Amparan v. Demir, et al.
Plaintiff: Amparan, Edmundo Amparan and Kimberly L. Amparan
Defendant: Demir, Mevlut Berkay Demir, Denizcan Karadeniz, Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, Lake Powell Car Rental Companies and PV Holding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv00045
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MANDATE of USCA - the judgment is AFFIRMED as to #175 Notice of Appeal filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (meq) Modified text on 3/8/2018 (kg).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER OF USCA - upon consideration of the stipulation this appeal is dismissed with respect to Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, only as to #175 Notice of Appeal filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (kg)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE TO USCA that Record is Complete re #175 Notice of Appeal. (kg)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Motions Hearing, held on 2-8-2017, before District Judge William P. Johnson re #175 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary Loughran, Telephone number 505-348-2334. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 7/28/2017. Redaction Request due 8/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2017.(mkl)
July 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Court Reporter's Transcript Order Form filed on 7/2/2017 re #175 Notice of Appeal Estimated Completion Date: 7/21/2017.(mkl)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan requesting the proceedings held on 2/8/2017 be transcribed for the #175 Notice of Appeal (kg)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 USCA Information Letter with Case Number 17-2094 for #175 Notice of Appeal filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (kg)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Transmission of Preliminary Record to US Court of Appeals re #175 Notice of Appeal (kg)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #150 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #151 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #172 Judgment by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Bird, Thomas)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received: $ 505 receipt number 1084-5234101 re #175 Notice of Appeal filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bird, Thomas)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Clerk's Order Settling Costs in favor of the Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies in the amount of $1,551.50. (gr)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Clerk's Order Settling Costs in favor of Defendant Avis Rent A Car Systems in the amount of $1,551.50. (gr)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 JUDGMENT by District Judge William P. Johnson in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs. (mag)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 BILL OF COSTS Defendant's Itemized Cost Bill by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Gentile, Robert)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Second MOTION for Taxation of Costs by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gentile, Robert)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 BILL OF COSTS by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation (Kugler, Aaron)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION for Taxation of Costs by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kugler, Aaron)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #166 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendants Demir and Karadeniz With Prejudice. (mag)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS MEVLUT BERKAY DEMIR AND DENIZCAN KARADENIZ WITH PREJUDICE by Denizcan Karadeniz. (Biehler, Gregory)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Status Conference 158 set for 3/28/17 and Settlement Conference #160 set for 6/20/17 have been VACATED. (jlr)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER TO SUBMIT CLOSING DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (jlr)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING #152 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (mag)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Clerk's Order Settling Costs against Plaintiff and in favor of the Defendant's in the amount of $2,577.73. (gr) Modified text on 3/1/2017 filed in wrong case (gr).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 PRETRIAL ORDER SETTING DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (jlr)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Settlement Conference set for 6/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces - 360 Dona Ana Courtroom (South Tower). (jlr)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt on 2/27/2017. (jlr)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/28/2017 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2695 to be connected to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jlr)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Gooch, Christina)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #108 Defendant PV Holding Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability. (mag)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SUR- REPLY re #146 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Gooch, Christina)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Status Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 02:30 PM. (jlr)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 BILL OF COSTS Defendants Itemized Cost Bill by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Gentile, Robert)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION for Taxation of Costs by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gentile, Robert) Modified on 3/1/2017 un-termed motion due to order filed in wrong case (gr).
