificate of Service of Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-241) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1029 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Marie Yeh Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1028 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Bandi 12cv391) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 9/9/2014 (kg).
September 8, 2014 Filing 1027 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jill Plaman Certificate of Service of Defendant Jill Plaman, as personal representative of the estate of Carla Kosinski's, objections and responses to Plaintiff's second set of discovery demands (Wagner v. Plaman-Kosinski; 12-cv-496) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1026 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1007 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Jafari, et al; 12-cv-300) Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and for Protective Order (Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-300) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(White, Daniel)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1025 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second set of discovery requests (Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-301) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1024 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Johnson's Supplemental Objections, Answers, and Responses to Trustee's Second Set of Discovery (Wagner v. Johnson 13CV662) (Burns, James) Modified text on 9/9/2014 (kg).
September 8, 2014 Filing 1023 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Request No. 2 of Subpoena to Meyners & Company, LLC Dated August 26, 2014 (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of VCR Voicemails and Emails (Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1021 RESPONSE in Opposition to the Trustee's Fee Application in connection with Order [Doc. No. 994] (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) re #1009 Notice (Other), filed by Becker & Poliakoff LLP, Merrie Chappell Law PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Chaitman, Helen)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1020 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1006 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and for Protective Order (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(White, Daniel)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1019 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 2, 2014 Filing 1018 MOTION to Strike #988 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Cheryl Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings and MOTION to Strike #989 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Richard Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings by Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson (Wagner v. Johnson 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 9/3/2014 (sju)
September 2, 2014 Filing 1017 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1000 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
September 2, 2014 Filing 1016 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1001 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(White, Daniel)
September 2, 2014 Filing 1015 MOTION to Strike Unauthorized Pleadings Filed on Behalf of Defendants Abdul Dabiri, ADF Financial, Inc. and Hossein Alaghe Bandi by Judith A. Wagner. (Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 9/2/2014 (sju)
August 29, 2014 Filing 1014 RESPONSE in Opposition re #996 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order (Wagner v Ansari, et al; 12-cv-301) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(White, Daniel)
August 28, 2014 Filing 1013 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Vahid Deriss, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jill Plaman, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Sharareh Shahin, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh re #1012 Notice (Other),,, Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena to Meyners & Company, LLC (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-187) (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-207) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-241) (Wagner v. Jafari et al; 12-cv-300) (Wagner v. Ansari et al; 12-cv-301) (Wagner v Yeh, et al; 12-cv-303) (Wagner v. Bandi, et al; 12-cv-391) (Wagner v. Etkind, et al; 12-cv-754) (Chaitman, Helen)
August 28, 2014 Filing 1012 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Vahid Deriss, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Sharareh Shahin, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Notice of Subpoena to Meyners & Company, LLC (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-187) (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-207) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-241) (Wagner v. Jafari et al; 12-cv-300) (Wagner v. Ansari et al; 12-cv-301) (Wagner v Yeh, et al; 12-cv-303) (Wagner v. Bandi, et al; 12-cv-391) (Wagner v. Etkind, et al; 12-cv-754) (Wagner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 8/29/2014, subpoenas should not be filed electronically (kg).
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING certain discovery deadlines and EXTENDING the deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Levann, No. 12-cv-0187; Richards, No. 12-cv-0207; Fenton, No. 12-cv-0241; Jafari, No. 12-cv-0300; Ansari, No. 12-cv-0301; Yeh, No. 12-cv-0303; Bandi, No. 12-cv-0391; Plaman, No. 12-cv-0496; and Etkind, No. 12-cv-0754 (am)
August 27, 2014 Filing 1010 NOTICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Shahla Bandi re #997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Un Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) (Chaitman, Helen)
August 26, 2014 Filing 1009 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #994 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion to Withdraw, Notice of Fee Affidavit in Connection with Order Doc. No. 994 (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying #984 Defendants Motion to Review and Set Aside the Portion of the Magistrates July 22, 2014 Order Striking Certain Defendants Jury Demands, filed August 5, 2014 (12-cv-207; 12-cv-241; 12-cv-300; 12-cv-301; 12-cv-303; 12-cv-391; 12-cv-754). (mag)
August 25, 2014 Filing 1007 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Jafari, et al; 12-cv-300) by Vahid Deriss, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mostafa Jafari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
August 25, 2014 Filing 1006 MOTION to Quash (Wagner v. Yeh, et al.; 12-cv-303) by Marie Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
August 25, 2014 Filing 1005 NOTICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Extension (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 8/26/2014 (kg).
August 22, 2014 Filing 1004 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Subpoena Documents (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
August 22, 2014 Filing 1003 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Third Supplement to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
August 19, 2014 Filing 1002 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc. re #1000 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391), #1001 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) (12-cv-391) (Chaitman, Helen)
August 18, 2014 Filing 1001 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) by Shahla Bandi. (Chaitman, Helen)
August 18, 2014 Filing 1000 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-391) by Shahla Bandi. (Chaitman, Helen)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 999 STIPULATED ORDER SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT AND AMENDING CASE CAPTION by District Judge William P. Johnson (Wagner v. Lacy CV 12-547 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 18, 2014 Filing 998 RESPONSE in Opposition re #984 MOTION to Review Defendants' Motion to Review and Set Aside the Portion of the Magistrate's July 22, 2014 Order Striking Certain Defendants' Jury Demands (12-cv-207; 12-cv-241; 12-cv-300; 12-cv-301; 12-cv-303; 12-cv-391; 12-cv-754) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
August 15, 2014 Filing 997 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe-Bandi and Shahla Bandi A/K/A Shahla Zolfaghari, (II) for Finding that Unanswered Requests for Admission to Defendants are Deemed Admitted, (III) for Finding that Defendants have Waived their Right to Object to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production, and (IV) for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(White, Daniel)
August 15, 2014 Filing 996 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order (Wagner v Ansari, et al; 12-cv-301) by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 994 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING as moot #892 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; DENYING as moot #905 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; reserving ruling on #919 Defense Counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 (sr) Modified to add text on 8/13/2014 (bc).
August 11, 2014 Filing 989 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Richard Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings (Wagner v. Richard Johnson 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L)(White, Daniel)
August 11, 2014 Filing 988 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Cheryl Johnson as to the Timing and Amount of the Transfers and as to Recovery of the Net Winnings (Wagner v. Cheryl Johnson 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L)(White, Daniel)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Wagner v. Rosenberg CV 12-270 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 986 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson permitting Plaintiff to file certain exhibits to Motions for Partial Summary Judgment under seal and lifting page limit on exhibits thereto. (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 5, 2014 Filing 985 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic motion hearing on #892 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel, #905 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel, and #919 Defense Counsel's MOTION to Withdraw held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on August 5, 2014. (Bandi, 12-cv-0391) (sr)
August 5, 2014 Filing 984 MOTION to Review Defendants' Motion to Review and Set Aside the Portion of the Magistrate's July 22, 2014 Order Striking Certain Defendants' Jury Demands (12-cv-207; 12-cv-241; 12-cv-300; 12-cv-301; 12-cv-303; 12-cv-391; 12-cv-754) by Abbas Ansari, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Chaitman, Helen)
August 5, 2014 Filing 983 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 982 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #980 Motion for Leave to File Reply Out of Time. (Bandi, 12-cv-0391) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (sr)
August 5, 2014 Filing 981 REPLY to Response to Motion re #919 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance Reply in Further Support of Motion to Withdraw Appearance (Case No. 12-cv-00391-WJ/SMV Wagner v. Bandi) filed by ADF Financial, Inc., Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Abdul Dabiri. (Chaitman, Helen)
August 5, 2014 Filing 980 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Reply Out of Time by ADF Financial, Inc., Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Abdul Dabiri. (12-CV-0391 WJ/SMV) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 8/5/2014 (sju)
August 4, 2014 Filing 979 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Second Supplemental Discovery Responses (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 8/5/2014 (kg).
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING #869 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Report; DENYING #927 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Johnson, 12-cv-0662) (sr)
July 31, 2014 Filing 977 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of St. Anselm Documents (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV00496-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 31, 2014 Filing 976 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 31, 2014 Filing 975 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 31, 2014 Filing 974 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 30, 2014 Filing 973 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 30, 2014 Filing 972 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 971 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Discovery Requests to Multiple Defendants Served on July 25, 2014 (Wagner v. Levann; 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman; 12-CV00496-WJ-SMV, Wagner v.Etkind;12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 970 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 969 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Fourth Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Lacy 12-CV-00547- WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 968 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers filed by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)[Wagner v. Lacy 12-cv-547 WJ/SMV] Modified on 7/28/2014 TO ADD TEXT (vv).
July 24, 2014 Filing 967 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF re #927 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2014-07-11 Ltr fr Perfectly Legal) (13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 7/24/2014 (sju)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-197 WJ/SMV) (dmw)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-306 WJ/SMV) (dmw)
July 23, 2014 Filing 964 REPLY to Response to Motion re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00 (Wagner v. Lacy; 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 963 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #845 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, in Wagner v. Johnson, 12-cv-0662 WJ/SMV. (am)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 962 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #683 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demands by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Lacy, 12-cv-0547; Etkind, 12-cv-0754) (sr)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 961 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Telephonic Hearing on #892 and #905 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel and on #919 Defense Counsel's Motion to Withdraw in Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV. The telephonic hearing is set for August 5, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. MDT. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
July 18, 2014 Filing 960 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Response to Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
July 16, 2014 Filing 959 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant James Richards, as Trustee of the James Richards Revocable Trust (Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 16, 2014 Filing 958 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant James Richards, Individually (Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 16, 2014 Filing 957 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Third Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Lacy; 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 16, 2014 Filing 956 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-1105 WJ/SMV) (kg)
July 15, 2014 Filing 954 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #905 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Abdul Dabiri (II) for a Finding that the Unanswered Request for Admission filed by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Bandi, 12cv391 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 7/15/2014 (dmw).
July 14, 2014 Filing 953 REPLY to Response to Motion re #905 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Abdul Dabiri (II) for a Finding that the Unanswered Request for Admissio (Wagner v. Bandi et al., Case No. 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 952 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING certain discovery deadlines and EXTENDING the deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Levann, No. 12-cv-0187; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, No. 12-cv-0207; Fenton, No. 12-cv-0241; Jafari, No. 12-cv-0300; Ansari, No. 12-cv-0301; Yeh, No. 12-cv-0303; Bandi, No. 12-cv-0391; Plaman, No. 12-cv-0496; and Etkind, No. 12-cv-00754. (am)
July 11, 2014 Filing 951 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Richard & Cheryl Johnson; 13-CV- 00662-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 11, 2014 Filing 950 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Burns, James)
July 11, 2014 Filing 949 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Garnishee Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. for We Investments, LLC (Wagner v. We Investments, LLC CV 12-392 WJ/SMV). (kg)
July 10, 2014 Filing 948 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Objections, Answers, Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, Requests for Productions (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 7/11/2014 (kg).
July 10, 2014 Filing 947 RESPONSE to Motion re #927 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Discovery Deadline (Wagner v. Richard & Cheryl Johnson; 12-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
July 9, 2014 Filing 946 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Subpoena Documents (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 8, 2014 Filing 945 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic motion hearing on #845 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on July 8, 2014. (Wagner v. Johnson, 12-cv-0662 WJ/SMV) (sr)
July 8, 2014 Filing 944 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Michael Menke, Jenny Yeh Nelson, New Mexico Accounting Specialists, Inc., Jill Plaman, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Sharareh Shahin, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Certificate of Service of Documents Produced by New Mexico Regulation & Licensing Department (12-187 Wagner v. Levann)(12-203 Wagner v. Menke)(12-207 Wagner v. Richards)(12-241 Wagner v. Fenton)(12-300 Wagner v. Jafari)(12-301 Wagner v. Ansari)(12-303 Wagner v. Yeh)(12-391 Wagner v. Bandi)(12- 754 Wagner v. Etkind)(12-496 Wagner v. Plaman-Kosinski) (Chaitman, Helen)
July 8, 2014 Filing 943 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #892 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel ADF Financial Inc. to Make Complete Designations Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (II) for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Bandi, 12cv391 WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel) Modified text on 7/8/2014 (dmw).
July 8, 2014 Filing 942 REPLY to Response to Motion re #892 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel ADF Financial Inc. to Make Complete Designations Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (II) for Attorney's Fees Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel ADF Financial Inc. to Make Complete Designations Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 (b) (6) and (II) for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-391-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
July 7, 2014 Filing 941 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Subpoena Documents (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 7, 2014 Filing 940 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Subpoena Documents (Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
July 3, 2014 Filing 939 RESPONSE in Opposition re #919 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw Appearance (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mazel, Edward)
July 3, 2014 Filing 938 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-241 Wagner v. Fenton) (Chaitman, Helen)
July 3, 2014 Filing 937 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherry Etkind Certificate of Service of Defendant Sherry Etkind's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-754 Wagner v. Etkind) (Chaitman, Helen)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a telephonic hearing on #845 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel for July 8, 2014, at 01:30 PM. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Johnson (13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV) (am) Modified text on 7/2/2014 (sju)
July 2, 2014 Filing 935 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Richards Certificate of Service of Defendant James Richards' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-207 Wagner v. Richards) (Chaitman, Helen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 934 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc. Certificate of Service of Defendants Said Bandi & Bandi Engineering Co., Inc.'s Amended Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-391 Wagner v. Bandi) (Chaitman, Helen)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-360 WJ/SMV) (kg)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 932 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson (Wagner v. Lacy CV 12-547 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 30, 2014 Filing 931 RESPONSE in Opposition re #905 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Abdul Dabiri (II) for a Finding that the Unanswered Request for Admission filed by Abdul Dabiri. (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-0391 WJ/SMV) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 7/15/2014 to add adversary case name per email to CM/ECF Help Desk (dc).
June 30, 2014 Filing 930 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Ninth Supplement to Her Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #846 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Having reviewed the parties' confidential position statements, the Court determines that a settlement conference will not be fruitful at this time. Accordingly, the Settlement Conference on July 3, 2014, is VACATED. (Lacy, 12-cv-0547) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (sr)
June 30, 2014 Filing 928 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
June 26, 2014 Filing 927 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Burns, James)
June 25, 2014 Filing 926 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Eighth Supplement to Her Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-299 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 25, 2014 Filing 924 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. for WE Investments, LLC (Wagner v. WE Investments, LLC CV 12-392 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 923 DEFAULT ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #876 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (Wagner v. WE Investments, LLC CV 12-392 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 24, 2014 Filing 922 RESPONSE in Opposition re #892 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel ADF Financial Inc. to Make Complete Designations Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (II) for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Bandi, et al; 12-cv-00391) filed by ADF Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
June 20, 2014 Filing 921 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Hanyeh, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Certificate of Service of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-303, Wagner v. Yeh, et al.) (Chaitman, Helen)
June 19, 2014 Filing 920 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vahid Deriss, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari Certificate of Service of Defendants' Responses and Objections to the Trustee's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production (12-cv-300 Wagner v. Jafari, et al.) (Chaitman, Helen)
June 19, 2014 Filing 919 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance by ADF Financial, Inc., Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Abdul Dabiri. (Wagner v. Bandi CV 12-391 WJ/SMV) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 6/20/2014 (kg).
