Border Area Mental Health, Inc. et al v. United Behavioral Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Border Area Mental Health, Inc., Counseling Associates, Inc., Easter Seals El Mirador, Families & Youth, Inc., Hogares, Inc., Southwest Counseling Center, Inc., Southern New Mexico Human Development, Inc., Teambuilders Counseling Services, Inc., The Counseling Center, Inc. and Valencia Counseling, Inc.
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Inc., Public Consulting Group, Inc., Elizabeth A. Martin, Andrew Sekel, Timothy S. Miller and John Does
Case Number: 1:2016cv01213
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re 71 Judgment . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider [Doc. 72 ] is DENIED. (gr)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Opinion of the Arbitrator 60 is DENIED and Plaintiffs' claims against United Defendants are DISMISSED. (mjr)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez; IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 54(b) Certification 53 is GRANTED as follows: a final judgment will be entered dismissing this action as to PCG. (mjr)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (All Claims Against It). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 7 ] is GRANTED. (gr)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Accordingly, no basis exists for the Court to deny United Defendants' motion to compel arbitration. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that United Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration [Doc. 6 ] is GRANTED. (gr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Border Area Mental Health, Inc. et al v. United Behavioral Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Border Area Mental Health, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Counseling Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Easter Seals El Mirador
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Families & Youth, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hogares, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Counseling Center, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern New Mexico Human Development, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teambuilders Counseling Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Counseling Center, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia Counseling, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J. Davis
Represented By: William Garth Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dennis E Jontz
Represented By: Matthew W. Park
Represented By: John C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dennis E Jontz
Represented By: Matthew W. Park
Represented By: John C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cerianne Lynn Mullins
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Martin
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dennis E Jontz
Represented By: Matthew W. Park
Represented By: John C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Sekel
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dennis E Jontz
Represented By: Matthew W. Park
Represented By: John C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Miller
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dennis E Jontz
Represented By: Matthew W. Park
Represented By: John C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?