D.R. Horton, Inc. et al v. Angel, et al
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc. and DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Ivelisse Cruz, Tracee Edwards, Edward Caulder, Brad Munro, Gladys Hodges, Sergio Gonzalez, Michelle Vigil, Sean Gorman, Guy Bowling, Diana Moore, Nicholas Medina, Ramona Lobo, Patrick Donovan, Justin Romero, Steven Ashley, Michael Pacheco, Terry Clark, Douglas Greenwood, Armando Orozco, Alicia Bonilla, Melissa Lucero, Shaness Conley, Galen Smith, Dianah Ortega, Anna Pacheco, Megan Porter, Carla Ludington, Adam Ortiz, Charles Arellanes, Mary Bowling, Ryan A. Furry, Miguel Lozano, Elaine Hicks, Larry Apperson, Ronnie Ferguson, Keeley Angel, Robert Bonilla, Anne Kiser, Joseph Martinez, Leon Cordova, Joseph Nilvo, Eloy Urtiaga, Shannon Marty, Catherine Taramasco, Gwendolyn Valentino, Mary Silva, Kathryn Mendez, Elizabeth Apperson, Linda Clark, Michael Kiser, Karen Smith, Raul Mora, Jasmine Brieno, Shannon Foote, Brenda Bass, Ryan Martin, Elizabeth Mora, Jessica Ortiz, John Boone, Anna Arellanes, Rachel Dworkin, Curtis Porter, Matthew Hernandez, April M. Guerin-Furry, Neil Jennings, Vincent Silva, Angelica Urtiaga, Lambert Williams, Maya Ferguson, Jennifer Nilvo, Joselito Lobo, Claudia Rivera, R.D. Brieno, Kassie Cordova, Carl Bass, Alexandria Martinez, Doug Ludington, Frank Vigil, Greg Valentino, Raymond R. Gorman, Olimpia Herrera, Andre Hubert, Catherine Stutts, Floyd Stutts, Alayna Orozco, Danielle Wheeler, Amanda Lozano, William Costa, Terrence Prasek, Nicole Lucero, Elaine Cogan, Adam Dixon, Debra Dixon, Luis Cruz, Steven Moore, Susan Prasek, Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez, Norma J. Gorman, Jason Dworkin, Rebecca Cupp and Marcia Jennings
Case Number: 1:2012cv01286
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Alan C Torgerson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2013 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. (Landry, Stephanie)
August 9, 2013 Filing 38 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Robert C. Brack no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
June 13, 2013 Filing 37 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Rule 16 Settlement Conference held on 6/12/2013. Results of Settlement Conference: Settled claims of Angel and Bonilla. (as)
June 11, 2013 Filing 36 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Rule 16 Settlement Conference held on 6/10/2013. Results of Settlement Conference: Settled claims of Baca, Yokoyama, Wheeler and Furry. (as)
June 10, 2013 Filing 35 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Rule 16 Settlement Conference held on 6/7/2013. Results of Settlement Conference: Settled claims of Brasel, Stone, Bass, Cabriales, Carter, Caulder, Gonzalez, Lobo and Medina. (as)
June 10, 2013 Filing 34 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Settlement Conference held on 6/6/2013. Results of Settlement Conference: Settled claims of Boone, Ludington, Backer, Mani and Pear. (as)
May 16, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE by Keeley Angel of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bruckner, Donald)
May 10, 2013 Filing 32 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Status Conference held on 5/9/2013. Court discussed with counsel the logistics of the Settlement Conference to be held 6/6/2013 through 6/14/2013. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (as)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. Rule 16 Status Conference set for 5/9/2013 at 11:00 AM. The parties are to call chambers on the "meet-me-conference line" at (505) 348-2688. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (as)
April 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 6/6/2013 and 6/7/2013 and continuing 6/10/2013 through 6/14/2013 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. (as)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson granting #26 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference scheduled for 6/3/2013 through 6/5/2013 is VACATED. Settlement Conference rescheduled for 6/6/2013 and 6/7/2013, and continuing the week of 6/10/2013 through 6/14/2013. Counsel are instructed to refer to the original Order Scheduling Rule 16 Settlement Conference [Doc. No. 25] for deadlines and instructions. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (as)