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #106 Defendant Avis Rent A Car System LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Entrustment and GRANTING #107 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training. (mag)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #105 Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies' Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING AS MOOT #124 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Lake Powell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 117), or Portions Thereof and DENYING AS MOOT #125 Motion to Strike Expert Report of James S. Tennant and to Exclude James S. Tennant from Testifying. (mag)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re #125 First MOTION to Strike Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Expert Report of James S. Tennant (Doc. 117-5), and to Exclude James S. Tennant from Testifying As and Expert filed by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Garcia, Jonathan)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re #124 First MOTION to Strike #117 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Lake Powell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.117), or Portions Thereof filed by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Garcia, Jonathan)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge William P. Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2017 re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claim for Negligent Entrustment filed by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training filed by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies, #108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability filed by PV Holding Corporation. (Court Reporter M. Loughran) (kg)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability filed by PV Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D) (Anderson, Nathan)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by District Judge William P. Johnson. (kg)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan of Supplemental Authorities (Bird, Thomas)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson. Due to conflict in the Court's schedule, the motions hearing scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on 2/8/2017 is RESCHEDULED to 10:00 a.m. on 2/8/2017. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (mag)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE by Denizcan Karadeniz Joinder of Lake Powell's Motion to Strike re #125 (Biehler, Gregory) Modified text on 2/1/2017 (kg).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Bird on behalf of Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Bird, Thomas)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #105 Motion for Summary Judgment by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies ; #106 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Entrustment; #107 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training; and #108 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability. Motions Hearing set for 2/8/2017 at 09:30 AM - 540 Bonito Courtroom before District Judge William P. Johnson. (mag)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 First MOTION to Strike Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Expert Report of James S. Tennant (Doc. 117-5), and to Exclude James S. Tennant from Testifying As and Expert filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A,B,C) (Dahl, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 First MOTION to Strike #117 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Lake Powell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.117), or Portions Thereof filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Dahl, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training filed by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Kugler, Aaron)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #130 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (mag)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Docs 106, 107, & 108. Replies due by 1/25/2017. (mag)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation re #124 First MOTION to Strike #117 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Lake Powell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.117), or Portions Thereof (Joinder to Lake Powell's Motion Doc 124) (Kugler, Aaron)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation re #125 First MOTION to Strike Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Expert Report of James S. Tennant (Doc. 117-5), and to Exclude James S. Tennant from Testifying As and Expert (Joinder to Lake Powell's Motion Doc 125) (Kugler, Aaron)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Docs 106, 107, & 108 by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kugler, Aaron)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kugler, Aaron)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A Garcia on behalf of Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Garcia, Jonathan)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Gentile, Robert)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Lake Powell's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 105) filed by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Gentile, Robert)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #123 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (mag)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 First MOTION to Strike Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Expert Report of James S. Tennant (Doc. 117-5), and to Exclude James S. Tennant from Testifying As and Expert by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Gentile, Robert)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 First MOTION to Strike #117 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendant Lake Powell's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Lake Powell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.117), or Portions Thereof by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Gentile, Robert)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant Lake Powells Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply Brief by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Gentile, Robert)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt GRANTING #120 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Replies due by 1/20/2017. (jlr)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies Notice of Agreed Extension (Gentile, Robert)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, PV Holding Corporation. (Anderson, Nathan)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Wihl, Kurt)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claim for Negligent Entrustment filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Wihl, Kurt)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Wihl, Kurt)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2) (Wihl, Kurt)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan of Agreed Extension of Deadline (Wihl, Kurt)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt GRANTING #112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 12/9/2016 Replies due by 12/27/2016. (jlr)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan of Testifying Expert (Wihl, Kurt)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claim for Negligent Entrustment, #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training, #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Wihl, Kurt)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mevlut Berkay Demir Certificate of Service (Defendant Demir's Amended Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions) (Brittain, Eric) Modified text on 11/10/2016 (kg).
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mevlut Berkay Demir First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions (Brittain, Eric) Modified text on 11/8/2016 (kg).
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JOINDER to #108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies' Joinder in Defendant PV Holdings' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability (Doc. 108) joined by Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Gentile, Robert)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Mandatory Statutory Liability by PV Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Anderson, Nathan)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Negligent Supervision and Training by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Anderson, Nathan)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claim for Negligent Entrustment by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Anderson, Nathan)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Gentile, Robert)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions to Defendant Mevlut Berkay Demir (Wihl, Kurt)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Discovery (Anderson, Nathan)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re Second Amended Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition Duces Tecum of Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Wihl, Kurt)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re First Amended Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Wihl, Kurt)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mevlut Berkay Demir of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Brittain, Eric) Modified text on 8/19/2016 (kg).
