Auge v. Stryker Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Kenneth Auge
Defendant: Stryker Corporation and Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01089
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic scheduling conference for 4/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting telephonic status conference for 3/23/2021 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 347 Joint Motion for Clarification. (tah)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 345 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial and Vacate Pretrial Deadlines. (tah)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 333 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate or Compel Pretrial Election of Remedies. (tah)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 327 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery for Limited Purpose. (jcm)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 6/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales VACATING 7/9/2020 status conference and RESETTING status conference for 6/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. This matter is stayed until 7/8/2020; the parties shall file joint status reports with the Court every thirty days, beginning on May 4, 2020; and a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 4/9/2020 at 2:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales quashing 302 Order to Show Cause. (tah)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER STAYING CASE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 274 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. (tah)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 8/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 3/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 2/14/2019 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 STATUS REPORT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Defendants must file a Status Report no later than February 7, 2019. (am)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 217 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply; and denying 211 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. (tah)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 219 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Supplementation of Discovery, or in the Alternative, to Reopen Discovery (am)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Oral Argument on 219 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Supplementation of Discovery. Oral argument will be held on October 3, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom. (jcm)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 223 Defendants' Motion to Seal their Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Supplementation of Discovery (am)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AWARDING attorney's fees to Defendants. (sg)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 180 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 178 Motion for Summary Judgment and 179 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/28/2017. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 154 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (sg)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales overruling 138 Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to De-Designate Discovery Material Marked "Attorneys' Eyes Only"; and affirming 132 Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to De-Designate Discovery Material Marked "Attorneys' Eyes Only." (tah)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 144 Plaintiff's Opposed Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of 140 Order Staying 132 the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order regarding the de-designation of discovery material marked "Attorneys' Eyes Only." (am)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar AWARDING Attorney's Fees to Plaintiff (am)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 113 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auge v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Kenneth Auge
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?