Urioste v. Corizon and Centurion Health Care Providers et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Urioste
Defendant: Corizon and Centurion Health Care Providers, Jose Martinez, Ben Martinez, German Franko, C. Olivas, Michelle Boyer and Gregg Marcantell
Case Number: 1:2016cv00755
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Judith C. Herrera
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea Setting a Telephonic Status Conference for June 29, 2021 at 11:00 AM. (atc)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re 44 Martinez Report, 62 Second Amended Complaint, and 63 Surreply. Objections to Report and Recommendations due by May 20, 2021. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (atc)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea Regarding Defendant Cordova. (atc)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 38 , 52 Motions to Amend; denying 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying as moot 50 , 56 Motions to Extend Time; granting 57 Motion to Stay; and granting 58 Motion to file Reply. Consult order for details. (cbf)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The United States Marshal shall serve the Defendants named herein. (cbf)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea DIRECTING the submission of addresses. Counsel for NM Department of Corrections shall provide the information outlined in the Order to the Court on or before March 17, 2020. (cbf)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera dismissing certain claims and parties and ordering issuance of notice and waiver of service forms directed to the remaining Defendants. (baw)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera dismissing 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Joshua Urioste without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff Urioste is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of entryof this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (baw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urioste v. Corizon and Centurion Health Care Providers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Urioste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon and Centurion Health Care Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Franko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Marcantell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?