Ross et al v. Balderas et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Ross and Susan Gerard
Defendant: Hector Balderas, Jr., Robert Garcia, Sarah Michael Singleton, Francis J. Mathew, Raymond Z. Ortiz, David K. Thompson, Jennifer Attrep, T. Glenn Ellington, Sylvia Lamar, Donita Olympia Sena, Donna Bevacqua-Young, Pat Casados, Frank Sedillo, William Pacheco, Antonio Gutierrez, Anna Montoya, Judah Ben Montano, Michelle Portillo, Stephen T. Pacheco, Jane Gagne, Joyce Bustos, Lynn Pickard, Pamela Reynolds, Robin Martinez, Robert Richards, Brenda Wall, Audrey Montoya, Allstate Insurance, Inc., A. Arroyo and E. Montijo
Case Number: 1:2016cv01121
Filed: October 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: James O. Browning
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 330 Defendant Richards' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Andrew Ross Should Not Be Held in Contempt of Court (am)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 319 Plaintiff Ross's Motion to Vacate and Reset Deposition. The deposition of Plaintiff Ross in aid of execution of judgment will be held on February 14, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. (am)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART 308 Defendants Robert Garcia, William Pacheco, Antonio Gutierrez, and Anna Montoya's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff Andrew Ross Should not be held in Contempt. The depo sition of Plaintiff Ross in aid of execution of judgment is set for February 14, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. The Court RESERVES RULING on County Defendants' request to order Plaintiff Ross to show cause why he should not be held in contempt. (am)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 297 Plaintiff Ross's Motion for Further Reconsideration of Attorney's Fees. (rt)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 289 Plaintiff Andrew Ross's Motion for Protective Order. (sg)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 285 Plantiff Andrew Ross's Motion for Reconsideration of award of attorney's fees to Defendant Robert Richards. (rt)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 261 Plaintiff Andrew Ross's Motion for Relief from final judgment on attorney's fees. (rt)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to various Defendants against Plaintiffs and their counsel by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. Ordered that Defendants Judah Ben Montano, A. Arroyo, E. Montijo, Hector Balderas, Jr., William Pacheco, Antonio Gut ierrez, Anna Montoya, and Robert Garcia recover $46,625.55, plus interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961, half from Plaintiffs Andrew Ross and Susan Gerard, and half from their counsel, Mr. Arash Kashanian, personally, in accordance with table contained in this Judgment. (rt)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations re 237 ; overruling pro se 241 and counseled 246 objections by Plaintiff Ross; granting 158 motion for attorney's fees and supplement 202 (on behalf of City Defendants Judah Ben Montano, A. Arroyo, and E. Montijo). These Defendants are awarded attorney's fees in the total amount of $17,177.50, plus interest, with half to be paid by Plaintiffs and half by counsel, Mr. Kashanian, personally. (rt)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to DENY 175 Defendant Richards' Fourth Motion for Attorney Fees, to DENY 195 Defendant Richards' Amended Motion to Tax Costs; to DENY as moot 218 Plai ntiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to 195 Defendant Richards' Amended Motion to Tax Costs; and to DENY 219 Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions against Defendant Richards. Objections to PF&RD due by July 26, 2017< /B>. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d). (am)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. withdrawing 187 Counseled Motion to Substitute Party; deferring ruling on 200 Pro-Se Motion to Substitute Party pending Plaintiff Ross obtaining counsel to represent the Estate of Plaintiff Susan Gerard; granting 204 ORDER on Motion to Withdraw Counseled Motion to Substitute Party. (rt)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (am)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. dismissing Defendant Richards' state-law counterclaim 45 for harassment. (rt)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 149 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (rt)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr.adopting 113 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations and overruling 125 Defendant's (Robert Richards) objections; denying 80 Defendant Richards's Motion and 86 Corrected Motion for Attorney Fees and Sanctions; denying 127 Defendant Richards's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to the Court's Inherent Power; denying 105 Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. (rt)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 143 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Anna Montoya and Antonio Gutierrez's Motion for Summary Judgment. (rt)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. granting 118 Defendant William Pacheco's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' Motions 130 131 to voluntarily dismiss Defendant William Pacheco. (rt)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. granting 90 City Defendants' (Judah Ben Montano, A. Arroyo & E. Montijo) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (rt)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. granting 88 Defendant Garcia's Motion for Summary Judgment. (rt)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to DENY 80 Defendant Richards' Motion for Sanctions and to DENY 86 Defendant Richards' Corrected Motion for Sanctions. Objections to the PF&RD are due by January 24, 2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (am)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration of dismissal of Defendant Hector Balderas. (rt)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER on various pending motions by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. terminating 30 Defendants' (Bustos & Gagne) Motion to Dismiss; terminating 47 Defendants' (Sena, Bevacqua-Young, Casados, & Portillo) Motion to Dismiss; terminating [ 54] Defendant LaMar's Motion to Dismiss; terminating 59 Defendant Audrey Montoya's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; terminating 65 Defendant Allstate Ins. Co.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; termi nating 72 Defendant Pickard's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; terminating 78 Defendant Reynolds' Motion to Dismiss; denying 82 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Defendant Richards; granting 94 City Defendants' (Montano, Arroyo, & Montijo) Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery; granting 96 Defendants' (Garcia, Pacheco, Gutierrez, & Anna Montoya) Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Based Upon Qualified Immunity. (rt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross et al v. Balderas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Ross
Represented By: Arash Kashanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gerard
Represented By: Arash Kashanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Balderas, Jr.
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Michael Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Mathew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Z. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Attrep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Glenn Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donita Olympia Sena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Bevacqua-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Casados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judah Ben Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen T. Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Gagne
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Bustos
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Montijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?