Lueras v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Oranda Lueras
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv00842
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand is due by March 22, 2017. Response is due by May 17, 2017. Reply is due by June 14, 2017. (am)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand is due by March 8, 2017. Response is due by May 3, 2017. Reply is due by May 31, 2017. (am)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Social Security Administration must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than January 11, 2017. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lueras v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oranda Lueras
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?