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-359 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-291 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-208 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-200 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-188 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 19, 2014 Filing 913 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2014 Filing 912 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2014 Filing 911 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Seventh Supplement to Her Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2014 Filing 910 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Johnson 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
June 18, 2014 Filing 909 NOTICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Non Availability from 6/16/14 - 9/16/14 (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 6/19/2014 (kg).
June 18, 2014 Filing 908 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Sixth Supplement to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee(Wagner v. Ansari & Pour 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline)
June 18, 2014 Filing 907 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Third Supplement to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline) Modified text on 6/18/2014 (eh).
June 16, 2014 Filing 906 REPLY to Response to Motion re #869 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Report (12-CV-0662-WJ/SMV) filed by Richard Johnson. (Burns, James)
June 16, 2014 Filing 905 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Abdul Dabiri (II) for a Finding that the Unanswered Request for Admission to the Defendant is Deemed Admitted and (III) for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #890 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order and Notice of Non-Appearance. A protective order is hereby GRANTED and the discovery period is hereby extended for the sole purpose of conducting Mr. Levann's deposition. Mr. Levann shall appear by telephone for a deposition on September 26, 2014. Sanctions, up to and including default judgment, may be imposed for failure to appear. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-0187) (sr)
June 12, 2014 Filing 903 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic motion hearing on #890 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order (Wagner v. LeVann, 12-cv-0187). (sr) Modified on 6/13/2014 (jv).
June 12, 2014 Filing 902 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc. Certificate of Service of Defendants Said Bandi and Bandi Engineering Company, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to the Trustee's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production (12-cv-391 Wagner v. Bandi, et al.) (Chaitman, Helen)
June 12, 2014 Filing 901 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour Certificate of Service of Defendants Abbas Ansari and Peymaneh Pour's Responses and Objections to the Trustee's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production (12-cv-301 Wagner v. Ansari, et al.) (Chaitman, Helen)
June 12, 2014 Filing 900 RESPONSE in Opposition re #890 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. LeVann, 12-CV-00817-WJ-SMV) Response in Opposition to Notice of Non- Appearance and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(White, Daniel)
June 11, 2014 Filing 899 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Levann Certificate of Service of Defendant Jonathan Levann's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First & Second Sets of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-187 Wagner v. Levann) (Chaitman, Helen)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-497 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-413 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-190 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-189 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Telephonic Hearing on #890 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order and Notice of Non-Appearance. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for June 12, 2014, at 03:30 PM MDT. To connect to the proceedings, counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Teleconference Line at (215) 446-3656, using code 4382538. (Wagner v. LeVann, 12-cv-0187 WJ/SMV) (am)
June 10, 2014 Filing 893 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Second Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Johnson Defendants (Wagner v Johnson 13cv662 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/10/2014 (eh).
June 10, 2014 Filing 892 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel ADF Financial Inc. to Make Complete Designations Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (II) for Attorney's Fees by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wagner v Bandi 12cv391 WJ/SMV)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/10/2014 (eh).
June 10, 2014 Filing 891 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Cerificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-391 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/10/2014 (kg).
June 9, 2014 Filing 890 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Defendant and Notice of Non-Appearance (Wagner v. LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV) by Jonathan Levann. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified on 6/13/2014 (jv).
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 889 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING certain discovery deadlines and EXTENDING the deadline for certain Defendants to respond to #731 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Levann, No. 12-cv-0187; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, No. 12-cv-0207; Fenton, No. 12-cv-0241; Jafari, No. 12-cv-0300; Ansari, No. 12-cv-0301; Yeh, No. 12-cv-0303; Bandi, No. 12-cv-0391; Plaman, No. 12-cv-0496; and Etkind, No. 12-cv-00754. (am)
June 9, 2014 Filing 888 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Pending Settlement by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Menke, 12-cv-00203 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/9/2014 (sju)
June 5, 2014 Filing 887 ERRATA re #884 Reply to Response to Motion,, Notice of Errata as to Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion (I) to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendants Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson and (II) for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Johnson; 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/6/2014 (sju)
June 3, 2014 Filing 886 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #845 MOTION to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson and for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Johnson; 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
June 3, 2014 Filing 885 RESPONSE to Motion re #869 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Report (12-CV-0662-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanders, Maureen)
June 3, 2014 Filing 884 REPLY to Response to Motion re #845 MOTION to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson and for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Johnson; 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson and for Attorney's Fees filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(White, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 883 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Fifth Supplement to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents (Wagner v. Ansari and Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/2/2014 (kg).
May 30, 2014 Filing 882 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of subpoena documents (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 6/2/2014 (kg).
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #813 Unopposed Motion to Approve Recommendation and Report of Guradian Ad Litem and Approve Settlement Agreement. (CV 12-413 WJ/SMV) (kg)
May 29, 2014 Filing 880 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge William P. Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2014 re #813 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement and Approve Recommendation and Report of Guardian Ad Litem (Wagner v. Wollen 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Court Reporter T. Garrett) (kg)
May 28, 2014 Filing 879 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen re #814 Notice of Hearing on Motion, Certificate of Mailing the Notice of Hearing to all Wollen Children (Behles, Jennie)
May 28, 2014 Filing 878 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Abbas Ansari and Peymaneh Pour (Wagner v. Ansari and Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/29/2014 (kg).
May 27, 2014 Filing 877 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of subpoena documents (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Ortiz, Jacqueline) Modified text on 5/28/2014 (kg).
May 22, 2014 Filing 876 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Wagner v. WE Investments; 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV), filed by Judith A. Wagner.(Ortiz, Jacqueline)
May 22, 2014 Filing 875 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Sixth Supplement to Response to Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/23/2014 (kg).
May 22, 2014 Filing 874 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Second Supplement to Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Lacy; 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/23/2014 (kg).
May 21, 2014 Filing 873 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Voluntary Disclosures (Wagner v. Lacy; 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2014 (kg).
May 21, 2014 Filing 872 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Fifth Supplement to Her Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents (Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2014 (kg).
May 20, 2014 Filing 871 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Doris Lacy by Doris Lacy (Wagner v. Lacy 12-cv-547 WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Puccini, Louis) Modified text on 5/21/2014 (kg).
May 20, 2014 Filing 870 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #683 MOTION to Strike Jury Demands (Wagner v. Appelman 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, R. 12-CV-0189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, V. 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman Trust & Academy Plumbing, Heating Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc 12-CV-0 Plaintiff's Notice of Completion of Briefing for Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demands as to Certain Defendants ( Wagner vs. Menke 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Ansari 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
May 20, 2014 Filing 869 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Report (12-CV-0662-WJ/SMV) by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burns, James)
May 20, 2014 Filing 868 RESPONSE in Opposition re #845 MOTION to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson and for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Johnson; 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) 12-CV-0662-WJ/SMV filed by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burns, James)
May 20, 2014 Filing 867 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00 (Wagner v. Lacy 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (Mazel, Edward)
May 19, 2014 Filing 866 NOTICE by Richard Johnson Notice of Extension (Wagner v. Johnson 13-cv-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified on 5/20/2014 (kg).
May 16, 2014 Filing 865 REPLY in Support re #683 MOTION to Strike Jury Demands (Wagner v. Appelman 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, R. 12-CV-0189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, V. 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman Trust & Academy Plumbing, Heating Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc 12-CV-0 (Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207, Wagner v. Fenton, D. & N.; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari, et. al.; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh, et. al.; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi, et. al.; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind, et. al.; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/16/2014 (jn).
May 16, 2014 Filing 864 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Menke Certificate of Service of Defendant Michael Menke's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-203 Wagner v. Menke) (Chaitman, Helen)
May 16, 2014 Filing 863 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven S. Etkind Certificate of Service of Defendant Steven Etkind, individually, and as Trustee of the Steven and Sherry Etkind Revocable Living Trust's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-754 Wagner v. Etkind) (Chaitman, Helen)
May 15, 2014 Filing 862 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Talia Etkind Certificate of Service of Defendant Talia Etkind's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (12-754 Wagner v. Etkind) (Chaitman, Helen)
May 15, 2014 Filing 861 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Michael Menke, Jill Plaman, James Richards, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Certificate of Service of Notice of Subpoena to New Mexico Regulation & Licensing Department (12-187 Wagner v. Levann)(12-203 Wagner v. Menke)(12-207 Wagner v. Richards)(12-241 Wagner v. Fenton)(12-300 Wagner v. Jafari)(12-301 Wagner v. Ansari)(12-303 Wagner v. Yeh)(12-391 Wagner v. Bandi)(12- 754 Wagner v. Etkind)(12-496 Wagner v. Plaman-Kosinski) (Chaitman, Helen)
May 15, 2014 Filing 860 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Subpoena Documents (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ_SMV) (White, Daniel)
May 14, 2014 Filing 859 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sharareh Shahin and New Mexico Accounting Specialists, Inc. (Wagner v. Bandi Case No. 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (kg)
May 13, 2014 Filing 858 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Fourth Supplement to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/14/2014 (kg).
May 13, 2014 Filing 857 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Sixth Supplement to Her Response to Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/14/2014 (kg).
May 13, 2014 Filing 856 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Withdrawal of Certain Assertions in Her #731 Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Against All Defendants On All But One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers With Respect to All Remaining Defendants Except the Johnson and Lacy Defendants by Judith A. Wagner (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00, #732 Memorandum in Support,,,, (Wagner v. Levann; 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton, D. & N.; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari, et. al.; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh, et. al.; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi, et. al.; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman (Kosinski); 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind, et. al.; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/14/2014 (kg).
May 13, 2014 Filing 855 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Discovery Requests to Multiple Defendants in Case No. 12-CV-303-WJ/SMV (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-303-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
May 13, 2014 Filing 854 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Discovery Requests to Multiple Defendants in Case No. 12-CV-300-WJ/SMV (Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-300-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
May 13, 2014 Filing 853 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Discovery Requests to Multiple Defendants in Case No. 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
May 13, 2014 Filing 852 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant, Sherry Etkind (Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754) (White, Daniel)
May 13, 2014 Filing 851 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant, Jonathan Levan (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
May 12, 2014 Filing 850 PRAECIPE Plaintiff's Request For Clerk's Entry of Default As To Defendants Sharareh Shahin and New Mexico Accounting Specialists, Inc. by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Bandi 12-cv-391 WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mazel, Edward) Modified text on 5/13/2014 (eh). Modified text on 5/13/2014 (kg).
May 7, 2014 Filing 849 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. WE Investments; 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/8/2014 (kg).
May 7, 2014 Filing 848 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of 2004 Checks, Bank Statements and Deposit Items (Wagner v. Levann; 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton, Daniel & Nancy; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari, et. al.; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh, et. al.; 12-CV- 00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi, et. al.; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind, et. al.; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 5/8/2014 (kg).
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for July 3, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom. (Lacy, 12-cv-0547) (sr)
May 5, 2014 Filing 847 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Wagner v. WE Investments, LLC 12-CV-392 WJ/SMV). (kg)
May 5, 2014 Filing 845 MOTION to Compel Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Richard Johnson and Cheryl Johnson and for Attorney's Fees (Wagner v. Johnson; 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mazel, Edward)
May 5, 2014 Filing 844 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on May 5, 2014. (Lacy, 12-cv-0547) (sr) Modified text on 5/5/2014 (vh).
May 5, 2014 Filing 843 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE DISCOVERY by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Lacy; 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified on 5/5/2014 TO ADD TEXT (vv).
May 2, 2014 Filing 842 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00754-WPJ-SMV) by Talia Etkind (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 841 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00754-WPJ-SMV) by Steven S. Etkind (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 840 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00391-WPJ-SMV) by Said Bandi (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 839 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00303-WPJ-SMV) by Marie Yeh (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 838 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00303-WPJ-SMV) by Jenny Yeh Nelson (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 837 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00303-WPJ-SMV) by Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 836 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00303-WPJ-SMV) by Julie C. Louie (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 835 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00303-WPJ-SMV) by David L. Louie (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 834 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00301-WPJ-SMV) by Peymaneh Pour (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 833 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00301-WPJ-SMV) by Abbas Ansari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 832 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV) by Marteza Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 831 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV) by Mojtaba Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 830 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV) by Mohammad Reza Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 829 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV) by Melika Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 828 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV) by Maryam Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 827 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV) by Farzaneh Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 826 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00241-WPJ-SMV) by Nancy Fenton (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 825 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00241-WPJ-SMV) by Daniel Fenton (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 824 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00207-WPJ-SMV) by James Richards (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 823 DECLARATION re #822 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (12-cv-00203-WPJ-SMV) by Michael Menke (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 822 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #683 MOTION to Strike Jury Demands (Wagner v. Appelman 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, R. 12-CV-0189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, V. 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman Trust & Academy Plumbing, Heating Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc 12-CV-0 (12-cv-00203-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00207-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00241-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00300-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00301-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00303-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00391-WPJ-SMV); (12-cv-00754-WPJ-SMV) by Abbas Ansari, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Abdul Dabiri, Vahid Deriss, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Rachel Hanyeh, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Michael Menke, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Chaitman, Helen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 821 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS AND RESPONSES by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson (12-CV-0662-WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified on 5/5/2014 TO ADD TEXT (vv).
May 1, 2014 Filing 820 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Levann; 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Fenton, Daniel & Nancy; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Jafari, et. al.; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Ansari & Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh, et. al.; 12-CV- 00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Bandi, et. al.; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind, et. al.; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 30, 2014 Filing 819 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (Wagner v. Johnson 12-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel) Modified on 4/30/2014 (kdh). Modified to correct text on 5/1/2014 (ic).
April 29, 2014 Filing 818 REPLY to Response to Motion re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (Wagner v. Johnson 12-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel) Modified to correct text on 5/1/2014 (ic).
