CalMat Co. v. Old Castle Precast, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CalMat Co.
Defendant: Old Castle Precast, Inc., Kraft Americas, L.P., Rune Kraft, John Does and Kraft Americas Holdings, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2016cv00026
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 AMENDED ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part 208 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (tah)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 202 Kraft's Objection and Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Entered as Document 190 and Document 191. (tah)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 200 Kraft's Objection and Motion for Reconsideration of Order Entered as Document 188. (tah)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales striking 203 Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56; and striking 227 Request that the Court Moves Sua Sponte (Subject to Motion for Summary Judgment). (tah)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales overruling 199 Rune Kraft's Objections to Proposed Filing Restrictions; and striking 192 Objections, 193 Objections, 194 Objections, 196 Objections, 197 Objections, and 198 Objections. (tah)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Oldcastle Precast, Inc., by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 172 Notice to the Court, Motion for Clarification and Request that the June 29, 2017 Hearing be Cancelled or Continued. No later than 5:00 p.m. (Mountain Standard Time) on Friday, June 23, 2017, Rune Kraft may email (kjgproposedtext@nmcourt.fed.us) or fax ((575) 528-1645) to chambers a detailed explanation of what "personal and business obligations" would prevent him from attending the in-person Order to Show Cause hearing set in Las Cruces on June 29, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. (tah)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 162 Rune Kraft's Notice to the Court, the Chief Judge of the Court and the Chief Judge of the Tenth Circuit and Motion to Void All Rulings Issued in the Case. (tah)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 143 Motion to Set Aside Order to Show Cause. (tah)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting, in part, 82 Plaintiff CalMat Co.'s Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses. The Clerk is authorized to pay the ordered attorneys' fees and costs to CalMat from the royalty payments interpleaded in the Court's registry. (tah)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/29/2017 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ADOPTING 85 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales; granting 111 Motion to Strike; and striking 115 , 119 through 125 . (tah)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Pete Domenici, Jr and Lorraine Hollingsworth terminated. KAHI must retain counsel and have counsel enter an appearance within 20 days. (mej)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch denying 80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (mej)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch re Kraft Americas, L.P. Objections to PFRD due by 1/31/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mej)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch denying 65 Motion for Access to Property. (mej)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 61 Plaintiff CalMat Co.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses. Amended motions due on or before 1/10/2017. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CalMat Co. v. Old Castle Precast, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CalMat Co.
Represented By: Douglas R. Vadnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Castle Precast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Americas, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rune Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Americas Holdings, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?