April 19, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. re #20 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Review of Amended Petition to Compel Segregated Arbitrations and Notice of Lack of Proper Response filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. (Landry, Stephanie)
April 18, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. re #27 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Clarification (Landry, Stephanie)
April 12, 2013 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Review of Amended Petition to Compel Segregated Arbitrations and Notice of Lack of Proper Response filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J)(Landry, Stephanie)
April 2, 2013 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference (Reschedule) by Keeley Angel. (Bruckner, Donald)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2013-6/7/2013 beginning each day at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. (as)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. (as)
March 28, 2013 Filing 23 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2013. (as)
March 26, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Review of Amended Petition to Compel Segregated Arbitrations and Notice of Lack of Proper Response filed by Keeley Angel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FF, #2 Exhibit GG, #3 Exhibit HH)(Bruckner, Donald)
March 15, 2013 Filing 21 Joint Status Report by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. (Landry, Stephanie)
March 12, 2013 Filing 20 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Review of Amended Petition to Compel Segregated Arbitrations and Notice of Lack of Proper Response by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.. (Landry, Stephanie)
February 25, 2013 Filing 19 D.R. Horton, Inc. and DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.'s RESPONSE re #16 Notice (Other) filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landry, Stephanie)
February 25, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Defendants re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Keeley Angel, Debra Dixon, Nicholas Medina, Douglas Greenwood, Sergio Gonzalez, Linda Clark, Guy Bowling, Michael Pacheco, Nicole Lucero, Catherine Taramasco, Gwendolyn Valentino, Neil Jennings, Catherine Stutts, Marcia Jennings, Terrence Prasek, Andre Hubert, Greg Valentino, Shannon Foote, Joseph Martinez, Ronnie Ferguson, Maya Ferguson, Matthew Hernandez, Alayna Orozco, Michelle Vigil, Rachel Dworkin, Curtis Porter, Kathryn Mendez, Brenda Bass, William Costa, Larry Apperson, Ryan A. Furry, Adam Dixon, Dianah Ortega, Jessica Ortiz, Claudia Rivera, Steven Moore, Robert Bonilla, Melissa Lucero, Luis Cruz, Carl Bass, Carla Ludington, Alexandria Martinez, Angelica Urtiaga, Amanda Lozano, Elizabeth Apperson, Rebecca Cupp, Norma J. Gorman, Sean Gorman, Patrick Donovan, Gladys Hodges, Shaness Conley, Jennifer Nilvo, John Boone, Shannon Marty, Megan Porter, Alicia Bonilla, Eloy Urtiaga, Raymond R. Gorman, Joselito Lobo, Jasmine Brieno, Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez, Charles Arellanes, Frank Vigil, Olimpia Herrera, April M. Guerin-Furry, Raul Mora, Steven Ashley, Ryan Martin, Adam Ortiz, Danielle Wheeler, Michael Kiser, Susan Prasek, Diana Moore, Ramona Lobo, Anna Arellanes, Mary Bowling, Vincent Silva, Armando Orozco, Elizabeth Mora, Lambert Williams, Anna Pacheco, Edward Caulder, Mary Silva, Karen Smith, Justin Romero, Tracee Edwards, Joseph Nilvo, Terry Clark, Kassie Cordova, Jason Dworkin, Elaine Cogan, Floyd Stutts, Galen Smith, Doug Ludington, Ivelisse Cruz, Anne Kiser, Brad Munro, Leon Cordova, R.D. Brieno, Elaine Hicks, Miguel Lozano (Bruckner, Donald)