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 817 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadline through June 23, 2014 to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 731), and to designate experts and produce expert reports to the Plaintiff. (Wagner v. Levann - 12CV187; Wagner v. Menke-12CV203; Wagner v. Richards-12CV207; Wagner v. Fenton-12CV241;Wagner v. Jafari, et al.-12CV300; Wagner v. Ansari, et al.-12CV301; Wagner v. Yeh-12CV303; Wagner v. Bandi, et al.-12CV391; Wagner v. Etkind-12CV754; Wagner v. Plaman-12CV496) (mag)
April 24, 2014 Filing 816 NOTICE of Settlement Pending (Wagner v. Plaman; 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
April 21, 2014 Filing 815 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 21, 2014 Filing 814 NOTICE of Hearing on #813 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement and Approve Recommendation and Report of Guardian Ad Litem (Wagner v. Wollen 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV) : Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 540 Bonito Courtroom before District Judge William P. Johnson. (mag)
April 18, 2014 Filing 813 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement and Approve Recommendation and Report of Guardian Ad Litem (Wagner v. Wollen 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Askew, James)
April 18, 2014 Filing 812 Corrected REPORT of Guardian Ad Litem and Request for Approval by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen (Wagner v. Wollen 12-cv-413 WJ/SMV) (Behles, Jennie) Modified text on 4/21/2014 (kg).
April 17, 2014 Filing 811 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Response to Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 810 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Third Supplement to Her Response to Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 809 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Response to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Menke; 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 808 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Jonathan LeVann (Wagner v. 12-CV-00187-WJ_SWV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 807 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant James Richards, Individually (Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 806 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant James Richards, as Trustee of the James Richards Revocable Trust (Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 805 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Michael Menke (Wagner v. Menke 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 804 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Marie Yeh, as PR of the Estate of Chon-Chiun Yeh (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 803 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Marie Yeh, Individually (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 16, 2014 Filing 802 REPORT of Guardian ad Litem and Request for Approval by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen (Behles, Jennie) Modified text on 4/17/2014 (kg).
April 16, 2014 Filing 801 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/17/2014 (kg).
April 16, 2014 Filing 800 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Steve Etkind (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/17/2014 (kg).
April 15, 2014 Filing 799 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/16/2014 (kg).
April 15, 2014 Filing 798 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/16/2014 (kg).
April 15, 2014 Filing 797 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/16/2014 (kg).
April 15, 2014 Filing 796 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Levann; 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00230-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Yeh, et. al.; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Etkind, et. al.; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Plaman; 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/16/2014 (kg).
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-870 WJ/SMV) (kg)
April 11, 2014 Filing 794 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Third Supplement to Her Response to Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 11, 2014 Filing 793 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jill Plaman of Responses to Trustee's Discovery Requests (Wagner v. Plaman-Kosinski; USDC Case No. 12-00496) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/14/2014 (kg).
April 9, 2014 Filing 792 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 791 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadlines. Defendants have until May 2, 2014 to designate experts and provide experts reports to Plaintiff. Responses to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demand and to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment are due May 2, 2014. (Wagner v. Levann - 12CV187; Wagner v. Menke-12CV203; Wagner v. Richards-12CV207; Wagner v. Fenton-12CV241;Wagner v. Jafari, et al.-12CV300; Wagner v. Ansari, et al.-12CV301; Wagner v. Yeh-12CV303; Wagner v. Bandi, et al.-12CV391; Wagner v. Etkind-12CV754; Wagner v. Plaman-12CV496; Wagner v. Plaman-12CV497) (mag)
April 8, 2014 Filing 790 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time by Judith A. Wagner re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00 (Wagner v. Lacy; 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/9/2014 (kg).
April 7, 2014 Filing 789 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Subpoena Documents (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, & Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 4/8/2014 (kg).
April 4, 2014 Filing 788 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to U.S. Bank, N.A. (Wagner v. We Investments, LLC CV 12-392 WJ/SMV) (kg)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #762 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (Wagner v. We Investments, LLC CV 12-392 WJ/SMV) (kg)
April 4, 2014 Filing 786 Expert Witness Disclosure by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Burns, James) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (kg).
April 3, 2014 Filing 785 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Account Records Obtained by Subpoena (Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-003036-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-AMV)(Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
March 31, 2014 Filing 784 Expert Witness Disclosure by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (kg).
March 28, 2014 Filing 783 Expert Witness Disclosure by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Wagner v. Johnson CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (kg).
March 28, 2014 Filing 782 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson of Objections and Responses to First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production 12-CV-00662-WJ/SMV (Burns, James) Modified on 3/31/2014 (kg).
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 781 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadline to file reply in support of Trustee's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have through and until April 29, 2014 to file a Reply in Support of the MSJ. (Wagner v. Lacy 12-cv-547 WJ/SMV) (kg)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #769 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Wagner v. Johnson 13-cv-662 WJ/SMV) (kg)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 779 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadline for Plaintiff to file reply in support of Trustee's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have through and until April 29, 2014 to file a Reply in Support of the MSJ. (Wagner v. Johnson 13-cv-662 WJ/SMV) (kg)
March 26, 2014 Filing 778 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Notice of Subpoena (Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #774 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem (Wollen, 12-cv-0413). (sr)
March 25, 2014 Filing 776 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Subpoena to Bank of America (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
March 21, 2014 Filing 775 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Subpoena (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
March 21, 2014 Filing 774 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Judith A. Wagner. (Wagner v. Wollen 12cv413 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 3/21/2014 (kg).
March 19, 2014 Filing 773 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Abdul Dabiri (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-397-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (kg).
March 18, 2014 Filing 772 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Second Supplement to her Response to Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 3/19/2014 (kg).
March 18, 2014 Filing 771 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Response to Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents to the Trustee (Wagner v. Menke 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Ansari | Pour 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 3/19/2014 (kg).
March 17, 2014 Filing 770 RESPONSE in Opposition re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00 662-WJ-SMV filed by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Burns, James)
March 17, 2014 Filing 769 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Case No. 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Burns, James)
March 17, 2014 Filing 768 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM SERVICE (Allen, Aletheia)
March 17, 2014 Filing 767 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Request for Production by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman (Wagner v. Plaman; USDC Case No. 12-00497) (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 3/18/2014 (eh).
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 766 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson. (As to Wagner v. Levann - 12CV187; Wagner v. Menke - 12CV203; Wagner v. Richards - 12CV207; Wagner v. Fenton - 12CV241; Wagner v. Jafari, et al. - 12CV300; Wagner v. Ansari, et al.- 12CV301; Wagner v. Yeh - 12CV303; Wagner v. Bandi, et al. - 12CV391; Wagner v. Etkind, et al. - 12CV754; Wagner v. Plaman - 12CV497; Wagner v. Plaman - 12CV496) (mag)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 765 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES by District Judge William P. Johnson (as to Wagner v. Levann 12cv187, Wagner v. Menke 12cv203, Wagner v. Richards 12cv207, Wagner v. Fenton 12cv241, Wagner v. Jafari 12cv300, Wagner v. Ansari 12cv301, Wagner v. Yeh 12cv303, Wagner v. Bandi 12cv391, Wagner v. Etkind 12cv754 and Wagner v. Plaman 12cv497) (kg)
March 6, 2014 Filing 764 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production by Judith A. Wagner (Wagner v. Plaman [Kosinski] - 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 3/7/2014 (kg).
March 4, 2014 Filing 763 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on March 4, 2014, in Wollen, 12-cv-0413. (sr)
March 3, 2014 Filing 762 Application for Writ of Garnishment by Judith A. Wagner [Wagner v. We Investments LLC; 12-cv-00392 WJ/SMV] (White, Daniel) Modified to add text on 3/4/2014 (bc). Modified text on 3/4/2014 (kg).
March 3, 2014 Filing 761 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #751 Motion for Writ of Garnishment by Judith A. Wagner [Wagner v. We Investments LLC; 12-cv-00392 WJ/SMV] (White, Daniel) Modified on 3/3/2014 (vv). Modified to correct text on 3/4/2014 (bc).
February 28, 2014 Filing 760 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 731) [Wagner v. Lacy, et. al., Case No. 12-00547-WJ-SMV] filed by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. (Meagle, Shay)
February 25, 2014 Filing 759 NOTICE by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman Entry of Appearance (12-cv-00497; Wagner v. Plaman) (Chaitman, Helen)
February 25, 2014 Filing 758 NOTICE by Jill Plaman Entry of Appearance (12-cv-00496; Wagner v. Plaman) (Chaitman, Helen)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 757 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING VARIOUS DEADLINES by District Judge William P. Johnson. See Order for specifics. (Original Case No. CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 756 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-637 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-263 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-220 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 24, 2014 Filing 753 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Supplement to Response to First Requests for Production of Documents Wagner v. Levann, et. al 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari, et. al. 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh, et. al. 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi, et. al. 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind et. al. 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/25/2014 (kg).
February 24, 2014 Filing 752 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Johnson Defendants ( Wagner v. Johnson 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/25/2014 (kg).
February 24, 2014 Filing 751 Application for Writ of Garnishment U.S. Bank, N.A. Garnishee (Wagner v. We Investments 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel) Modified on 2/24/2014 (vv).
February 24, 2014 Filing 750 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Subpoena to Merrie L. Chappell (Wagner v. We Investments 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 749 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Notice of Subpoena (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/24/2014 (kg).
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Telephonic Status Conference for March 4, 2014, at 01:30 PM in Wollen, 12-cv-0413. The parties shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
February 19, 2014 Filing 747 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 19, 2014, in the following cases: Levann, 12-cv-0187; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Bandi, 12-cv-039; Etkind, 12-cv-0754. (sr)
February 14, 2014 Filing 746 NOTICE by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy of Agreed Extension of Time, Pursuant to D.N.M.L.R.-CIV.7.4(a) [Wagner v. Lacy, Case No. 12-CV-00547] (Meagle, Shay)
February 13, 2014 Filing 745 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 13, 2014. (Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662) (sr)
February 13, 2014 Filing 744 FINAL STIPULATED JUDGMENT by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Civil Case No. CV 12-392 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Civil Case No. CV 12-290 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 13, 2014 Filing 742 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Subpoenas (Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303_WJ-SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/14/2014 (kg).
February 13, 2014 Filing 741 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Subpoenas (Wagner v.Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/14/2014 (kg).
February 13, 2014 Filing 740 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Subpoenas (Wagner v.Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/14/2014 (kg).
February 13, 2014 Filing 739 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Subpoenas (Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-391-WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 2/14/2014, should not be filed electronically (kg).
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadlines AS FURTHER DESCRIBED HEREIN (Wagner v. Levann - 12CV187; Wagner v. Menke - 12CV203; Wagner v. Richards - 12CV207; Wagner v. Fenton - 12CV241; Wagner v. Jafari, et al. - 12CV300; Wagner v. Ansari, et al. - 12CV301; Wagner v. Yeh - 12CV303; Wagner v. Bandi, et al. - 12CV391; Wagner v. Etkind - 12CV754). (mag)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for May 5, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348 2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547) (sr)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 736 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates on August 4, 2014. Proposed Pretrial Order is due by November 3, 2014. (Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547) (sr)
February 4, 2014 Filing 735 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 4, 2014, in Wagner v. Lacy, No. 12-cv-0547. (sr)
February 3, 2014 Filing 734 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 3, 2014, in Wagner v. Wollen, 12-cv-0413. (sr)
January 31, 2014 Filing 733 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Lacy,12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James)
January 31, 2014 Filing 732 MEMORANDUM in Support re #731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00 (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Jafari, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Ansari/Pour,12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Yeh, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Bandi, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Plaman/Kosinski, 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Plaman, 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Lacy, 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Etkind, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Johnson, 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit C-1A, #8 Exhibit C-1B, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-1A Part I, #11 Exhibit D-1A Part II, #12 Exhibit D-1A Part III, #13 Exhibit D-1B Part I, #14 Exhibit D-1B Part II, #15 Exhibit D-1B Part III, #16 Exhibit D-1B Part IV, #17 Exhibit D-1B Part V, #18 Exhibit D-1C)(Askew, James)
January 31, 2014 Filing 731 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All but One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Menke,12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Fenton,12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Jafari, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Ansari/Pour,12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Yeh, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Bandi, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Plaman/Kosinski, 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Plaman, 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Lacy, 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Etkind, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Johnson, 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Askew, James)
January 31, 2014 Filing 730 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Resume of Gil A. Miller (Wagner v. Levann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Menke 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Fenton 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Jafari 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Ansari and Pour 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Yeh 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Bandi 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Kosinski 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 31, 2014 Filing 729 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Michael Plaman (Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 31, 2014 Filing 728 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Jill Plaman (Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 31, 2014 Filing 727 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Expert Report and Notice of Expert (Wagner v.Johnson 12-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 31, 2014 Filing 726 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Expert Report and Notice of Expert (Wagner v. Lacy 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 29, 2014 Filing 725 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Voluntary Disclosures (Wagner v. Lacy 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 29, 2014 Filing 724 NOTICE of Settlement Pending (Wagner v. Jules Appleman, as PR of Estate of Shirley Herndon 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Ronald Frank 12-CV-00817-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Vicki Frank 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Jules Appleman 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. David Defuria 12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Scott O'Hara 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Rosenberg 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Steven Pazand 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Francis Hovorka 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Merrion 12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Dennis Fahey 12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Jerry and Connie Davis 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV)(Wagner v. Mowery 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Amended ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Telephonic Status Conference on February 19, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Teleconference Line at (215) 446-3656, using code 4382538, to connect to the proceedings. (sr)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 722 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-1049 WJ/SMV) (kg)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-393 WJ/SMV) (kg)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-728 WJ/SMV) (kg)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-201 WJ/SMV) (kg)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a telephonic status conference in Wagner v. Wollen, 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV, for February 3, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Parties shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
January 24, 2014 Filing 717 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Jules Appelman, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Connie Davis, Jerry Davis, David Defuria, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Dennis Fahey, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Ronald Frank, Vicki Frank, Rachel Hanyeh, Shirley Herndon, Francis Hovorka, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Michael Menke, Merrion Family Limited Partnership, Daniel R. Mowery, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Scott O'Hara, Steven Pazand, Peymaneh Pour, Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh (Wagner v. Levann, 12-cv-00187)(Wagner v. Herndon, 12-cv-00188)(Wagner v. R. Frank, 12-cv-00189)(Wagner v. V. Frank, 12-cv-00190) (Wagner v. Appleman, 12-cv-00197)(Wagner v. DeFuria, 12-cv-00200)(Wagner v. Menke, 12-cv-00203) (Wagner v. Richards, 12-cv-00207) (Wagner v. OHara, 12-cv-00208) (Wagner v. Fenton, 12-cv-00241) (Wagner v. Rosenberg, 12-cv-00270) (Wagner v. Pazand, 12-cv-00291) (Wagner v. Hovorka, 12-cv-00299) (Wagner v. Jafari, 12-cv-00300) (Wagner v. Ansari, 12-cv-00301) (Wagner v. Louie-Yeh, 12-cv-00303) (Wagner v. Merrion, 12-cv-00306) (Wagner v. Fahey, 12-cv-00359) (Wagner v. Davis, 12-cv-00360) (Wagner v. Bandi, 12-cv-00391) (Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-00754) (Wagner v. Mowery, 12-cv-01105) (Chaitman, Helen)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 716 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadline through and until February 10, 2014 to respond to the Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demands #683 . (kg)
January 22, 2014 Filing 715 NOTICE of Settlement Pending (Wagner v. Wollen 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 714 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #649 Initial Scheduling Order only to the extent that the deadline to file the Joint Status Report in Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV, is extended through January 31, 2014. (am)
January 17, 2014 Filing 713 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Jules Appelman as PR of Herndon Estate (Case No. 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 712 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Davis, Jerry and Connie (Case No. 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 711 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Dennis Fahey (Case No. 12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 710 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Rosenberg (Case No. 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 709 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Jules Appelman as Rep. of Herndon Estate (Case No. 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 708 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. James Richards (Case No. 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 707 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff;s First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Steven Pazand (Case No. 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 17, 2014 Filing 706 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff;s First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Merrion Family Limited (Case No. 12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Filing 705 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Notice of Expert (Wagner v. LeVann 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman/Herndon 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, R. 12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, V. 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman, et. al. 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. DeFuria 12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Menke 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. OHara 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fenton, D. & N. 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Rosenbergs 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Pazand 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Hovorka 12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari, et. al. 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Ansari/Pour 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh, et. al. 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Merrion Family 12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fahey 12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. David, J. & C. 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi, et. al. 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Plaman/Kosinski 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Plaman, M. & J. 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind, et. al. 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Mowery, D. & M. 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Filing 704 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Appelman (Case No. 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Filing 703 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff;s First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures; Wagner v. Abbas Ansari and Peymaneh Pour (Case No. 12-CV-301-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Telephonic Status Conference on February 19, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Teleconference Line at (215) 446-3656, using code 4382538, to connect to the proceedings. (am) Modified to correct phone number on 1/27/2014 (bc).
