Gonzales v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bernardo Gonzales
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv01225
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Remand to Agency by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (jrt)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Reply is due by 9/22/2017. (atc)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Second Motion for Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Remand due 6/29/17. Response due 8/28/17. Reply due 9/11/17. (atc)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Gonzales
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?