February 25, 2013 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Keeley Angel, Elizabeth Apperson, Larry Apperson, Anna Arellanes, Charles Arellanes, Steven Ashley, Brenda Bass, Carl Bass, Alicia Bonilla, Robert Bonilla, John Boone, Guy Bowling, Mary Bowling, Jasmine Brieno, R.D. Brieno, Edward Caulder, Linda Clark, Terry Clark, Elaine Cogan, Shaness Conley, Kassie Cordova, Leon Cordova, William Costa, Ivelisse Cruz, Luis Cruz, Rebecca Cupp, Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez, Adam Dixon, Debra Dixon, Patrick Donovan, Jason Dworkin, Rachel Dworkin, Tracee Edwards, Maya Ferguson, Ronnie Ferguson, Shannon Foote, Ryan A. Furry, Sergio Gonzalez, Norma J. Gorman, Raymond R. Gorman, Sean Gorman, Douglas Greenwood, April M. Guerin-Furry, Matthew Hernandez, Olimpia Herrera, Elaine Hicks, Gladys Hodges, Andre Hubert, Marcia Jennings, Neil Jennings, Anne Kiser, Michael Kiser, Joselito Lobo, Ramona Lobo, Amanda Lozano, Miguel Lozano, Melissa Lucero, Nicole Lucero, Carla Ludington, Doug Ludington, Ryan Martin, Alexandria Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Shannon Marty, Nicholas Medina, Kathryn Mendez, Diana Moore, Steven Moore, Elizabeth Mora, Raul Mora, Brad Munro, Jennifer Nilvo, Joseph Nilvo, Alayna Orozco, Armando Orozco, Dianah Ortega, Adam Ortiz, Jessica Ortiz, Anna Pacheco, Michael Pacheco, Curtis Porter, Megan Porter, Susan Prasek, Terrence Prasek, Claudia Rivera, Justin Romero, Mary Silva, Vincent Silva, Galen Smith, Karen Smith, Catherine Stutts, Floyd Stutts, Catherine Taramasco, Angelica Urtiaga, Eloy Urtiaga, Greg Valentino, Gwendolyn Valentino, Frank Vigil, Michelle Vigil, Danielle Wheeler, Lambert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y, #2 Exhibit Z, #3 Exhibit AA, #4 Exhibit BB, #5 Exhibit CC, #6 Exhibit DD)(Bruckner, Donald)
February 19, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE by Keeley Angel re #15 Notice (Other) of Objection to Petitioner/Plaintiffs' Notice of Completion of Briefing on Amended Petition and Complaint [Doc 15] (Bruckner, Donald)
February 18, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. re #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, #1 Complaint,,,,,,, #14 Reply, of Completion of Briefing (Landry, Stephanie)
February 11, 2013 Filing 14 D.R. Horton, Inc.'s and DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.'s REPLY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, #1 Complaint,,,,,,, filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D through F, #2 Exhibit G through I)(Landry, Stephanie)
February 6, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 6 and 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc)
February 4, 2013 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bap)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2013. Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2013 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - 670 Judge Alan C. Torgerson Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/20/2013. (as)
January 30, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (tah)
January 29, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay by Keeley Angel, Elizabeth Apperson, Larry Apperson, Anna Arellanes, Charles Arellanes, Steven Ashley, Brenda Bass, Carl Bass, Alicia Bonilla, Robert Bonilla, John Boone, Guy Bowling, Mary Bowling, Jasmine Brieno, R.D. Brieno, Edward Caulder, Linda Clark, Terry Clark, Elaine Cogan, Shaness Conley, Kassie Cordova, Leon Cordova, William Costa, Ivelisse Cruz, Luis Cruz, Rebecca Cupp, Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez, Adam Dixon, Debra Dixon, Patrick Donovan, Jason Dworkin, Rachel Dworkin, Tracee Edwards, Maya Ferguson, Ronnie Ferguson, Shannon Foote, Ryan A. Furry, Sergio Gonzalez, Norma J. Gorman, Raymond R. Gorman, Sean Gorman, Douglas Greenwood, April M. Guerin-Furry, Matthew Hernandez, Olimpia Herrera, Elaine Hicks, Gladys Hodges, Andre Hubert, Marcia Jennings, Neil Jennings, Anne Kiser, Michael Kiser, Joselito Lobo, Ramona Lobo, Amanda Lozano, Miguel Lozano, Melissa Lucero, Nicole Lucero, Carla Ludington, Doug Ludington, Ryan Martin, Alexandria Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Shannon Marty, Nicholas Medina, Kathryn Mendez, Diana Moore, Steven Moore, Elizabeth Mora, Raul Mora, Brad Munro, Jennifer Nilvo, Joseph Nilvo, Alayna Orozco, Armando Orozco, Dianah Ortega, Adam Ortiz, Jessica Ortiz, Anna Pacheco, Michael Pacheco, Curtis Porter, Megan Porter, Susan Prasek, Terrence Prasek, Claudia Rivera, Justin Romero, Mary Silva, Vincent Silva, Galen Smith, Karen Smith, Catherine Stutts, Floyd Stutts, Catherine Taramasco, Angelica Urtiaga, Eloy Urtiaga, Greg Valentino, Gwendolyn Valentino, Frank Vigil, Michelle Vigil, Danielle Wheeler, Lambert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Bruckner, Donald)
January 28, 2013 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR-NOTICE by Defendants(Bruckner, Donald) Modified on 1/29/2013 TO ADD ERROR TEXT (vv).