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying #663 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-00300-WJ-SMV), #668 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Davis; 12-cv-00360-WJ-SMV), #671 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Mowery; 12-cv-01105-WJ-SMV), #652 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank R; 12-cv-00189-WJ-SMV), #664 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-00301-WJ-SMV), #655 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Defuria; 12-cv-00200-WJ-SMV), #662 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-cv-00299-WJ-SMV), #656 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Menke; 12-cv-00203-WJ-SMV), #657 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-00207-WJ-SMV), #658 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. O'Hara; 12-cv-00208-WJ-SMV), #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Louie-Yeh; 12-cv-00303-WJ-SMV), #659 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-00241-WJ-SMV), #651 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Herndon; 12-cv-00188-WJ-SMV), #653 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank V; 12-cv-00190-WJ-SMV), #654 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-cv-00197-WJ-SMV), #670 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-00754-WJ-SMV), #661 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Pazand; 12-cv-00291-WJ-SMV), #650 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-00187-WJ-SMV), #666 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Merrion; 12-cv-00306-WJ-SMV), #660 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Rosenberg; 12-cv-00270-WJ-SMV), #667 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fahey D; 12-cv-00359-WJ-SMV), #669 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-00391-WJ-SMV). Related document(s): #662 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-cv-00299-WJ-SMV), #655 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Defuria; 12-cv-00200-WJ-SMV), #669 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-00391-WJ-SMV), #668 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Davis; 12-cv-00360-WJ-SMV), #671 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Mowery; 12-cv-01105-WJ-SMV), #663 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-00300-WJ-SMV), #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Louie-Yeh; 12-cv-00303-WJ-SMV), #653 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank V; 12-cv-00190-WJ-SMV), #657 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-00207-WJ-SMV), #652 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank R; 12-cv-00189-WJ-SMV), #650 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-00187-WJ-SMV), #667 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fahey D; 12-cv-00359-WJ-SMV), #670 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-00754-WJ-SMV), #664 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-00301-WJ-SMV), #659 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-00241-WJ-SMV), #666 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Merrion; 12-cv-00306-WJ-SMV), #651 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Herndon; 12-cv-00188-WJ-SMV), #661 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Pazand; 12-cv-00291-WJ-SMV), #660 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Rosenberg; 12-cv-00270-WJ-SMV), #656 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Menke; 12-cv-00203-WJ-SMV), #658 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. O'Hara; 12-cv-00208-WJ-SMV), #654 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-cv-00197-WJ-SMV). (mag)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadline to file Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Prima Facie Case on her claims for fraudulent transfers through and until January 31, 2014 to facilitate settlement negotiations among the parties. (kg)
January 6, 2014 Filing 699 REPLY to Response to Motion re #662 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-cv-00299-WJ-SMV), #655 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Defuria; 12-cv-00200-WJ-SMV), #669 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-00391-WJ-SMV), #668 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Davis; 12-cv-00360-WJ-SMV), #671 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Mowery; 12-cv-01105-WJ-SMV), #663 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-00300-WJ-SMV), #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Louie-Yeh; 12-cv-00303-WJ-SMV), #653 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank V; 12-cv-00190-WJ-SMV), #657 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-00207-WJ-SMV), #652 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank R; 12-cv-00189-WJ-SMV), #650 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-00187-WJ-SMV), #667 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fahey D; 12-cv-00359-WJ-SMV), #670 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-00754-WJ-SMV), #664 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-00301-WJ-SMV), #659 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-00241-WJ-SMV), #666 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Merrion; 12-cv-00306-WJ-SMV), #651 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Herndon; 12-cv-00188-WJ-SMV), #661 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Pazand; 12-cv-00291-WJ-SMV), #660 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Rosenberg; 12-cv-00270-WJ-SMV), #656 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Menke; 12-cv-00203-WJ-SMV), #658 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. O'Hara; 12-cv-00208-WJ-SMV), #654 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-cv-00197-WJ-SMV) Defendants' Omnibus Reply in Further Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers filed by ADF Financial, Inc., Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Jules Appelman, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Abdul Dabiri, Connie Davis, Jerry Davis, David Defuria, Vahid Deriss, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Dennis Fahey, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Ronald Frank, Vicki Frank, Rachel Hanyeh, Shirley Herndon, Francis Hovorka, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Michael Menke, Merrion Family Limited Partnership, Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Scott O'Hara, Steven Pazand, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Chaitman, Helen)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 698 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-802 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 31, 2013 Filing 697 NOTICE of Settlement Pending (Wagner v. Feld 12-CV-00220-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 696 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson allowing defendants through and until January 27, 2014 to respond to the Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Jury Demands (Doc. No. 683)(Case Nos. 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV,12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV,12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV,. 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV, 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV). (mag)
December 23, 2013 Filing 695 RESPONSE in Opposition re #662 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-cv-00299-WJ-SMV), #655 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Defuria; 12-cv-00200-WJ-SMV), #669 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-00391-WJ-SMV), #668 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Davis; 12-cv-00360-WJ-SMV), #671 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Mowery; 12-cv-01105-WJ-SMV), #663 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-00300-WJ-SMV), #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Louie-Yeh; 12-cv-00303-WJ-SMV), #653 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank V; 12-cv-00190-WJ-SMV), #657 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-00207-WJ-SMV), #652 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank R; 12-cv-00189-WJ-SMV), #650 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-00187-WJ-SMV), #667 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fahey D; 12-cv-00359-WJ-SMV), #670 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-00754-WJ-SMV), #664 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-00301-WJ-SMV), #659 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-00241-WJ-SMV), #666 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Merrion; 12-cv-00306-WJ-SMV), #651 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Herndon; 12-cv-00188-WJ-SMV), #661 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Pazand; 12-cv-00291-WJ-SMV), #660 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Rosenberg; 12-cv-00270-WJ-SMV), #656 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Menke; 12-cv-00203-WJ-SMV), #658 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. O'Hara; 12-cv-00208-WJ-SMV), #654 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-cv-00197-WJ-SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
December 23, 2013 Filing 694 RESPONSE in Opposition re #683 MOTION to Strike Jury Demands, Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV (Meagle, Shay) Modified text to add case # on 12/24/2013 (nr).
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 693 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #501 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV). (mag)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #629 Motion for Relief from Order. Feld, 12-cv-0220 WJ/SMV (mag) Modified text to add case # on 12/24/2013 (nr).
December 20, 2013 Filing 691 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
December 20, 2013 Filing 690 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. DeFuria; 12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
December 20, 2013 Filing 689 NOTICE of Settlement. The Court has received confirmation that Tarro, 12-cv-0263 WJ/SMV, has settled. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
December 20, 2013 Filing 688 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Andy Feld, Julie Feld re #629 MOTION Relief from the Court's Order and Opinion Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re #627 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Julie Feld, Andy Feld (Cadigan, Michael)
December 19, 2013 Filing 687 Clerk's Minutes for status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on December 19, 2013, in Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105. Tarro, 12-cv-0263 WJ/SMV, was also addressed. (am)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #569 and #605 Orders setting Settlement Conferences in Plaman, 12-cv-0496; Plaman, 12-cv-0497; and Tarro, 12-cv-0263. The Settlement Conferences in these cases, on December 20, 2013, are VACATED and will be reset at a later date. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
December 19, 2013 Filing 685 REPLY to Response to Motion re #629 MOTION Relief from the Court's Order and Opinion Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re #627 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Andy Feld, Julie Feld. (Cadigan, Michael)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson striking Docs. #679 , #680 and #681 . (mag)
December 17, 2013 Filing 683 MOTION to Strike Jury Demands (Wagner v. Appelman 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, R. 12-CV-0189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Frank, V. 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman Trust & Academy Plumbing, Heating Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Menke 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Richards 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fenton, D. & N. 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Pazand 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Hovorka 12-CV-0299-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari et. al. 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Ansari & Pour 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh et. al. 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi, et. al. 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Lacy 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Mowery 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
December 17, 2013 Filing 682 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-CV-00197-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
December 13, 2013 Filing 681 ***STRICKEN pursuant to Order #684 - NOTICE OF FILING ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS by Judith A. Wagner re #680 Brief,,,,,, (Wagner v. Levann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Herndon [Appelman], 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. R. Frank, 12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. V. Frank, 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman, 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Defuria,12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Menke, 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. OHara, 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fenton, 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Rosenberg, 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Pazand, 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Hovorka,12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Ansari, 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Merrion Family Limited Partnership,12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fahey,12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Davis 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. WE Investments, 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Kosinski [Plaman], 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Plaman, 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Lacy, 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Mowery, 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Johnson, 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D1-B Part 1, #2 Exhibit D-1B Part 2, #3 Exhibit D-1B Part 3, #4 Exhibit D-1B Part 4, #5 Exhibit D-1B Part 5, #6 Exhibit D-1C)(Mazel, Edward) Modified on 12/13/2013 (yc). Modified to correct text on 12/16/2013 (bc). Modified text on 12/18/2013 (kg).
December 13, 2013 Filing 680 ***STRICKEN pursuant to Order #684 - BRIEF re #679 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All Defendants on All But One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (Wagner v. Levann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Herndon [Appelman], 12-CV-00188-WJ (Wagner v. Levann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Herndon [Appelman], 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. R. Frank, 12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. V. Frank, 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman, 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Defuria,12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Menke, 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. OHara, 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fenton, 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Rosenberg, 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Pazand, 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Hovorka,12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Ansari, 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Merrion Family Limited Partnership,12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fahey,12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Davis 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. WE Investments, 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Kosinski [Plaman], 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Plaman, 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Lacy, 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Mowery, 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Johnson, 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit C-1A, #8 Exhibit C-1B, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-1A Part 1, #11 Exhibit D-1A Part 2, #12 Exhibit D-1A Part 3)(Mazel, Edward) Modified to correct text on 12/16/2013 (bc). Modified text on 12/18/2013 (kg).
December 13, 2013 Filing 679 ***STRICKEN pursuant to Order #684 - MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against All Defendants on All But One Element of Trustee's Prima Facie Case on Actual and Constructive Fraudulent Transfers (Wagner v. Levann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Herndon [Appelman], 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. R. Frank, 12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. V. Frank, 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Appelman, 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Defuria,12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Menke, 12-CV-00203-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. OHara, 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fenton, 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Rosenberg, 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Pazand, 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Hovorka,12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jafari, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Ansari, 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Yeh, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Merrion Family Limited Partnership,12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Fahey,12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Davis 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Bandi, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. WE Investments, 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Kosinski [Plaman], 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Plaman, 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Lacy, 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Etkind, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Mowery, 12-CV-01105-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Johnson, 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward) Modified to correct text on 12/16/2013 (bc). Modified text on 12/18/2013 (kg).
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #617 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference. The 10:00 a.m. conference in Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV, is moved to 2:00 p.m. Otherwise, the Order remains in effect. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #624 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference and #623 Scheduling Order. Pursuant to the parties' settlement, all deadlines and settings set by Judge Vidmar are VACATED. (Wagner v. Galbreth, 12-cv-0728 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
December 12, 2013 Filing 676 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlements (Wagner v. WE Investments, LLC; 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Galbreth; 12-CV-00728-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 675 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Civil Case No. CV 12-262 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #637 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference and #448 Scheduling Order. Pursuant to the parties' settlement, all deadlines and settings set by Judge Vidmar are VACATED. (Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (sr)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 673 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #587 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Prima Facie Case on her Claims for Fraudulent Transfers (Original Case No. CV 13-662 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 672 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #587 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Prima Facie Case on her Claims for Fraudulent Transfers as to Certain Defendants (Original Case No. CV 12-547 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 10, 2013 Filing 671 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Mowery; 12-cv-01105-WJ-SMV) by Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 670 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-cv-00754-WJ-SMV) by Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 669 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-cv-00391-WJ-SMV) by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 668 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Davis; 12-cv-00360-WJ-SMV) by Connie Davis, Jerry Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 667 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fahey D; 12-cv-00359-WJ-SMV) by Dennis Fahey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 666 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Merrion; 12-cv-00306-WJ-SMV) by Merrion Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Louie-Yeh; 12-cv-00303-WJ-SMV) by David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 664 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Ansari; 12-cv-00301-WJ-SMV) by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 663 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-cv-00300-WJ-SMV) by Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 662 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-cv-00299-WJ-SMV) by Francis Hovorka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 661 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Pazand; 12-cv-00291-WJ-SMV) by Steven Pazand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 660 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Rosenberg; 12-cv-00270-WJ-SMV) by Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 659 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-cv-00241-WJ-SMV) by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 658 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. O'Hara; 12-cv-00208-WJ-SMV) by Scott O'Hara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 657 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Richards; 12-cv-00207-WJ-SMV) by James Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 656 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Menke; 12-cv-00203-WJ-SMV) by Michael Menke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 655 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Defuria; 12-cv-00200-WJ-SMV) by David Defuria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 654 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-cv-00197-WJ-SMV) by Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., Jules Appelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 653 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank V; 12-cv-00190-WJ-SMV) by Vicki Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 652 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Frank R; 12-cv-00189-WJ-SMV) by Ronald Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 651 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Herndon; 12-cv-00188-WJ-SMV) by Jules Appelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 650 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Wagner v. Levann; 12-cv-00187-WJ-SMV) by Jonathan Levann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 649 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING the telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for February 4, 2014, at 02:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. The Joint Status Report is due by January 21, 2014. Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV. (am)
December 9, 2013 Filing 648 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Supplement to Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Plaman - Kosinski 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 12/10/2013 (kg).
