Sartori v. Steider & Associates, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Robert F. Sartori
Defendant: Steider & Associates, P.C. and Timothy D. Steider
Case Number: 1:2015cv00991
Filed: November 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Torrance
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera ADOPTING 67 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition OVERRULING 73 Objections, DENYING AS MOOT Motions 71 , 72 . 79 , 81 , 89 , 95 , 103 , and DISMISSING this case with prejudice. (baw)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Objections to PF&RD due by 5/23/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (ccp)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration (baw)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera adopting 51 Report and Recommendations, denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Affirmative Defenses of Steider & Associates, P.C., Timothy D. Steider, and Tim Steider (baw)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re 29 MOTION to Strike 11 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Robert F. Sartori by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Objections to PF&RD due by 2/2/2017. Add 3 days to the dead line if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (ccp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sartori v. Steider & Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F. Sartori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steider & Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Steider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?