January 4, 2013 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Petition to Compel Segregated Arbitrations against Keeley Angel, Elizabeth Apperson, Larry Apperson, Anna Arellanes, Charles Arellanes, Steven Ashley, Brenda Bass, Carl Bass, Alicia Bonilla, Robert Bonilla, John Boone, Guy Bowling, Mary Bowling, Jasmine Brieno, R.D. Brieno, Edward Caulder, Linda Clark, Terry Clark, Elaine Cogan, Shaness Conley, Kassie Cordova, Leon Cordova, William Costa, Ivelisse Cruz, Luis Cruz, Rebecca Cupp, Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez, Adam Dixon, Debra Dixon, Patrick Donovan, Jason Dworkin, Rachel Dworkin, Tracee Edwards, Maya Ferguson, Ronnie Ferguson, Shannon Foote, Ryan A. Furry, Sergio Gonzalez, Norma J. Gorman, Raymond R. Gorman, Sean Gorman, Douglas Greenwood, April M. Guerin-Furry, Matthew Hernandez, Olimpia Herrera, Elaine Hicks, Gladys Hodges, Andre Hubert, Marcia Jennings, Neil Jennings, Anne Kiser, Michael Kiser, Joselito Lobo, Ramona Lobo, Amanda Lozano, Miguel Lozano, Melissa Lucero, Nicole Lucero, Carla Ludington, Doug Ludington, Ryan Martin, Alexandria Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Shannon Marty, Nicholas Medina, Diana Moore, Steven Moore, Elizabeth Mora, Raul Mora, Brad Munro, Jennifer Nilvo, Joseph Nilvo, Alayna Orozco, Armando Orozco, Dianah Ortega, Anna Pacheco, Michael Pacheco, Curtis Porter, Megan Porter, Susan Prasek, Terrence Prasek, Claudia Rivera, Justin Romero, Mary Silva, Vincent Silva, Galen Smith, Karen Smith, Catherine Stutts, Floyd Stutts, Catherine Taramasco, Angelica Urtiaga, Eloy Urtiaga, Greg Valentino, Gwendolyn Valentino, Frank Vigil, Michelle Vigil, Danielle Wheeler, Lambert Williams. adding Ryan A. Furry, Norma J. Gorman, Raymond R. Gorman and April M. Guerin-Furry, Ryan A. Furry, Norma J. Gorman, Raymond R. Gorman and April M. Guerin-Furry. terminating Jessica Ortiz, Kathryn Mendez and Adam Ortiz., filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc..(Landry, Stephanie)
December 21, 2012 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. (Landry, Stephanie)
December 13, 2012 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bap)
December 12, 2012 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affidavit of Mark Ferguson by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A through C to the Affidavit of Mark Ferguson)(Landry, Stephanie)
December 12, 2012 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bap)
December 12, 2012 Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson assigned. (bap)
December 11, 2012 Filing Fee Received: $ 350 receipt number 1084-2827357 re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Landry, Stephanie)
December 11, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Petition to Compel Segregated Arbitrations against Keeley Angel, as Trustee for the Loma Linda Trust, Elizabeth Apperson, Larry Apperson, Anna Arellanes, Charles Arellanes, Steven Ashley, Brenda Bass, Carl Bass, Alicia Bonilla, Robert Bonilla, John Boone, Guy Bowling, Mary Bowling, Jasmine Brieno, R.D. Brieno, Edward Caulder, Linda Clark, Terry Clark, Elaine Cogan, Shaness Conley, Kassie Cordova, Leon Cordova, William Costa, Ivelisse Cruz, Luis Cruz, Rebecca Cupp, Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez, Adam Dixon, Debra Dixon, Patrick Donovan, Jason Dworkin, Rachel Dworkin, Tracee Edwards, Maya Ferguson, Ronnie Ferguson, Shannon Foote, Sergio Gonzalez, Sean Gorman, Douglas Greenwood, Matthew Hernandez, Olimpia Herrera, Elaine Hicks, Gladys Hodges, Andre Hubert, Marcia Jennings, Neil Jennings, Anne Kiser, Michael Kiser, Joselito Lobo, Ramona Lobo, Amanda Lozano, Miguel Lozano, Melissa Lucero, Nicole Lucero, Carla Ludington, Doug Ludington, Ryan Martin, Alexandria Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Shannon Marty, Nicholas Medina, Kathryn Mendez, Diana Moore, Steven Moore, Elizabeth Mora, Raul Mora, Brad Munro, Jennifer Nilvo, Joseph Nilvo, Alayna Orozco, Armando Orozco, Dianah Ortega, Adam Ortiz, Jessica Ortiz, Anna Pacheco, Michael Pacheco, Curtis Porter, Megan Porter, Susan Prasek, Terrence Prasek, Claudia Rivera, Justin Romero, Mary Silva, Vincent Silva, Galen Smith, Karen Smith, Catherine Stutts, Floyd Stutts, Catherine Taramasco, Angelica Urtiaga, Eloy Urtiaga, Greg Valentino, Gwendolyn Valentino, Frank Vigil, Michelle Vigil, Danielle Wheeler, Lambert Williams ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Landry, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.R. Horton, Inc. et al v. Angel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivelisse Cruz
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracee Edwards
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Caulder
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Munro
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Hodges
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Gonzalez
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Vigil
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Gorman
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Bowling
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Moore
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Medina
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Lobo
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Donovan
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Romero
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ashley
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pacheco
