Benjamin v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Bernest Benjamin
Defendant: James Jackson, Luis Urquidi, Ricardo Salayandia, Steve Nance, Jerry Roak, Lawrence Artiaga and Michael Holman
Case Number: 1:2014cv00784
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: James O. Browning
Referring Judge: Robert Hayes Scott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON POST-JUDGMENT MOTIONS by District Judge James O. Browning, denying the Plaintiff's Motion in Leave for Motion to Severance Claims and Claim One James Jackson to seek Leave of the Court to Proceed in Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915 [Doc. 65] 73 , Motion for Leave to Amend/Supplement Pleading in [Doc. 55] & [Doc. 61] Nunc Pro Tunc and Make Additional Factual Finding Thereof 74 , Motion in Leave to Amend/Supplement the Record/Pleading of [Doc.'s 56 & 57]; and Consolidate to [Doc. 42] Nunc Pro Tunc and Make Additional Factual Findings Thereof; or Alter Judgment [Doc. 69]; 48 & 58] Nun Pro Tunc and use Internal Facts & Affidavit of Cause (1) as Affidavit for this Cause (2) of; Lawrence Artiaga & Michael Hohman 77 , Motion for Leave in Plaintiff to Motion the Count for an Extension of Time per [Doc. 74] Rule 59(e) & 15 82 , and Motion in Leave Motion for Extension of Time for [Doc. 77] & 74] & Amend & Consolidate to [Doc. 82] 83 ; the Plaintiff's request for a copy of the district court's local rules, see Motion for Leave in Plaintiff to Motion the Count for an Extension of Time per [Doc. 74] Rule 59(e) & 15 at 6, filed October 17, 2017 (Doc. 82), is granted, and the Clerk of Court of the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico is directed to forward a copy of the local rules to the Plaintiff; and the Clerk of Court should supplement the preliminary record on appeal as rule 3.2(B) of the Tenth Circuit Rules requires. (meq)
November 6, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying the request in the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit For Leave To Proceed On Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24, 72 (meq)
September 28, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to Cure Defects. Plaintiff's response is due no later than October 30, 2017. (am)
August 22, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, the Plaintiff's requests to vacate the Final Judgment and for extensions of time in the: Plaintiff's Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, 65 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Amend or Make Additional Factual Findings and/or to Alter or Amend the Judgment, 66 ; Plaintiff's Motion to or for Leave to Amend Pleading with Pleading in Rule 59 and 52(b) 67 ; and Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Pending Disposition of Motions, 68 , are denied. (meq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernest Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Urquidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Salayandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Roak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Artiaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?