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC Response to Plaintiffs' 30 B 6 Deposition Notice (Anderson, Nathan)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held on 8/15/2016 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (jlr)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER FOR EXTENSION by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (jlr)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/15/2016 at 02:00 PM. (jlr)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED ANSWER to Defendant Mevlut Berkay Demir's First Amended Answer by Mevlut Berkay Demir. (Brittain, Eric)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Letter by Mevlut Berkay Demir. (Attachments: #1 Supplement). (jlr)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Brittain on behalf of Mevlut Berkay Demir (Brittain, Eric)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re First Supp. Answers and Responses to Karadeniz's First Interrogatories and Request for Production (Wihl, Kurt)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan Second Notice of Compliance and Request for Determination (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Gooch, Christina)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re Answers and Responses to Avis Rent A Car System First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Wihl, Kurt)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition Duces Tecum of Defendant Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Wihl, Kurt)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC for their Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery (Kugler, Aaron) Modified text on 7/1/2016 (kg).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re Lake Powell Car Rental Companies Initial Disclosures (Gentile, Robert)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PV Holding Corporation First Initial Disclosures (Anderson, Nathan)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC Third Supplemental Initial Disclosure (Anderson, Nathan)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re: Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies LLCs Second Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Gentile, Robert)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re: Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies LLCs Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Gentile, Robert)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re: Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies LLCs Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Gentile, Robert)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt GRANTING #79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Discovery. (jlr)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Discovery by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Gooch, Christina)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re #73 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gooch, Christina)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re #68 Certificate of Service Plaintiffs' Answers/Responses to Karadeniz's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production (Wihl, Kurt)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re Notice to Take Deposition of Paul David Williams and Lake Powell Car Rental Companies (Wihl, Kurt)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies LLCs Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Gentile, Robert)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies re: Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies LLCs Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies LLCs Responses to Plaintiff Edmundo Amparans First Set of Requests for Admissions (Gentile, Robert)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt GRANTING #71 Unopposed Motion for Service of Process. (jlr)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC First Discovery Requests to Plaintiff (Anderson, Nathan)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION Order Directing Service of Process on Secretary of State re #53 Amended Complaint, by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Gooch, Christina)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Clerk's Minutes for scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt on 5/19/16. (jlr)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND ORDERING PRODUCTION by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Phase one of discovery due by 8/22/2016. Dispositive motions related to phase one due by 9/12/2016. (jlr)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Mevlut Berkay Demir. (med)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Denizcan Karadeniz DEFENDANT DENIZCAN KARADENIZS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF EDMUNDO AMPARAN (Biehler, Gregory)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re: Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Wihl, Kurt)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re: Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies, LLC (Wihl, Kurt)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE for 5/19/2016 at 09:30 AM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2695 to be connected to the proceedings. (kdj)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Lake Powell Car Rental Companies, LLC (Wihl, Kurt)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Wihl, Kurt)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (med)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Defendant Lake Powell Car Rentals Companies' ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, for Personal Injury Due to Negligence, Negligence Per Se, Negligent Entrustment, and Negligent Training and Supervision, and Loss of Consortium by Lake Powell Car Rental Companies.(Gentile, Robert)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Defendant PV Holding's ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, by PV Holding Corporation.(Kugler, Aaron) Modified text on 2/19/2016 (kg).
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. Lake Powell Car Rental Companies served on 1/29/2016, answer due 2/19/2016. (Wihl, Kurt)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FILED IN ERROR-SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. PV Holding Corporation served on 1/29/2016, answer due 2/19/2016. (Wihl, Kurt) Modified to add error text as per filer on 2/12/2016 (jjs).
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE by Denizcan Karadeniz Notice of Substition of Counsel (Biehler, Gregory)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Defendant's ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, by Denizcan Karadeniz.(Hoffman, Stephen)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. PV Holding Corporation served on 1/27/2016, answer due 2/17/2016. (Wihl, Kurt)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Defendant Avis Rent A Car System, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Personal Injury due to Negligence, Negligence Per Se, Negligent Entrustment, Negligent Training and Supervision, and for Loss of Consortium ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC.(Anderson, Nathan)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Alias Summons Issued as to PV Holding Corporation. (kdh)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Personal Injury Due to Negligence, Negligence Per Se, Negligent Entrustment, and Negligent Training and Supervision, and for Loss of Consortium against All Defendants. adding Lake Powell Car Rental Companies and PV Holding Corporation., filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Wihl, Kurt)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to Lake Powell Car Rental Companies and PV Holding Corporation. (mr)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #26 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (kg)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #48 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (atc)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re #48 First MOTION to Compel Discovery and Initial Disclosures from Defendant Avis Rent a Car System, LLC filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Gooch, Christina)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #48 First MOTION to Compel Discovery and Initial Disclosures from Defendant Avis Rent a Car System, LLC filed by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Nathan)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 First MOTION to Compel Discovery and Initial Disclosures from Defendant Avis Rent a Car System, LLC by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Avis' Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit A.1. Avis' Exhibits to Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit B. Avis' Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit C. Letters and Emails)(Gooch, Christina)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Denizcan Karadeniz Initial Rule 26 Disclosure Statement (Hoffman, Stephen)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Second NOTICE of Compliance by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan re #18 Order on Motion for Order (Gooch, Christina) Modified text on 9/4/2015 (kg).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. (atc)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan of Withdrawal of Counsel (Cormier, Zachary) Modified text on 8/31/2015 (kg).
