Guinn v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Liz Jenny Guinn
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv00689
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees under § 406(b) (am)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees under EAJA (am)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (am)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 25 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Third Extension of Briefing Schedule. Reply is due by June 5, 2017. (am)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand is due by February 10, 2017. Response is due by April 13, 2017. Reply is due by April 27, 2017. (am)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal Administrative Record (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinn v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Jenny Guinn
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?