Lucas v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Heidi Sue Lucas
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv01131
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (am)
April 28, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Third Extension of Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand is due by May 8, 2017. Response is due by July 7, 2017. Reply is due by July 21, 2017. (am)
February 8, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand is due by April 5, 2017. Response is due by May 31, 2017. Reply is due by June 28, 2017. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Sue Lucas
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?