December 9, 2013 Filing 647 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of First Supplement to Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Plaman 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 12/10/2013 (kg).
December 6, 2013 Filing 646 ANSWER to Complaint by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. Related document: #288 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by James Richards.(Wagner v. Lacy CV 12-547 WJ/SMV) (Meagle, Shay) Modified text on 12/9/2013 (kg).
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 13-857 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 13-790 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 643 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-520 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 642 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-311 WJ/SMV) (kg)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson dismissing case (Wagner v. Wilger - CV-12-736 WJ/SMV). (mag)
December 5, 2013 Filing 640 RESPONSE in Opposition re #629 MOTION Relief from the Court's Order and Opinion Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re #627 Memorandum Opinion and Order, (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
December 4, 2013 Filing 639 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Notice of Expert (Wagner v. We Investments, LLC CV 12-392 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 12/4/2013 (kg).
December 3, 2013 Filing 638 Trustee's RESPONSE In Opposition to Defendants' Claim of Exemptions re #625 Claim filed by Judith A. Wagner. Wollen, 12-CV-413 WJ/SMV (White, Daniel) Modified text to add case # on 12/4/2013 (nr).
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic status conference for December 12, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (We Invs., 12-cv-0392) (sr)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 636 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending deadline for Defendants to file Answer to Complaint (Wagner v. Lacy - CV-12-547). (mag)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER to Submit Closing Documents no later than January 2, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar, in Wagner v. Hilliard, 12-cv-0790 WJ/SMV, and Wagner v. Jones, 12-cv-0857 WJ/SMV. (am)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #492 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV). (mag)
December 2, 2013 Filing 633 NOTICE of Settlement Pending (Wagner v. Graef; 12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
December 2, 2013 Filing 632 NOTICE of Settlement (Wagner v. Hilliard & White Case No. 12-CV-00790-WJ-SMV; Wagner v. Jones, D. & R. Case No. 12-CV-00857-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
November 27, 2013 Filing 631 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Judith A. Wagner re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner (Mazel, Edward)
November 27, 2013 Filing 630 REPLY to Response to Motion re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Tarro; 12-CV-00263-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
November 27, 2013 Filing 629 MOTION Relief from the Court's Order and Opinion Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re #627 Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Andy Feld, Julie Feld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Cadigan, Michael)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #501 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV). (mag)
November 25, 2013 Filing 628 Clerk's Minutes for follow-up settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on November 25, 2013, in Wagner v. Feld, 12-cv-0220. The case did not settle. (sr)
November 22, 2013 Filing 626 REPLY to Response to Motion re #501 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Feld 12-CV-00220-WJ/SMV) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Askew, James)
November 19, 2013 Filing 625 CLAIM by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen. (Behles, Jennie)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic status conference for March 3, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Galbreth, 12-cv-0728) (sr)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates on July 16, 2014. Proposed Pretrial Order is due by October 14, 2014. (Wagner v. Galbreth, 12-cv-0728) (sr)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING the Settlement Conference in Wagner v. Wollen, 12-cv-0413, on November 22, 2013. After considering the parties' confidential position statements, the Court finds that a settlement conference would not be fruitful at this time. A status conference will be set in the future to revisit the issue. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
November 18, 2013 Filing 622 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on November 18, 2013. (Wagner v. Galbreth, 12-cv-0728) (sr)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying #497 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or to Compel More Definite Statement,and Withdrawal of Motion To Quash Service. (Wagner v. Lacy - CV-12-547) (mag)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #423 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Pursuant to the parties' settlement, the Settlement Conference set for November 22, 2013, is hereby VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (Wagner v. Graef, 12-cv-0637) (sr)
November 15, 2013 Filing 618 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Abbas Ansari, Jules Appelman, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Connie Davis, Jerry Davis, David Defuria, Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind, Dennis Fahey, Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton, Ronald Frank, Vicki Frank, Rachel Hanyeh, Shirley Herndon, Francis Hovorka, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari, Jonathan Levann, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Michael Menke, Merrion Family Limited Partnership, Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Scott O'Hara, Steven Pazand, Peymaneh Pour, James Richards, Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg, Sharareh Shahin, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Certificate of Service of Document Productions in Accordance with the Court's October 16, 2013 Scheduling Order (12-cv-0187 Wagner v. Levann) (12-cv-0188 Wagner v Appelman) (12-cv-0189 Wagner v. Frank, R.) (12-cv-0190 Wagner v Frank, V.) (12-cv-0197 Wagner v Appelman et al) (12-cv-0200 Wagner v DeFuria) (12-cv-0203 Wagner v Menke) (12-cv-0207 Wagner v Richards) (12-cv-0208 Wagner v O'Hara) (12-cv-0241 Wagner v Fenton et al) (12-cv-0270 Wagner v Rosenberg et al) (12-cv-0291 Wagner v Pazand) (12-cv-0299 Wagner v Hovorka) (12-cv-0300 Wagner v Jafari) (12-cv-0301 Wagner v Ansari et al) (12-cv-0303 Wagner v Yeh et al) (12-cv-0306 Wagner v Merrion) (12-cv-0359 Wagner v Fahey) (12-cv-0360 Wagner v Davis et al) (12-cv-0391 Wagner v Bandi et al) (12-cv-0754 Wagner v Etkind et al) (12-cv-1105 Wagner v Mowery) (Chaitman, Helen)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Status Conference for February 13, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmars "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662) (sr)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 616 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates July 11, 2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by October 10, 2014. (Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662) (sr)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 614 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #588 Motion to Exceed Page Limits. (mag)
November 14, 2013 Filing 613 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement (Wagner v. Durano; 12-CV-00201-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
November 13, 2013 Filing 615 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on November 13, 2013. (Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662) (sr)
November 13, 2013 Filing 611 RESPONSE to Motion re #587 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Prima Facie Case on her Claims for Fraudulent Transfers [LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Appelman/Herndon, 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; R. Frank, 12-CV-001 filed by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. (Puccini, Louis)
November 12, 2013 Filing 612 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on November 12, 2013. (Wagner v. Wollen, No. 12-cv-0413) (sr)
November 12, 2013 Filing 610 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Johnson; 12-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
November 8, 2013 Filing 609 RESPONSE in Opposition re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) filed by Irene Tarro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Cadigan, Michael)
November 8, 2013 Filing 608 REPLY in Opposition re #501 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) filed by Andy Feld, Julie Feld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Cadigan, Michael) Modified text on 11/12/2013 (kg).
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ***FILED IN ERROR*** ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #588 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (mag) Modified text on 11/14/2013 (kg).
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #587 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (mag)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #594 Order Setting Settlement Conference, as described herein. The Settlement Conference in Tarro, 12-cv-0263, will be conducted on December 20, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. in the Pecos Courtroom in Albuquerque. (am)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #569 Order Setting Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference is RESCHEDULED from 9:00 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. The date and location---December 20, 2013, in the Pecos Courtroom in Albuquerque---remain unchanged. Plaman, 12-cv-496; Plaman, 12-cv-497. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
November 6, 2013 Filing 603 MOTION to Withdraw #601 Notice (Other) Initial Disclosures (13-CV-0662 WJ/SMV) by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Burns, James) Modified to term motion on 11/6/2013 (bc).
November 6, 2013 Filing 602 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Initial Disclosures (13-CV-0662 WJ/SMV) (Burns, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 601 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Initial Disclosures (Burns, James) Modified text on 11/6/2013, document should not be filed electronically (kg).
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 600 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for November 12, 2013, at 03:00 PM in Wagner v. Wollen, 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for November 12, 2013, at 03:00 PM in Wagner v. Wollen, 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
November 4, 2013 Filing 598 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v. Galbreth et. al.- 12-CV-00728-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James)
November 4, 2013 Filing 597 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Amended Answer to Complaint with Demand for Jury USDC Case No. 12-cv-00391 WPJ/SMV by Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., New Mexico Accounting Specialists, Inc., Sharareh Shahin. Related document: #260 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, ADF Financial, Inc., Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Abdul Dabiri, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi.(Chaitman, Helen)
November 1, 2013 Filing 596 Joint Status Report (US District Court Case 13-CV-0662-WJ/SMV) by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson (Burns, James)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Status Conference for December 19, 2013, at 09:00 a.m. in the conference room adjoining Visiting Judge Suite 720 - Albuquerque. (Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105) (sr) Modified to add text on 11/1/2013 (bc).
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for November 25, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom. (Tarro, 12-cv-0263) (sr)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 593 FILED IN ERROR: ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for November 25, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom. (Tarro, 12-cv-0263) (sr) Modified on 11/1/2013 (bc).
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Second Settlement Conference for November 25, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom. (Feld, 12-cv-0220)(sr)
October 31, 2013 Filing 591 Clerk's Minutes for omnibus telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on October 31, 2013. (Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105) (sr)
October 31, 2013 Filing 590 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on October 31, 2013. (Feld, 12-cv-0220, and Tarro, 12-cv-0263). (sr)
October 30, 2013 Filing 589 REPLY to Response to Motion re #497 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or to Compel More Definite Statement filed by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. (Meagle, Shay)
October 30, 2013 Filing 588 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Prima Facie Case on Certain Claims for Preferential Transfers [V. Frank, 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Durano, 12-CV-00201-WJ-SMV; Menke, 12-CV-00202-WJ-SMV; OHara, 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV; Fenton, 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Ansari/Pour, 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Mowery, 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV] by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
October 30, 2013 Filing 587 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Prima Facie Case on her Claims for Fraudulent Transfers [LeVann, 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV; Appelman/Herndon, 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV; R. Frank, 12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV; V. Frank, 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV; Appelman, 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV; DeFuria, 12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV; Durano, 12-CV-00201-WJ-SMV; Menke, 12-CV-00202-WJ-SMV; Richards, 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV; O'Hara, 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV; Fenton, 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV; Rosenburg, 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV; Pazand, 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV; Hovorka, 12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV; Jafari, 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV; Ansari/Pour, 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV; Yeh, 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV; Merrion Family, 12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV; Fahey, 12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV; J&C Davis, 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV; Bandi, 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV; WE Investments, 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV; Plaman/Kosinski, 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV; Plaman, 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV; Lacy, 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV; Graef, 12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV; Galbreth, 12-CV-00728-WJ-SMV; Etkind, 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV; Mowery, 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV; R&C Johnson, 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV] by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
October 30, 2013 Filing 586 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #582 Notice (Other), #581 Notice (Other), (Wagner v. Feld 12-CV-00220-WJ/SMV, and Wagner v. Tarro 12-CV-0263-WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Daniel)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar STRIKING #583 Plaintiff's Joint Status Report, STRIKING #584 Defendants' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, and AMENDING [Doc. 544] the Court's Initial Scheduling Order. Johnson, 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV (am) Modified text on 10/30/2013 (sju)
October 29, 2013 Filing 584 STRICKEN: REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Burns, James) Modified to add text pursuant to doc #585 on 11/1/2013 (bc).
October 29, 2013 Filing 583 STRICKEN:Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Richard and Cheryl Johnson; Case No. 13-CV-00662-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James) Modified to add text pursuant to doc #585 on 11/1/2013 (bc).
October 29, 2013 Filing 582 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #498 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) of Supplemental Authority (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 29, 2013 Filing 581 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) of Supplemental Authority (Wagner v. Tarro; 12-CV-00263-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Status Conference for October 31, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me"line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Feld, 12-cv-0220, and Tarro, 12-cv-0263). (sr)
October 25, 2013 Filing 579 Proposed Pretrial Order by Irene Tarro (Cadigan, Michael)
October 25, 2013 Filing 578 Proposed Pretrial Order by Andy Feld, Julie Feld (Cadigan, Michael)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference set on October 31, 2013, at 01:30 PM. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. This order applies to: Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105. (am)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #571 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; #572 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Helen Chaitman is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Jill Plaman and Michael Plaman in the following cases: Plaman, 12-cv-0496, and Plaman, 12-cv-0497. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (sr) Modified text on 12/2/2013 (vh).
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING deadline to file final pretrial order. Final pretrial order is due on October 25, 2013. (Tarro, 12-cv-0263) (sr)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar EXTENDING deadline to file final pretrial order. Final pretrial order is due on October 25, 2013. (Feld, 12-cv-0220) (sr)
October 22, 2013 Filing 573 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Notice of Expert (Wagner v. Wollen, et. al, - 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Graef - 12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Davis - 12-CV-00802-WJ-SMV, Wagner v. Atchley - 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 22, 2013 Filing 572 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaman 12-cv-00497 WPJ/SMV by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman. (Chaitman, Helen)
October 22, 2013 Filing 571 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaman 12-cv-00496 WPJ/SMV by Jill Plaman. (Chaitman, Helen)
October 17, 2013 Filing 570 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Adelina Graef (12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for December 20, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in 340 Pecos Courtroom - Albuquerque. (Plaman, 12-cv-496; Plaman, 12-cv-497) (sr).
