Bates v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Greg Bates
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Frank L. Vito
Case Number: 1:2014cv01130
Filed: December 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Torrance
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez. GRANTING #7 Motion to Remand. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: 1) the PFRD is adopted as an order of the Court; 2) the case is remanded to the First Judicial District Court of the State of New Mexico. (gr)
March 26, 2015 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Greg Bates by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2015. (mej)
February 12, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Greg Bates re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Greg Bates (Ragan, James)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Greg Bates by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr)
February 11, 2015 Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge C. LeRoy Hansen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
February 9, 2015 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Greg Bates. (Ragan, James)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: denying #4 Motion for Discovery. (mej)
January 26, 2015 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
January 26, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc)
January 23, 2015 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge C. LeRoy Hansen as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 22, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Ford Motor Company re #4 MOTION for Discovery filed by Ford Motor Company (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2015 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Discovery filed by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
January 12, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)
January 12, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Greg Bates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ragan, James)
January 5, 2015 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(F) Conference filed by Greg Bates. (Ragan, James)
December 22, 2014 Filing 5 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: Status Conference held on 12/22/2014. (mej)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: Status Conference set for 12/22/2014 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch.(mej)
December 15, 2014 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to Chief United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from First Judicial District, case number D-101-CV-2014-00471. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Rinner, Todd)
December 15, 2014 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-3858453 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ford Motor Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd)
December 15, 2014 Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and U.S. Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch assigned. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Bates
Represented By: Gilbert Arrazolo
Represented By: James B Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Todd Rinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L. Vito
Represented By: Richard M Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?