Rivers v. Younger et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Samson Rivers
Defendant: Emily Younger and KRQE-TV News 13
Case Number: 1:2016cv00555
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION as to 48 , 49 , and 50 by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Objections to PFRD due by 7/13/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (ph)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2017. (ph)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying as moot 20 MOTION to Strike; granting 17 MOTION to Set Aside Default; setting aside 15 Clerk's Entry of Default; setting aside 16 Clerk's Entry of Default; denying as moot 25 MOTION to Strike; and denying as moot 26 MOTION for Default Judgment. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Younger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Samson Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRQE-TV News 13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?