Pierce et al v. Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mark Pierce, William C Enloe, Jill Cook, Trinity Capital Corporation and Los Alamos National Bank
Defendant: Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, One Beacon Insurance Group and Continental Casualty Company
Cross_claimant: Trinity Capital Corporation
Cross_defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00829
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Los Alamos
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker setting fee awards as further described herein. (bap)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker denying Defendants Atlantic Specialty and Continental's 284 MOTION for Reconsideration of Fee Award Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C), 293 MOTION for Reconsideration of Fee Award. (bap)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting Plaintiff Pierce's 158 MOTION to Remand to State Court; granting 225 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Trinity Capital Corporation and Los Alamos Nat ional Bank ; granting Jill Cook's 226 MOTION to Remand; granting Enloe's 227 MOTION to Remand; this consolidated state court proceeding D-132-CV-2015-0082 will be REMANDED to the First Judaical District Court in Los Alamos County after this Court rules on the requests for attorney's fees and costs. (bap)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting and denying in part 254 MOTION To Take Judicial Notice PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 44 filed by defendant ASIC. (bap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce et al v. Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Represented By: Gordon H Rowe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Headrick
Represented By: Raul P Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Beacon Insurance Group
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Represented By: Gordon H Rowe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Gerald Dixon
Represented By: Cara Duffield
Represented By: James C. Wilkey
Represented By: Jennifer A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pierce
Represented By: David J Berardinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Enloe
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Deborah R Stambaugh
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Cook
Represented By: John M. Brant
Represented By: Jeannie Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Capital Corporation
Represented By: Sara Nathanson Sanchez
Represented By: Robert P. Warburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Alamos National Bank
Represented By: Sara Nathanson Sanchez
Represented By: Robert P. Warburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Trinity Capital Corporation
Represented By: Sara Nathanson Sanchez
Represented By: Robert P. Warburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Gerald Dixon
Represented By: Cara Duffield
Represented By: James C. Wilkey
Represented By: Jennifer A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?