United States of America v. High Plains Livestock, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: High Plains Livestock, LLC, Michael Flen, Calvin Pareo and Darcie Pareo
Case Number: 1:2015cv00680
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Roosevelt
Presiding Judge: M. Christina Armijo
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's objections are overruled, first because they are untimely, and alternatively on their merits; the Court adopts Magistrate Judge Ritter's PFRD 423 , and DENIES Defendant's Motion Requesting Reimbursement of Payments to Co-Special Master Johnson, Miller & Co. 402 . (kg)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo OVERRULING Defendants' Objections to Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition of 349 Motion for Attorney Fees and Adopting 418 the Recommended Disposition of Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (kg)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mlt)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 418 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter re 349 Application for Attorney's Fees and Other Expenses Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2018. Add 3 days to the dea dline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mlt)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 339 Motion for Protective Order. (mej)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 308 MOTION to Strike Docs 303, 303-1 to 303-9 and 305, denying 309 MOTION to Postpone Appointment of Co-Special Master; granting 330 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. Court will appoint Johnson, Miller & Co. as co-special master. (vv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. High Plains Livestock, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ruth Fuess Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Plains Livestock, LLC
Represented By: Pete Domenici, Jr.
Represented By: Lorraine Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Flen
Represented By: Pete Domenici, Jr.
Represented By: Lorraine Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Pareo
Represented By: Pete Domenici, Jr.
Represented By: Lorraine Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcie Pareo
Represented By: Pete Domenici, Jr.
Represented By: Lorraine Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?