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The parties in Hilliard, 13-cv-0790; and Jones, 13-cv-0857; continue settlement negotiations. However, Defendant(s) in each case shall file a responsive pleading pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 no later than November 29, 2013, unless their respective case has settled. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORTS by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. This order applies to the following cases: Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; Plaman, 12-cv-0497; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105. (am)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 566 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates on June 12, 2014. Pretrial motions are due by July 14, 2014. This order applies to the following cases: Levann, 12-cv-0187; Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; Plaman, 12-cv-0497; Etkind, 12-cv-0754; and Mowery, 12-cv-1105. (am)
October 16, 2013 Filing 565 NOTICE of Settlement Pending in Rosenthal, 12-CV-00262-WJ-SMV; Tarbescu-Deutschmann, 12-CV-00290-WJ-SMV; Napoleon, 12-CV-00393-WJ-SMV; Davis, 12-CV-00802-WJ-SMV; Dorn/McNaughton, 12-CV-00870-WJ-SMV; and Atchley, 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV. by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
October 16, 2013 Filing 564 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on October 16, 2013. (Plaman, No. 12-cv-0496, Plaman, No. 12-cv-0497, Hilliard, No. 13-cv-0790, and Jones, No. 13-cv-0857)(sr)
October 15, 2013 Filing 563 Clerk's Minutes for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on October 15, 2013, in Wagner v. Atchley, 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV. The case has settled. (am)
October 15, 2013 Filing 562 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2013 This Order applies to the following cases: Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Levann, 12-cv-0187; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Tarbescu-Deutschmann, 12-cv-0290; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Napoleon, 12-cv-0393; Dorn, 12-cv-0870; Mowery, 12-cv-1105; Etkind, 12-cv-0754, Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; and Plaman, 12-cv-0497. (Tape #LCR Cimarron) (vh) Modified text on 10/16/2013 (vh).
October 15, 2013 Filing 561 Answer to Complaint (Galbreth Defendants USDC No. 12-CV-728) by William Galbreth(Individually, and as Trustee of the William E. Galbreth, D.M.D., P.C. Defined Benefit Plan, and as Trustee of the William E. Galbreth, D.M.D., P.C. 401(k) Plan) (Freedman, David) Modified text on 10/15/2013 (kg).
October 11, 2013 Filing 560 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT Wagner v. Feld as to document #455 Motion to Compel,(Case No. 12-CV-220 WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel) Modified text on 10/15/2013 (jrm).
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending time to file Response and Reply to #492 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) Deadline to Respond is 11/8/13 and Reply deadline is 11/29/13. (mag)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson extending time to file Response and Reply to #501 Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV). Deadline to Respond is 11/8/13 and Reply deadline is 11/29/13. (mag)
October 10, 2013 Filing 557 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lyman S. Atchley Defendant Lyman S. Atchley, as Trustee of the Atchley Family Trust, Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Dixon, Gerald)
October 9, 2013 Filing 556 RESPONSE in Opposition re #497 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or to Compel More Definite Statement Case No. 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV (Donald Lacy, Deanna Lacy, and Doris Lacy) filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Wagner v. Appelman - CV-12-188) (mag)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 554 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson vacating 10/9/13 #345 Motion for Summary Judgment hearing. (Wagner v. Appelman - 12CV0188). Judge will enter ruling based on the briefs as submitted. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (mag)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by November 4, 2013. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for November 18, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to be connected to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Galbreth, 12-cv-0728) (sr)
October 8, 2013 Filing 552 NOTICE by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 551 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing (Chappell, Merrie)
October 8, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3289828 re: # 551 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chappell, Merrie)
October 8, 2013 Filing 551 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon by Merrie L Chappell on behalf of: Julie Gorchkova Becker & Poliakoff, LLP 45 Broadway, 8th FloorNew York, NY 10006 212-599-3322 Fax 212-557-0295 jgorchkova@bplegal.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chappell, Merrie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 7, 2013 Filing 550 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #498 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) by Andy Feld, Julie Feld. (Cadigan, Michael) Modified text on 10/8/2013, document attached is incorrect (kg).
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #420 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Pursuant to the parties' notification that they have settled, the Settlement Conference on October 11, 2013, is VACATED. Wagner v. Davis, 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar RESETTING deadline for Joint Status Report. Counsel shall file a Joint Status Report by October 15, 2013. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (sr) (Wagner v. Napoleon, 12-cv-0393 WJ/SMV)
October 3, 2013 Filing 547 Clerk's minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on October 3, 2013. (Wagner v. Napoleon, No. 12-cv-0393 WJ/SMV) (sr)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Status Conference for October 16, 2013, at 9:30 a.m.. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. This Order applies to the following four cases: Plaman, 12-cv-0496; Plaman, 12-cv-0497; Hilliard, 13-cv-0790; and Jones, 13-cv-0857. (sr)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5 in 12cv728). (mag)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by October 29, 2013. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for November 13, 2013, at 03:00 p.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Johnson, 13-cv-0662 WJ/SMV) (sr)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for October 3, 2013, at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (Wagner v. Napoleon, 12-cv-0393 WJ/SMV) (sr)
September 30, 2013 Filing 542 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Levann; 12-CV-00187-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Appelman-Herndon; 12-CV-00188-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. R. Frank; 12-CV-00189-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. V. Frank; 12-CV-00190-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Appelman; 12-CV-00197-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Defuria; 12-CV-00200-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Durano; 12-CV-00201-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Menke; 12-CV-00202-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Richards; 12-CV-00207-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. OHara; 12-CV-00208-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Fenton; 12-CV-00241-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Rosenberg; 12-CV-00270-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Pazand; 12-CV-00291-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Hovorka; 12-CV-00299-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Jafari; 12-CV-00300-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Ansari-Pour; 12-CV-00301-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Yeh; 12-CV-00303-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Merrion Family Limited Partnership; 12-CV-00306-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Fahey; 12-CV-00359-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Davis; 12-CV-00360-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Bandi; 12-CV-00391-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Napoleon; 12-CV-00393-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Plaman-Kosinski; 12-CV-00496-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Plaman; 12-CV-00497-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Etkind; 12-CV-00754-WJ-SMV) (Wagner v. Mowery; 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 541 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Graef; 12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 540 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Wollen; 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 539 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Davis; 12-CV-00802-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 538 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. WE Investments; 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 537 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 536 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Third Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Atchley; 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 535 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) of Compliance With D.N.M.LR-Civ.7.1(a) (Wagner v. Tarro; 12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 534 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-01105) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 533 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janice Dorn, Thomas McNaughton Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00870) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 532 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00754) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 531 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00497) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jill Plaman Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00496) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 529 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00391) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 528 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connie Davis, Jerry Davis Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00360) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 527 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Fahey Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00359) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merrion Family Limited Partnership Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00306) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 525 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Hanyeh, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00303) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 524 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00301) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 523 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vahid Deriss, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00300) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Francis Hovorka Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00299) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 521 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Pazand Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00291) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00270) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 519 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00241) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 518 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott O'Hara Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00208) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 517 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Richards Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00207) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 516 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Menke Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00203) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 515 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Demosthenes Durano, Glenda Durano, Durano Construction, Durano Enterprises, Ltd. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00201) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Defuria Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00200) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 513 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., Jules Appelman Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00197) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 512 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Frank Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00190) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 511 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Frank Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00189) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 510 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00188) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 509 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Levann Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (12-cv-00187) (Chaitman, Helen)
September 27, 2013 Filing 508 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (USDC 13-cv-00662) (Burns, James) Modified text on 9/30/2013, second duplicate answer (kg).
September 27, 2013 Filing 507 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY*** ANSWER to #260 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson.(Burns, James) Modified text on 9/30/2013, see answer #506 (kg).
September 27, 2013 Filing 506 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (13-cv-662 WJ/SMV) by Cheryl Johnson, Richard Johnson. (Burns, James) Modified text on 9/30/2013 (kg).
September 27, 2013 Filing 505 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #499 Brief, of Filing Additional Exhibits to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims. Fourth Notice. (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H)(White, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 Filing 502 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement Agreement with Defendants in Dorn/McNaughton Matter (Case No. 12-CV-00870-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 Filing 501 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 Filing 500 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #499 Brief, of Filing Additional Exhibits to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (CV 12-220 WJ/SMV Wagner v. Feld) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B Part 1, #2 Exhibit D-1B Part 2, #3 Exhibit D-1B Part 3, #4 Exhibit D-1B Part 4, #5 Exhibit D-1B Part 5, #6 Exhibit D-1C)(White, Daniel) Modified text on 9/27/2013 (kg).
September 27, 2013 Filing 499 BRIEF re #498 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-1A, #5 Exhibit C-1B, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-1A Part 1, #8 Exhibit D-1A Part 2, #9 Exhibit D-1A Part 3)(Mazel, Edward)
September 27, 2013 Filing 498 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Andy and Julie Feld on the Trustee's Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Feld; 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
September 25, 2013 Filing 497 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or to Compel More Definite Statement by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. (Meagle, Shay)
September 25, 2013 Filing 496 NOTICE of Hearing on #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 540 Bonito Courtroom before District Judge William P. Johnson. Wagner v Appelman 12-CV-0188 (mag)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified to add text on 9/27/2013 (bc).
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-636 WJ/SMV) (kg)
September 24, 2013 Filing 494 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner re #493 Brief, Of Filing Additional Exhibits to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro; Case No. 12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B Part 1, #2 Exhibit D-1B Part 2, #3 Exhibit D-1B Part 3, #4 Exhibit D-1B Part 4, #5 Exhibit D-1B Part 5, #6 Exhibit D-1C, #7 Exhibit E)(Mazel, Edward)
September 24, 2013 Filing 493 BRIEF re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) (Wagner v. Tarro; 12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-1A, #5 Exhibit C-1B, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-1A Part 1, #8 Exhibit D-1A Part 2, #9 Exhibit D-1A Part 3)(Mazel, Edward)
September 24, 2013 Filing 492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Irene Tarro On Her Four-Year Fraudulent Transfer Claims (Wagner v. Tarro;12-CV-263-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
September 24, 2013 Filing 491 NOTICE of Settlement Agreement with Defendant Edith Tarbescu-Deutschmann (Case No. 12-CV-00290-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING #475 Defendant's Motion to Appear Electronically. Defendant is required to appear personally at the Settlement Conference. Wagner v. Graef, 12-cv-0637 WJ/SMV. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING #473 Defendant's Motion to Appear Electronically. Defendant is required to appear personally at the Settlement Conference. Wagner v. Deborah Davis, 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for November 22, 2013, at 01:30 p.m. in the Mimbres Courtroom in Albuquerque, New Mexico. (Wagner v. Wollen, No. 12-cv-0413). (sr)
September 20, 2013 Filing 487 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on September 19, 2013. (Wagner v. Wollen, no. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV). (sr)
September 20, 2013 Filing 486 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Mowery; 12-cv-01105-WJ-SMV) by Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 485 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Dorn et al; 12-cv-00870-WJ-SMV) by Janice Dorn, Thomas McNaughton (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 484 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Etkind; 12-cv-00754-WJ-SMV) by Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 483 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Plaman et al; 12-cv-00497-WJ-SMV) by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 482 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Plaman; 12-cv-00496-WJ-SMV) by Jill Plaman (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 481 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Bandi et al; 12-cv-00391-WJ-SMV) by Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Shahla Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., New Mexico Accounting Specialists, Inc., Sharareh Shahin (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 480 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Davis; 12-cv-00360-WJ-SMV) by Connie Davis, Jerry Davis (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 479 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Fahey; 12-cv-00359-WJ-SMV) by Dennis Fahey (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 478 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Merrion; 12-cv-00306-WJ-SMV) by Merrion Family Limited Partnership (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 477 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Yeh et al; 12-cv-00303-WJ-SMV) by Rachel Hanyeh, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 476 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Ansari; 12-cv-00301-WJ-SMV) by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 475 MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Video Conference by Adelina Graef. (Burns, James)
September 20, 2013 Filing 474 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Jafari; 12-cv-00300-WJ-SMV) by Vahid Deriss, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 473 MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Video Conference by Deborah Davis. (12-cv-802WJ/SMV)(Burns, James) Modified to add text on 9/23/2013 (ic).
September 20, 2013 Filing 472 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Hovorka; 12-cv-00299-WJ-SMV) by Francis Hovorka (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 471 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Pazand; 12-cv-00291-WJ-SMV) by Steven Pazand (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 470 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Rosenberg; 12-cv-00270-WJ-SMV) by Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 469 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Fenton; 12-cv-00241-WJ-SMV) by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 468 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v O'Hara; 12-cv-00208-WJ-SMV) by Scott O'Hara (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 467 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Richards; 12-cv-00207-WJ-SMV) by James Richards (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 466 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Menke; 12-cv-00203-WJ-SMV) by Michael Menke (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 465 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Durano; 12-cv-00201-WJ-SMV) by Demosthenes Durano, Glenda Durano, Durano Construction, Durano Enterprises, Ltd. (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 464 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Defuria; 12-cv-00200-WJ-SMV) by David Defuria (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 463 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v Appelman; 12-cv-00197-WJ-SMV) by Jules Appelman (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 462 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v. Vicki Frank; 12-cv-00190-WJ-SMV) by Vicki Frank (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 461 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v. Ronald Frank; 12-cv-00189-WJ-SMV) by Ronald Frank (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 460 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v. Herndon; 12-cv-00188-WJ-SMV) by Shirley Herndon (Chaitman, Helen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 459 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan (Wagner v. LeVann; 12-cv-00187-WJ-SMV) by Jonathan Levann (Chaitman, Helen)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #442 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 9/30/2013. Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547-WJ-SMV. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mag)
September 17, 2013 Filing 457 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Second Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures (Wagner v. Atchley 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 9/18/2013 (kg).
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #450 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Wagner v. Feld, 12-cv-0220 WJ/SMV; Wagner v Tarro, 12-cv-0263 WJ/SMV (mag) Modified to add text on 9/18/2013 (ic).
