Yazzie et al v. Government Employees Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Yazzie and Ernest Yazzie
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, Darcell Elmore and Michal Ellis
Case Number: 1:2016cv01085
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: McKinley
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting 130 Government Employees Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Malicious Abuse of Process. (tkl)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Seal Document. (ccp)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting 64 Motion for Discovery. (ccp)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Defendant GEICO's Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Plaintiffs' Extra-Contractual Claims (Doc. 23) is denied without prejudice. Defendant Michal Ellis' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 36), Defendant Darcell Elmore's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 42), and Defendant Michal Ellis' Second Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 60), are denied. (kmt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazzie et al v. Government Employees Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Donna L Chapman
Represented By: Stephen Simone
Represented By: Jessica Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcell Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michal Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Yazzie
Represented By: Nathan S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Yazzie
Represented By: Nathan S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?