HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc.
Defendant: Marie A Martinez, Felix J Martinez, Felix Joe Martinez Public Trust and Southwest Financial Services, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Felix J Martinez and Marie A Martinez
Counter_defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. and David Arnone
Case Number: 1:2013cv00508
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Rio Arriba
Presiding Judge: Lorenzo F. Garcia
Presiding Judge: Alan C. Torgerson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 164 Defendants [sic] Motion for Relief from Judgment for Fraud in the Inducement, Constructive Fraud, Misconduct/Misrepresentation. (tah)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying as moot 163 Verified Emergency Petition for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction Pending Defendants' Motion for Relief from Judgment. (tah)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER CONFIRMING SALE AND SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Amounts; awarding Plaintiff a judgment in the amount of $445,248.51; awarding Plaintiff attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $34,256.51; and allowing the Martinezes to inspect the Note at issue no later than 10/31/2017. (tah)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER ENTERING FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales in favor of Plaintiff against Felix Joe Martinez Public Trust and Southwest Financial Services, Inc. (tah)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 118 Plaintiff Volt Asset Holdings Trust XVI's Motion for Summary Judgment, Default Judgment, and for Order for Foreclosure Sale. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc.
Represented By: David Arnone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie A Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix J Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Joe Martinez Public Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Felix J Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Marie A Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc.
Represented By: David Arnone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: David Arnone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?