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Clark
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Greenwood
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Orozco
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Bonilla
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Lucero
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaness Conley
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen Smith
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianah Ortega
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Pacheco
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Porter
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Ludington
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Arellanes
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Bowling
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan A. Furry
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Lozano
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Hicks
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Apperson
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Ferguson
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeley Angel
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bonilla
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kiser
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Martinez
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Cordova
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Nilvo
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloy Urtiaga
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Marty
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Taramasco
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Valentino
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Silva
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Mendez
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Apperson
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Clark
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kiser
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Mora
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Brieno
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Foote
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Bass
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Martin
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Mora
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Boone
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Arellanes
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Dworkin
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Porter
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hernandez
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April M. Guerin-Furry
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Jennings
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Silva
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelica Urtiaga
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambert Williams
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maya Ferguson
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nilvo
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joselito Lobo
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Rivera
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. Brieno
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassie Cordova
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Bass
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Martinez
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Ludington
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Vigil
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Valentino
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond R. Gorman
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olimpia Herrera
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Hubert
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Stutts
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Stutts
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alayna Orozco
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Wheeler
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Lozano
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Costa
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Prasek
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Lucero
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Cogan
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Dixon
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Dixon
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Cruz
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Moore
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Prasek
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Del Campo de Gonzalez
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma J. Gorman
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dworkin
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Cupp
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Jennings
Represented By: Donald G. Bruckner, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Landry
Represented By: Glenn R. Smith
Represented By: Margaret C. Ludewig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRH Southwest Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Landry
Represented By: Glenn R. Smith
Represented By: Margaret C. Ludewig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?