Romero v. AJF Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Irene Romero
Defendant: AJF Enterprises, Inc. and Arthur Famiglietta
Case Number: 1:2016cv00038
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Sandoval
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 119 Unopposed Motion for Partial Dismissal with Prejudice. (tah)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying without prejudice Defendants' request for reasonable attorney's fees and costs; an amended brief on reasonable attorney's fees and costs consistent with the rulings in this Memorandum Opinion and Order must be filed within fourteen days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order; and Plaintiff may file a response brief fourteen days after the filing of Defendants' brief. (tah)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying 72 Motion for Sanctions. (tah)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. In-Person Status Conference set for 12/16/2016 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. AJF Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Romero
Represented By: Trent A. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJF Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Famiglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?