Fernandez v. Southwestern Railroad of New Mexico et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Southwestern Railroad of New Mexico and The Western Group, L.C.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01165
Filed: December 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Referring Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Robert C. Brack Overruling 83 Objections filed by The Western Group, L.C., Southwestern Shortline Railroad Company; Adopting 81 Report and Recommendations; Denying 55 Motion to Dismiss; and Dismissing as Moot 69 Motion to Strike (jjs)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re 55 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Sanctions and 69 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Mot ion for Sanctions. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (sls)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Staying Pretrial Scheduling by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Pretrial scheduling is stayed pending the outcome of Defendants' dispositive motions. (sls)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 73 Motion (sls)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Experts' Depositions. (atc)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. (atc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Southwestern Railroad of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Laura B De La Cruz
Represented By: Matthew D Shaffer
Represented By: John R. Tiwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Railroad of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Western Group, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?