Shive v. Amazon.com Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Shive
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc., eBay, Inc., John LaVecchia, J&C Baseball Clubhouse, Inc., Sears Holding Corporation, Unbeatable Sale.com Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Case Number: 1:2015cv00406
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Sandoval
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning. (cab)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mlt)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, adopting 79 the Magistrate Judge's Second Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition and granting 77 the Plaintiff's Third Motion for Default Judgment Against Defenda nt J&C Baseball Clubhouse, Inc.. Default judgment is entered against Defendant J&C Baseball Clubhouse, Inc., and the Court hereby refers this case to the Honorable Jerry Ritter, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct a jury trial on the question of damages. (meq)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch re 77 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by James Shive. Objections to PFRD due by 9/8/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mej)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, Plaintiff James Shive's Second Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant J&C Baseball Clubhouse, Inc., 73 is denied (meq)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant J&C Baseball Clubhouse, Inc., 71 is denied; and the Clerk's Entry of Default, 60 is set aside. (meq)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File. See Order for details. (mej)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff will effect service in compliance with this Order no later than 1/6/2017. (mej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shive v. Amazon.com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shive
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John LaVecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&C Baseball Clubhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unbeatable Sale.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?