September 16, 2013 Filing 455 MOTION to Compel Verifications for Responses to the Trustee's First Request for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Andy and Julie Feld (Wagner v. Feld 12-CV-220-WJ/SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (White, Daniel)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic status conference for September 19, 2013, at 02:30 PM. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Wollen, No. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (sr)
September 12, 2013 Filing 453 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lyman S. Atchley Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Judith A. Wagner (Dixon, Gerald)
September 11, 2013 Filing 452 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Lyman S. Atchley, as Trustee of the Lyman S. Atchley Family Trust (Wagner v. Atchley 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 11, 2013 Filing 451 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Deborah Davis (Wagner v. Davis 12-CV-00802-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 10, 2013 Filing 450 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Excess of Page Limits Set Forth in D.N.M.LR-Civ.7.5 and 10.5 in Connection with Motions for Summary Judgement on Plaintiff's Prima Facie Case on Her Claims for Fraudulent Transfer and Preferential Transfer (Julie Feld and Andy Feld: 12-CV-00220-WJ-SMV & Irene Tarro: 12-CV-00263-WJ-SMV) by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar ADOPTING #441 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC., No. 12-cv-0392. (sr)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery due by March 5, 2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by June 4, 2014. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC., No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV (sr)
September 6, 2013 Filing 447 Clerk's minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 9/6/2013 for Wagner v. We Invs., LLC., No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. (sr)
September 4, 2013 Filing 446 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's First Supplement To Her Initial Disclosures. (Wagner v. WE Investments, LLC; Case No. 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV) (White, Daniel)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-494 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 29, 2013 Filing 444 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures. Wagner v. WE Investments,LLC; Case No. 12-CV-00392-WJ-SMV (White, Daniel)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-328 WJ/SMV) (kg)
August 26, 2013 Filing 442 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #434 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Quash Serivce Wagner v. Lacy; Case No. 12-CV-00547-WJ-SMV by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
August 22, 2013 Filing 441 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by We Investments, LLC (Chappell, Merrie)
August 19, 2013 Filing 440 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A White on behalf of Judith A. Wagner (White, Daniel)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #403 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Reasonable Expenses. Plaintiff shall submit the appropriate affidavit within seven days. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (am)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadlines to File Discovery Motions and Extending Deadline to File Pretrial Motions, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. This Order modifies certain deadlines set in the Court's #135 Scheduling Order. Wagner v. Tarro, case no. 12-cv-0263 WJ/SMV. (msp)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadlines to File Discovery Motions and Extending Deadline to File Pretrial Motions, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. This Order modifies certain deadlines set in the Court's #120 Scheduling Order. Wagner v. Feld, case no. 12-cv-0220 WJ/SMV. (msp)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING #435 Defendants' Motion to Set a Settlement Conference, for failure to comply with D.N.M.LR-Civ. 7.1(a). Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
August 14, 2013 Filing 435 MOTION To Refer This Adversary Proceeding to Mediation by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. (Puccini, Louis)
August 12, 2013 Filing 434 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION to Quash Serivce by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Puccini, Louis)
August 12, 2013 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Puccini, Jr on behalf of Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy (Puccini, Louis)
August 12, 2013 Filing 432 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Supplement to Her Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Wagner v. Feld CV 12-220 WJ/SMV) (White, Daniel) Modified text on 8/12/2013 (kg).
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #403 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel in Aid of Execution and ORDERING Defendant Dahrling Enterprises, Inc., to show cause within 5 days. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV. (am)
July 30, 2013 Filing 430 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff Wagner's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) in Case no. 12-CV-00413WJ-SMV (Wagner v. Wollen) (White, Daniel)
July 30, 2013 Filing 429 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff Wagner's First SUpplement to Her Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) in Case No. 12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV (Wagner v. Graef) (White, Daniel)
July 30, 2013 Filing 428 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff Wagner's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 (a)(1) in Case No. 12-CV-00802-WJ-SMV (Wagner v. Davis) (White, Daniel)
July 30, 2013 Filing 427 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff Wagner's First Supplement to Her Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) in Case No. 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV (Wagner v. Atchley) (White, Daniel)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar ADOPTING #400 Joint Status Report. Wagner v. Wollen, no. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery is due by 2/20/2014. Wagner v. Wollen, no. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Filing 424 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 7/25/2013. (Tape #Liberty - Dona Ana Courtroom). Wagner v. Wollen, no. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar Setting Settlement Conference for 11/22/2013 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom. Wagner v. Graef, no. 12-cv-0637 WJ/SMV(msp) Modified text on 7/29/2013 (ick).
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar ADOPTING #397 Joint Status Report. Wagner v. Graef, no. 12-cv-0637 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery is due by 2/20/2014. Wagner v. Graef, no. 12-cv-0637 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar Setting Settlement Conference for 10/11/2013 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom. Wagner v. Davis, no. 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar ADOPTING #396 Joint Status Report. Wagner v. Davis, no. 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery is due by 2/20/2014. Wagner v. Davis, no. 12c-cv-0802 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Filing 417 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conferences held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 7/25/2013. Wagner v. Davis and Wagner v. Graef, nos. 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV and 12-cv-0637 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for 10/15/2013 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom. Wagner v. Atchley, 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar ADOPTING #395 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Wagner v. Atchley, 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery due by 2/20/2014. Wagner v. Atchley, 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV.(msp)
July 29, 2013 Filing 413 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 7/25/2013. Wagner v. Atchley, no. 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV. (Tape #Liberty - Dona Ana Courtroom) (msp)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING Location of the Omnibus Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The Court's #387 Initial Scheduling Order is amended such that the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/15/2013 at 09:00 AM will now be held in the Cimarron Courtroom. This Order applies to the following cases: Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Levann, 12-cv-0187; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Tarbescu-Deutschmann, 12-cv-0290; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Napoleon, 12-cv-0393; Dorn, 12-cv-0870; Mowery, 12-cv-1105; Etkind, 12-cv-0754, Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; and Plaman, 12-cv-0497. (msp)
July 26, 2013 Filing 411 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lyman S. Atchley of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Dixon, Gerald) Modified text on 7/29/2013 (kg).
July 23, 2013 Filing 410 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen /Exhibit List to Counsel (Behles, Jennie)
July 23, 2013 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen re #408 Witness List /Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) (Behles, Jennie)
July 23, 2013 Filing 408 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Witness List by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen. (Behles, Jennie) Modified text on 7/24/2013, initial disclosures should not be filed electronically (kg).
July 18, 2013 Filing 407 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Davis; Case No. 12-CV-00802-WJ-SMV) (Mazel, Edward)
July 18, 2013 Filing 406 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Graef; Case No. 12-CV-00637-WJ-SMV) (Mazel, Edward)
July 18, 2013 Filing 405 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Wollen; Case No. 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV) (Mazel, Edward)
July 18, 2013 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Atchley; Case No. 12-CV-01049-WJ-SMV) (Mazel, Edward)
July 18, 2013 Filing 403 MOTION to Compel (I) Responses to the Trustee's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production in Aid of Execution to Defendant Dahrling Enterprises, Inc., (II) for a Finding That Defendant has Waived its Right to Object to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production, and (III) for Attorneys' Fees by Judith A. Wagner. (Mazel, Edward)
July 17, 2013 Filing 402 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Davis of Initial Disclosures (Burns, James) Modified text on 7/18/2013 (kg).
July 17, 2013 Filing 401 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adelina Graef of Initial Disclosures (Burns, James) Modified text on 7/18/2013 (kg).
July 15, 2013 Filing 400 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan - Wollen; Case No. 12-CV-00413-WJ-SMV by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James)
July 13, 2013 Filing 399 NOTICE by Mark Dahrling, Maura Dahrling of Bankruptcy (Daniels, Michael)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 398 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Joint Status Report is due by 8/21/2013. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9/5/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 10, 2013 Filing 397 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan; Wagner v. Graef Case No. 12cv637 WJ/SMV by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James) Modified text on 7/11/2013 per counsel's request to include adversary case number (pz).
July 10, 2013 Filing 396 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan; Wagner v. Davis Case No. 12cv802 WJ/SMV by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James) Modified text on 7/11/2013 per counsel's request to include adversary case number(pz). Modified text on 7/11/2013 per counsel's request to reflect correct adversary number (pz).
July 10, 2013 Filing 395 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan; Wagner v. Atchley Case No. 12cv1049 WJ/SMV by Judith A. Wagner (Askew, James) Modified text on 7/11/2013 per counsel's request to include adversary case number (pz).
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar Granting #392 Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete Joint Status Report. The Joint Status Report is due no later than July 15, 2013. Wagner v. Wollen, No. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #390 Order Setting a Telephonic Status Conference on July 12, 2013, in Wagner v. Heggem, 12-cv-0494 WJ/SMV, because the parties have reached a written settlement agreement. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
July 9, 2013 Filing 392 MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline to Complete Joint Status Repor and Provisional Discovery Plan by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen. (Behles, Jennie)
July 9, 2013 Filing 391 Clerk's Minutes for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 7/9/2013. The case did not settle. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for 7/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Heggem, No. 12-cv-0494 WJ/SMV. (msp)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Summons Issued pursuant to #383 ORDER by Judge Johnson as to Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy (Original Case No. 12cv547). (mr)
July 2, 2013 Filing 389 AMENDED ANSWER to ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND (JUDITH WAGNER v. JULES APPELMAN as representative of the Estate of SHIRLEY HERNDON, USDC Case No. 12-cv-00188 WPJ/SMV) by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon. (Chaitman, Helen)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-747 WJ/SMV) (kg)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Joint Status Reports are due by 9/20/2013. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before Judge Vidmar. This Order applies to the following cases: Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Levann, 12-cv-0187; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Tarbescu-Deutschmann, 12-cv-0290; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Napoleon, 12-cv-0393; Dorn, 12-cv-0870; Mowery, 12-cv-1105; Etkind, 12-cv-0754, Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; and Plaman, 12-cv-0497. (msp)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-298 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 28, 2013 Filing 385 Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 6/28/2013. (Tape #Dona Ana Courtroom - Liberty). These Clerk's Minutes apply to the following cases: Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Levann, 12-cv-0187; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Tarbescu-Deutschmann, 12-cv-0290; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Napoleon, 12-cv-0393; Dorn, 12-cv-0870; Mowery, 12-cv-1105; Etkind, 12-cv-0754, Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; and Plaman, 12-cv-0497. (msp)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER TO PAY PLAINTIFF'S REASONABLE EXPENSES by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Defendants shall pay Plaintiff $551.59 within 15 days. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (am) Modified text on 6/27/2013 (ick).
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying Motion to Dismiss, Quashing Service of Process and directing Trustee to Re-serve Defendants. Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV. (mag) Modified text on 6/26/2013 (ick).
June 26, 2013 Filing 382 AFFIDAVIT of Edward A. Mazel by Judith A. Wagner. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (Mazel, Edward) Modified text on 6/26/2013 (ick).
June 26, 2013 Filing 381 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Wollen, Julius Wollen Response to Plaintiff's Request For Admission (Behles, Jennie) Modified text on 6/27/2013 (kg).
June 26, 2013 Filing 380 DECLARATION re #377 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Merrie Chappell in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon (Chaitman, Helen)
June 26, 2013 Filing 379 ERRATA re #377 Reply to Response to Motion, Corrected Table of Contents page i by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon (Chaitman, Helen)
June 26, 2013 Filing 378 DECLARATION re #377 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
June 26, 2013 Filing 377 REPLY to Response to Motion re #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon. (Chaitman, Helen)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-389 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 375 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-372 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #342 Defendant Maura Dahrling's Motion for Protective Order regarding her deposition on May 31, 2013. Plaintiff did not respond to the motion, and the time for doing so has passed. Thus, pursuant to D.N.M.LR-Civ. 7.1(b), Plaintiff's failure to respond is deemed consent to grant the motion. Accordingly, the motion is granted. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am) Modified on 6/20/2013 (ick).
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Settlement Conference for 7/9/2013 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 19, 2013 Filing 372 Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 6/19/2013. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #339 Plaintiff's Motion for Reasonable Expenses. Plaintiff shall submit the appropriate affidavit within seven days. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV. (am)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AMENDING #361 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference. The Telephonic Status Conference is RESCHEDULED from 9:00 a.m. to 1:30 p.m. The date of the Telephonic Status Conference, June 19, 2013, remains unchanged. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (msp)
June 17, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV by Maureen A Sanders on behalf of Judith A. Wagner (Sanders, Maureen) Modified on 6/17/2013 (jv).
June 14, 2013 Filing 368 ERRATA re #340 Amended Answer to Complaint by Adelina Graef (Burns, James)
June 14, 2013 Filing 367 ERRATA re #341 Amended Answer to Complaint by Deborah Davis (Burns, James)
June 14, 2013 Filing 366 RESPONSE in Opposition re Wagner v. Appelman, 12CV188 WJ/SMV #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Judith A. Wagner. (Askew, James) Modified on 6/14/2013 (jv).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Joint Status Report is due by 7/10/2013. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 7/25/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Wollen, et al., No. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Joint Status Report is due by 7/10/2013. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 7/25/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Graef, No. 12-cv-0637 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Joint Status Report is due by 7/10/2013. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 7/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Davis, No. 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Joint Status Report is due by 7/10/2013. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 7/25/2013 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Atchley, No. 12-cv-1049 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 6/19/2013 at 09:00 AM. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. We Invs., LLC, No. 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for 28 cases, set for 6/28/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. This Order applies to the following cases: Appelman, 12-cv-0188; Levann, 12-cv-0187; Frank, 12-cv-0189; Frank, 12-cv-0190; Appelman, 12-cv-0197; Defuria, 12-cv-0200; Menke, 12-cv-0203; Richards, 12-cv-0207; O'Hara, 12-cv-0208; Fenton, 12-cv-0241; Rosenberg, 12-cv-0270; Tarbescu-Deutschmann, 12-cv-0290; Pazand, 12-cv-0291; Hovorka, 12-cv-0299; Jafari, 12-cv-0300; Ansari, 12-cv-0301; Yeh, 12-cv-0303; Davis, 12-cv-0360; Fahey, 12-cv-0359; Merrion Family Ltd. P'ship, 12-cv-0306; Bandi, 12-cv-0391; Napoleon, 12-cv-0393; Dorn, 12-cv-0870; Mowery, 12-cv-1105; Etkind, 12-cv-0754, Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201; Plaman, 12-cv-0496; and Plaman, 12-cv-0497. (msp) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ick).
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #339 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and ORDERING Defendants to show cause within 5 days, in Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV. (am)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-518 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-427 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-390 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-202 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-198 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-193 WJ/SMV) (kg)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #347 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (kg)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar (I) EXTENDING Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production, and (II) EXTENDING Deadline for Plaintiff to Depose Defendant. This Order modifies the Court's #135 Scheduling Order. Wagner v. Tarro, No. 12-cv-0263 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar (I) EXTENDING Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production, (II) EXTENDING Deadline for Plaintiff to Depose Non-Expert Witnesses, and (III) CONSENTING to the Plaintiff's Taking a Second Deposition of Steven Etkind in this Proceeding. This Order modifies the Court's #120 Scheduling Order. Wagner v. Feld, No. 12-cv-0220 WJ/SMV. (msp)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #348 Motion to Withdraw Appearance and Substitute Counsel. Attorney Helen Chaitman terminated. Wagner v. We Investments, LLC, 12-cv-0392 WJ/SMV (kg) Modified text on 7/3/2013 (vh).
May 31, 2013 Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance and Substitute Counsel by We Investments, LLC. (Chaitman, Helen)
May 31, 2013 Filing 347 Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Judith A. Wagner, Chapter 11 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of The Vaughan Company Realtors, specifically as to Adv. Pro. 12-CV-188; by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Arland, William)
May 30, 2013 Filing 346 DECLARATION re #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen)
May 30, 2013 Filing 345 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Jules Appelman, Shirley Herndon. (Chaitman, Helen)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-199 WJ/SMV) (kg)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-289 WJ/SMV) (kg)
May 28, 2013 Filing 342 MOTION for Protective Order re Nonappearance at Deposition on 5-31-13 by Maura Dahrling (Daniels, Michael) Modified text on 5/29/2013 (kg).
