Faure v. Community Health Systems, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: John Faure
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc., Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, Community Health Systems Holdings Corporation, Community Health Investment Company, LLC, Triad Healthcare Corporation, Triad Holdings V, LLC, Tennyson Holdings, LLC, Las Cruces Medical Center, LLC, Accountable Healthcare Staffing, Inc., Accountable Healthcare Holdings Corporation, MedAssets Workforce Solutions, Ronald Lalonde, Affilion, LLC and Joel Michael Jones
Case Number: 1:2014cv00559
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 453 Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference and Request for Expedited Ruling. The Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2017 is hereby vacated. Counsel shall confer and shall provide to the Court, by 1/3/2018, a list of dates on which counsel and parties are available, without contingencies, to attend a settlement conference in this matter. (am)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 429 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Motion; granting in part [429, Exh 1] Motion for Enforcement of Court Order and granting in part 442 Defendant Hospital's Second Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order. (KBM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 395 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants Accountable Healthcare Staffing, Inc., Accountable Healthcare Holdings Corporation and Ronald Lalonde's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses; and granting 423 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants Accountable Healthcare Staffing, Inc., and Accountable Healthcare Holdings Corporation's Untimely Disclosed Witness. (tah)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 345 Accountable Defendants' Motion to Exclude Portions of John C. Stein, Jr., M.D.'s Expert Testimony Related to Accountable. (tah)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 342 Defendant Las Cruces Medical Center, LLC, d/b/a Mountain [V]iew Regional Medical Center's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Testifying Experts John Stein, M.D. and Fred Hyde. (tah)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. MedAssets Workforce Solutions is dismissed with prejudice. (tah)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Defendants Joel Michael Jones and Affilion, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. (tah)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting in part and denying in part 272 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Production Nos. 17 and 19 to Defendant Mountain View Regional Medical Center; granting 274 CHSPSC's Motion for Protective Order subject to reexamination; and denying 316 CHSPSC's Second Motion for Protective Order and permitting the deposition of William Hussey to take place outside of the discovery deadline. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faure v. Community Health Systems, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Faure
Represented By: Jennifer J. Foote
Represented By: Dusti Harvey
Represented By: Trevor Adam Rigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Holdings V, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennyson Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Cruces Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: M Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accountable Healthcare Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Ben M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accountable Healthcare Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Ben M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedAssets Workforce Solutions
Represented By: Stevan Douglas Looney
Represented By: Travis R. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lalonde
Represented By: Ben M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affilion, LLC
Represented By: Hari-Amrit Khalsa
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Michael Jones
Represented By: Hari-Amrit Khalsa
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?