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Order of Confidentiality by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Anderson, Nathan)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING #41 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (atc)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Discovery by Edmundo Amparan. (Gooch, Christina)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Denizcan Karadeniz of Responses and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories and Document Requests (Hoffman, Stephen) Modified text on 8/3/2015 (kg).
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC Defendant, Avis Rent A Car System, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Discovery Requests (Anderson, Nathan)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez DENYING without prejudice #30 Motion for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (atc)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge C. LeRoy Hansen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (med)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: 32. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (hbs)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Senior U.S. District Judge C. LeRoy Hansen as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth is no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan of Completion of Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Gooch, Christina)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY in Support re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Gooch, Christina) Modified text to fix title of document on 6/17/2015 (bap).
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Extended Pre-Trial Deadlines by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Gooch, Christina)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Anderson, Nathan)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Wihl, Kurt)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosures (Gooch, Christina)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gooch, Christina)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Denizcan Karadeniz (Hoffman, Stephen)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Denizcan Karadeniz. (Hoffman, Stephen)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories, Second Requests for Production and First Requests for Admission to Defendant Avis Rent A Car Systems, LLC (Gooch, Christina)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC ARAC's Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Anderson, Nathan)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Edmundo Amparan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gooch, Christina) Modified text on 4/28/2015 to add "Compliance" and defendants; Mevlut Berkay Demir and Denizcan Karadeniz were served on 4/23/15 answer due by 5/14/15 (nr).
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC for its Second Supplemental Rule 26 (A)(1) Initial Disclosures (Kugler, Aaron)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING #16 Unopposed Motion for Service of Process. (atc)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gooch, Christina)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Order for Service of Process by Edmundo Amparan. (Gooch, Christina)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Status Report by Edmundo Amparan (Gooch, Christina)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC Supplemental Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures (Anderson, Nathan)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Edmundo Amparan of Intended Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Civil Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gooch, Christina)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of Edmundo Amparan (Gooch, Christina)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC for Defendant Avis Rent A Car System, LLC's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Anderson, Nathan)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmundo Amparan Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Gooch, Christina)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Mevlut Berkay Demir and Denizcan Karadeniz. (mr)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC Filing of State Court Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Anderson, Nathan)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Wihl on behalf of Edmundo Amparan, Kimberly L. Amparan (Wihl, Kurt)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Person Injury Due To Negligence, Negligence Per Se, and Negligence Entrustment and for Loss of Consortium by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC. (Anderson, Nathan)
January 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC AMENDED (Anderson, Nathan)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan B. Anderson on behalf of Avis Rental A Car System, LLC (Anderson, Nathan)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P Winters on behalf of Avis Rental A Car System, LLC (Winters, Christopher)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Randall Kugler on behalf of Avis Rental A Car System, LLC (Kugler, Aaron)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avis Rental A Car System, LLC from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV- 201407314. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Avis Rental A Car System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kugler, Aaron)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and U.S. Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez assigned. (mr)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-3892535 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Avis Rental A Car System, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kugler, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amparan v. Demir, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amparan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmundo Amparan
Represented By: Kurt Wihl
Represented By: Christina Muscarella Gooch
Represented By: Thomas C. Bird
Represented By: Zachary R Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly L. Amparan
Represented By: Kurt Wihl
Represented By: Thomas C. Bird
Represented By: Christina Muscarella Gooch
Represented By: Zachary R Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mevlut Berkay Demir
Represented By: Eric M Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denizcan Karadeniz
Represented By: Stephen D Hoffman
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Winters
Represented By: Aaron Randall Kugler
Represented By: Nathan B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Powell Car Rental Companies
Represented By: Jonathan A Garcia
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PV Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?