May 24, 2013 Filing 341 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Deborah Davis. Wagner v. Davis, 12-cv-0802 WJ/SMV (Burns, James) Modified to add case number on 5/28/2013 (nr).
May 24, 2013 Filing 340 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Adelina Graef. (Burns, James)
May 22, 2013 Filing 339 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Judith A. Wagner. Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to MTC)(Allen, Mark) Modified to add text on 5/22/2013 (bc).
May 21, 2013 Filing 338 AMENDED ANSWER to ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND USDC Case No. 12-cv-00290 WPJ/SMV by Edith Tarbescu-Deutschmann. (Chaitman, Helen)
May 20, 2013 Filing 337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Mark Dahrling and First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Maura Dahrling (Allen, Mark)
May 16, 2013 Filing 336 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Status of Settlement in Adversary Proceeding 12-CV-262-WJ/SMV (Mazel, Edward)
May 8, 2013 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evelyn King of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Request for Production of Documents (Burns, James) Modified text on 5/9/2013 (kg).
May 7, 2013 Filing 334 Answer to Complaint by Lyman S. Atchley. (Dixon, Gerald) Modified text on 5/8/2013 (kg).
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar WITHDRAWING #293 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Wagner v. Lacy, 12-cv-0547 WJ/SMV. (am)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte. The Court's #246 Order Setting Settlement Conference is hereby VACATED. Accordingly, the Settlement Conference set for Monday, May 20, 2013, is hereby VACATED in the following case: Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV. IT IS SO ORDERED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENT IS ATTACHED.] (msp)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Stipulated ORDER Authorizing Limited Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The parties are granted leave to take the deposition of Julius Wollen, and the Trustee may serve upon Julius Wollen Requests for Admission, as ordered herein. Wagner v. Wollen, case no. 12-cv-0413 WJ/SMV. (msp)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Stipulated Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Defendant Appelman shall file a responsive pleading to the Complaint no later than May 15, 2013. Wagner v. Appelman, Case No. 12-cv-0188 WJ/SMV. (msp)
May 1, 2013 Filing 329 NOTICE TO PARTIES by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The parties are reminded that neither notices to take depositions nor their certificates of service are filed of record unless their adequacy or content is the subject of briefing. D.N.M.LR-Civ. 30.1. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
May 1, 2013 Filing 328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner for Notice of Deposition of Steven Etkind (Wagner v. Feld, 12-cv-0220 WJ/SMV) (Allen, Mark) Modified text on 5/2/2013 (nr). Modified text on 6/28/2013 (ick).
May 1, 2013 Filing 327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner for Notice to Take Deposition of Steven Etkind (Wagner v. Dahrling 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV) (Allen, Mark) Modified text on 5/2/2013 (nr). Modified text on 6/28/2013 (ick).
April 26, 2013 Filing 326 NOTICE by Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery re #284 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 325 NOTICE by Janice Dorn, Thomas McNaughton re #262 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 324 NOTICE by Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind re #263 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 323 NOTICE by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman re #280 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 322 NOTICE by Jill Plaman(Individually, and as a personal representative of the estate of Carla Kosinski ) re #279 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 321 NOTICE by Audrey Napoleon re #286 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 320 NOTICE by We Investments, LLC re #277 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 319 NOTICE by ADF Financial, Inc., Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Abdul Dabiri re #260 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 318 NOTICE by Connie Davis, Jerry Davis re #269 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE by Dennis Fahey re #278 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 316 NOTICE by Merrion Family Limited Partnership re #282 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 315 NOTICE by Rachel Hanyeh, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh re #275 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 314 NOTICE by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour re #281 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 313 NOTICE by Vahid Deriss, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari re #268 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 312 NOTICE by Francis Hovorka re #267 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 311 NOTICE by Steven Pazand re #287 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 310 NOTICE by Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg re #271 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 309 NOTICE by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton re #264 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 308 NOTICE by Scott O'Hara re #276 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 307 NOTICE by James Richards re #288 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 306 NOTICE by Michael Menke re #283 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 305 NOTICE by Demosthenes Durano, Glenda Durano, Durano Construction, Durano Enterprises, Ltd. re #272 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 304 NOTICE by David Defuria re #261 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 303 NOTICE by Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., Jules Appelman re #274 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 302 NOTICE by Vicki Frank re #266 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE by Ronald Frank re #265 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 26, 2013 Filing 300 NOTICE by Jonathan Levann re #270 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Chaitman, Helen)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER VACATING Certain Settlement Conferences, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte. The Court's #248 and #249 Orders Setting Settlement Conferences are hereby VACATED. Accordingly, the Settlement Conferences set for Monday, April 29, 2013, are hereby VACATED in the following three cases: Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0496 WJ/SMV; Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0497 WJ/SMV; and Wagner v. Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201 WJ/SMV. IT IS SO ORDERED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (msp)
April 22, 2013 Filing 298 Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 4/22/2013. Wagner v. Durano Enters., Inc., 12-cv-0201 WJ/SMV (msp).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Defendant Alameda Greenhouses & Nursery, Inc., shall have until May 3, 2013, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Trustee's Complaint. Wagner v. Alameda Greenhouse & Nursery, Inc., 12-cv-0298 WJ/SMV. (msp)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by District Judge William P. Johnson. Show Cause Response due by 5/6/2013. (mag)
April 19, 2013 Filing 295 NOTICE TO PARTIES by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The parties are reminded that neither notices to take depositions nor their certificates of service are filed of record unless their adequacy or content is the subject of briefing. D.N.M.LR-Civ. 30.1. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (msp)
April 19, 2013 Filing 294 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner to Take Deposition of Defendant Maura Dahrling (Allen, Mark) Modified text on 4/22/2013, document should not be filed electronically (kg).
April 19, 2013 Filing 293 MOTION for Protective Order in Connection with Discovery Requests Served on Plaintiff by Defendants Donald Lacy, Deanna Lacy, and Doris Lacy by Judith A. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Allen, Mark)
April 19, 2013 Filing 292 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement Agreement with Defendant Lowry (Allen, Mark)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-271 WJ/SMV) (kg)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge William P. Johnson (Original Case No. CV 12-239 WJ/SMV) (kg)
April 18, 2013 Filing 289 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner of Pending Settlement Agreements (Mazel, Edward)
April 18, 2013 Filing 288 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00207 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by James Richards. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 287 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00291 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Steven Pazand. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 286 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00393 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Audrey Napoleon. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 285 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evelyn King of Request for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Request for Production of Documents (Burns, James) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 284 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-01105 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Daniel R. Mowery, Marsha J. Mowery. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 283 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00203 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Michael Menke. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 282 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00306 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Merrion Family Limited Partnership. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 281 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND BY JURY Case No. 12-cv-00301 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Abbas Ansari, Peymaneh Pour. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 280 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00497 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Jill Plaman, Michael Plaman. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 279 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00496 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Jill Plaman. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 278 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00359 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Dennis Fahey. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 277 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00392 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by We Investments, LLC. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 276 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00208 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Scott O'Hara. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 275 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00303 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Rachel Hanyeh, David L. Louie, Julie C. Louie, Jenny Yeh Nelson, Jimmy Chih Ming Yeh, Marie Yeh. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 18, 2013 Filing 274 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00197 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Academy Plumbing, Heating, Air Conditioning & Electric, Inc., Jules Appelman. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/19/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/22/2013 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. Durano Enters., Ltd., No. 12-cv-0201 WJ/SMV. (msp)
April 17, 2013 Filing 272 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00201 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Demosthenes Durano, Glenda Durano, Durano Construction, Durano Enterprises, Ltd.. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 271 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM WITH JURY DEMAND Case No. 12-cv-00270, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Emily Rosenberg, Michael Rosenberg. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 270 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00187, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Jonathan Levann. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 269 ANSWER to FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00360 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Connie Davis, Jerry Davis. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 268 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00300 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Vahid Deriss, Farzaneh Jafari, Marteza Jafari, Maryam Jafari, Melika Jafari, Mohammad Reza Jafari, Mojtaba Jafari, Mostafa Jafari, Zahra Jafari. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 267 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00299 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Francis Hovorka. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 266 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00190 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Vicki Frank. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 265 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM JURY DEMAND Case No. 12-cv-00189 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Ronald Frank. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/18/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 264 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00241 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Daniel Fenton, Nancy Fenton. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/17/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 263 ANSWER to FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00754 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Sherry Etkind, Steven S. Etkind, Talia Etkind. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/17/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 262 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00870 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by Janice Dorn, Thomas McNaughton. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/17/2013 (kg).
April 17, 2013 Filing 261 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00200 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by David Defuria. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/17/2013 (kg). M
April 17, 2013 Filing 260 ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY Case No. 12-cv-00391 WPJ/SMV, COUNTERCLAIM against Judith A. Wagner by ADF Financial, Inc., Maryam Alaghe-Bandi, Hamid Alaghe Bandi, Hossein Alaghe Bandi, Said Bandi, Bandi Engineering Company, Inc., Abdul Dabiri. (Chaitman, Helen) Modified text on 4/17/2013 (kg).
April 15, 2013 Filing 259 Notice for Extension of Time to File Answer by Deborah Davis. (Burns, James) Modified text to remove Motion should just be a notice on 4/15/2013 (nr).
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar ALLOWING Defendant King to Propound Discovery Past the Deadline. Wagner v. King, 12-cv-0328 WJ/SMV. (am)
April 12, 2013 Filing 257 STIPULATION Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Edith Tarbescu-Deutschmann (Chaitman, Helen)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING the Show-Cause Hearing set for April 17, 2013, at 3:30 p.m., because third party Bank of America NA has complied with Defendant King's subpoena. See #255 Defendant King's Notice of Withdrawal of Document. Counsel for Defendant King shall ensure that Bank of America is notified immediately that the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. Wagner v. King, 12-cv-0328 WJ/SMV [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
April 11, 2013 Filing 255 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #237 Motion for Order to Show Cause by Evelyn King (Burns, James)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part Defendant Menke's Motion to Dismiss Complaint (AS FURTHER DESCRIBED HEREIN). (mag)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying as moot Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file her Answer to the Trustee's Complaint within 20 days of the entry this Order. [Cause No. CV 12-518 re: Doc #2] (kg)
March 26, 2013 Filing 252 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Evelyn King (Allen, Mark)
March 26, 2013 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Andy Feld and First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Julie Feld (Allen, Mark)
March 26, 2013 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Irene Tarro (Allen, Mark)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/29/2013 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar in the following two cases: Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0496 WJ/SMV, and Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0497 WJ/SMV. (msp)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/29/2013 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Wagner v. Durano Enters., Ltd., 12-cv-0201 WJ/SMV. (msp)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #241 Defendant King's Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause Against Third Party Bank of America NA. A telephonic show-cause hearing will be held on April 17, 2013, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel shall call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. Wagner v. King, 12-cv-0328 WJ/SMV. (am)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. A Settlement Conference is set in this case for 5/20/2013 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV.(msp)
March 22, 2013 Filing 245 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith A. Wagner First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production in Aid of Execution Wagner v. Dahrling, 12-cv-0529 WJ/SMV (Allen, Mark) Modified text on 8/6/2013 (nr).
March 21, 2013 Filing 244 Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Status Conference, held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 3/20/2013. Wagner v. Durano Enters., Inc., 12-cv-0201 WJ/SMV. Wagner v. Etkind, 12-cv-0754 WJ/SMV. Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0496 WJ/SMV. Wagner v. Plaman, 12-cv-0497 WJ/SMV. (msp)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DENYING as Moot #237 Motion for Order to Show Cause and for Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar: Wagner v. King, 12-cv-0328 WJ/SMV. (msp) Modified text on 3/20/2013 (ick).
March 20, 2013 Filing 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deanna Lacy, Donald Lacy, Doris Lacy for Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production Propounded Upon Plaintiff (Puccini, Louis)
March 19, 2013 Filing 241 Amended MOTION for Order to Show Cause and for Sanctions by Evelyn King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burns, James)
March 13, 2013 Filing 240 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge William P. Johnson: Hearing on Menke's Motion to Dismiss filed on 4/16/12 in CV 12-203 [Doc. 7] and all joinders filed subsequent thereof held on 3/13/2013. (Court Reporter T. Garrett) (kg)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery is stayed for 60 days in this action only, Wagner v. Rosenthal, 12-cv-0262 WJ/SMV. (msp)
March 12, 2013 Filing 238 Clerk's Minutes for Settlement Conference, held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 3/11/2013. The case did not settle, but the parties are continuing to negotiate. Wagner v. Rosenthal, 12-cv-0262 WJ/SMV. (msp)
March 11, 2013 Filing 237 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and For Sanctions by Evelyn King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burns, James)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson denying in part #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as further described herein. (kg)
February 27, 2013 Filing 235 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge William P. Johnson against Defendant Dahrling Enterprises, Inc. (Case No. CV 12-529 WJ/SMV) (kg)
February 20, 2013 Filing 234 NOTICE by Judith A. Wagner Notice of Automatic Stay as to Defendant Joan Dike (Allen, Mark)
February 14, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE by Andy Feld, Julie Feld Certificate of Service First Set of Interrogatories (Cadigan, Michael)
February 13, 2013 Filing 232 STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Twelve cases were scheduled for settlement conferences in February, 2013. One was vacated and will be rescheduled at the parties' request. One was rescheduled for March, 2013. Seven cases settled; three did not settle. Judge Vidmar has limited dates available for settlement conferences in March and April, 2013. Any party wishing to schedule a settlement conference should call Judge Vidmar's chambers at (575) 528-1480. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
February 13, 2013 Filing 231 NOTICE of Hearing on Menke's Motion to Dismiss filed on 4/16/12 in CV-12-203 #7 and all joinders filed subsequent thereof. Hearing set for 3/13/2013 at 09:30 AM - 540 Bonito Courtroom before District Judge William P. Johnson. (mag)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2013 Filing 230 Clerk's Minutes for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 2/12/2013. The case did not settle. Wagner v. King, 12-cv-0328 WJ/SMV. (msp)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER to File Closing Documents, by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Parties shall submit closing documents no later than 14 days after the Bankruptcy Court approves the settlement. Wagner v. Causey, 12-cv-0289 WJ/SMV. (msp)
February 12, 2013 Filing 228 Clerk's Minutes for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on 2/12/2013. The case settled. Wagner v. Causey, 12-0289 WJ/SMV. (msp)
February 8, 2013